Balarezo et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Demetrios Kaloudakis, Patrick Keane, Anthony Barzelatto, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Roger Kelly, Kerry Joyce, Michael Jones, Francisco Camino, Reginald Jenkins, Andre D Jones, Harold Huron, Cristina Caro, Caesar Intravia, Elmadany Jeanne, George Jacobi, Vincent Berlingerio, Emmanuel Jones, Jaches Irma, Perry Ingrassia, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Karp, Jacqueline Jones, Michael Kelley, Wayne Huggins, Anita Jackson, Richard Bittles, Charles Hughes, Scott Carville, Domenico Leone, William Huber, Patricia Kelly, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Yelizaveta Kagan, Rogerio Jarrin, Wanda Jacobsen, Joseph Iovino, Edison H Cardenas, Lavell Jackson, Itkin Steven, Scott Bendul, Kathleen Kelley, Edward Hunt, Zebiullah Cagatay, Christopher Kelly, Peter Benkovich, Michael Bassano, Jorge Cruz, Daniel Jonas, Patrick Kennedy, Etienne Jean, Jorge E Blanco, Fanta Kaba, Nancy Castillo, Natale Iannello, Jose Balarezo, Efren Cruz, Alfred Johnson, Leonard Hubbard, Thelma Jeter, Steven Howard, Marina Jara, James Brown, Gregory John, Natale Leone, Jeffrey Katz, Michael C Keenan, John Lema, Kurbat Hristoff, Amirha Hutto, Henryk Jozwiak, Dave Keene, Lester Kakol, Carmen Cubero, Amanda Kendricks, Alfreido Johnson, Mary Lennon-Craig, Brian Jacobsen, Iwanczyk Jan, Melvin Jones, Saeed Hussein, Maria Katzman, Robert Jalca, Victor Carrasco, Bolivar Caivinagua, Jeffrey Hudson, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Jan Bierylo, Boris Kagan, Michael Jacobs, Angel Hualpa, Robert Imbesi, Louis Castelluccio, LeeAnn Johnson, Patrick Kelly, Andrew Kay, Lizette Carvajal, Kenneth Johnson, John Casey, James Iacobelli and Richard Bivona
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11911
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 7, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke to RE-FILE re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Carlos Israel Jimenez, Steven Itkin, Jan Iwanczyk, Irma Jaches, Natale Leone; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,, against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Charles Hughes, Wayne Huggins, John Lema, Michael Kelley, Louis Castelluccio, Melvin Jones, Jan Bierylo, Lester Kakol, Steven Howard, Natale Leone, Lizette Carvajal, Emmanuel Jones, Cristina Caro, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Robert Jalca, Jeffrey Katz, Michael Jones, Kurbat Hristoff, Roger Kelly, Marina Jara, Reginald Jenkins, John Casey, Kathleen Kelley, Dave Keene, Jorge E Blanco, Jeffrey Hudson, Harold Huron, James Brown, Christopher Kelly, Boris Kagan, Lavell Jackson, Patrick Keane, Patricia Kelly, Fanta Kaba, Alfreido Johnson, Leonard Hubbard, George Jacobi, Natale Iannello, Gregory John, Patrick Kennedy, Rogerio Jarrin, Perry Ingrassia, Zebiullah Cagatay, Edison H Cardenas, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Jacobs, Elmadany Jeanne, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Itkin Steven, Jacqueline Jones, LeeAnn Johnson, Andrew Kay, Henryk Jozwiak, Scott Carville, Thelma Jeter, Wanda Jacobsen, Kenneth Johnson, Andre D Jones, Alfred Johnson, Anthony Barzelatto, Victor Carrasco, Jose Balarezo, Michael C Keenan, William Huber, Mary Lennon-Craig, Michael Karp, Carmen Cubero, Angel Hualpa, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Kerry Joyce, Robert Imbesi, Francisco Camino, Daniel Jonas, Etienne Jean, Anita Jackson, Jorge Cruz, Brian Jacobsen, Yelizaveta Kagan, Nancy Castillo, Caesar Intravia, Iwanczyk Jan, Efren Cruz, Bolivar Caivinagua, Amanda Kendricks, Vincent Berlingerio, Maria Katzman, Michael Bassano, Saeed Hussein, Patrick Kelly, Richard Bivona, Ellen Jacobs, Jaches Irma, Richard Bittles, James Iacobelli, Domenico Leone, Scott Bendul, Edward Hunt, Amirha Hutto, Joseph Iovino, Peter Benkovich. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin) Modified on 1/3/2019 (jgo).
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Bourke dated 01/02/2018 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Bourke dated 01/02/2019 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 3- MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/18/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MDL-1570 Action. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/18/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MDL-1570 Action. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Jose Balarezo, Anthony Barzelatto, Michael Bassano, Scott Bendul, Peter Benkovich, Vincent Berlingerio, Jan Bierylo, Richard Bittles, Richard Bivona, Jorge E Blanco, James Brown, Zebiullah Cagatay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Francisco Camino, Edison H Cardenas, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Cristina Caro, Victor Carrasco, Lizette Carvajal, Scott Carville, John Casey, Louis Castelluccio, Nancy Castillo, Efren Cruz, Jorge Cruz, Carmen Cubero, Steven Howard, Kurbat Hristoff, Angel Hualpa, Leonard Hubbard, William Huber, Jeffrey Hudson, Wayne Huggins, Charles Hughes, Edward Hunt, Harold Huron, Saeed Hussein, Amirha Hutto, James Iacobelli, Natale Iannello, Robert Imbesi, Perry Ingrassia, Caesar Intravia, Joseph Iovino, Jaches Irma, Anita Jackson, Lavell Jackson, George Jacobi, Ellen Jacobs, Michael Jacobs, Brian Jacobsen, Wanda Jacobsen, Robert Jalca, Iwanczyk Jan, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Marina Jara, Rogerio Jarrin, Etienne Jean, Elmadany Jeanne, Reginald Jenkins, Thelma Jeter, Gregory John, Alfred Johnson, Alfreido Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, LeeAnn Johnson, Daniel Jonas, Andre D Jones, Emmanuel Jones, Jacqueline Jones, Melvin Jones, Michael Jones, Kerry Joyce, Henryk Jozwiak, Fanta Kaba, Boris Kagan, Yelizaveta Kagan, Lester Kakol, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Karp, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Jeffrey Katz, Maria Katzman, Andrew Kay, Patrick Keane, Michael C Keenan, Dave Keene, Kathleen Kelley, Michael Kelley, Christopher Kelly, Patricia Kelly, Patrick Kelly, Roger Kelly, Amanda Kendricks, Patrick Kennedy, John Lema, Mary Lennon-Craig, Domenico Leone, Natale Leone, Itkin Steven.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16075523)Document filed by Charles Hughes, Wayne Huggins, John Lema, Michael Kelley, Louis Castelluccio, Melvin Jones, Jan Bierylo, Lester Kakol, Steven Howard, Natale Leone, Lizette Carvajal, Emmanuel Jones, Cristina Caro, Israel Jimenez Carlos, Robert Jalca, Jeffrey Katz, Michael Jones, Kurbat Hristoff, Roger Kelly, Marina Jara, Reginald Jenkins, John Casey, Kathleen Kelley, Dave Keene, Jorge E Blanco, Jeffrey Hudson, Harold Huron, James Brown, Christopher Kelly, Boris Kagan, Lavell Jackson, Patrick Keane, Patricia Kelly, Fanta Kaba, Alfreido Johnson, Leonard Hubbard, George Jacobi, Natale Iannello, Gregory John, Patrick Kennedy, Rogerio Jarrin, Perry Ingrassia, Zebiullah Cagatay, Edison H Cardenas, Demetrios Kaloudakis, Michael Jacobs, Elmadany Jeanne, Mary Jankauskas-Colton, Itkin Steven, Jacqueline Jones, LeeAnn Johnson, Andrew Kay, Henryk Jozwiak, Scott Carville, Thelma Jeter, Wanda Jacobsen, Kenneth Johnson, Andre D Jones, Alfred Johnson, Anthony Barzelatto, Victor Carrasco, Jose Balarezo, Michael C Keenan, William Huber, Mary Lennon-Craig, Michael Karp, Carmen Cubero, Angel Hualpa, Zbigniew Karpowicz, Kerry Joyce, Robert Imbesi, Francisco Camino, Daniel Jonas, Etienne Jean, Anita Jackson, Jorge Cruz, Brian Jacobsen, Yelizaveta Kagan, Nancy Castillo, Caesar Intravia, Iwanczyk Jan, Efren Cruz, Bolivar Caivinagua, Amanda Kendricks, Vincent Berlingerio, Maria Katzman, Michael Bassano, Saeed Hussein, Patrick Kelly, Richard Bivona, Ellen Jacobs, Jaches Irma, Richard Bittles, James Iacobelli, Domenico Leone, Scott Bendul, Edward Hunt, Amirha Hutto, Joseph Iovino, Peter Benkovich. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balarezo et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrios Kaloudakis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Keane
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barzelatto
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbigniew Karpowicz
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kelly
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Joyce
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Camino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Jenkins
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre D Jones
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Huron
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Caro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caesar Intravia
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmadany Jeanne
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jacobi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Berlingerio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Jones
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaches Irma
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Ingrassia
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Jacobs
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Karp
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Jones
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kelley
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Huggins
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Jackson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bittles
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hughes
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Carville
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenico Leone
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Huber
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kelly
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jankauskas-Colton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelizaveta Kagan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogerio Jarrin
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jacobsen
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Iovino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edison H Cardenas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Jackson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itkin Steven
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bendul
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Kelley
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hunt
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zebiullah Cagatay
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kelly
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Benkovich
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bassano
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Cruz
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jonas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kennedy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne Jean
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge E Blanco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanta Kaba
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Castillo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natale Iannello
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Balarezo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Cruz
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Johnson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Hubbard
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Jeter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Howard
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Jara
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory John
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natale Leone
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Katz
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Keenan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lema
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurbat Hristoff
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amirha Hutto
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henryk Jozwiak
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Keene
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Kakol
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cubero
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Kendricks
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreido Johnson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lennon-Craig
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jacobsen
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iwanczyk Jan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jones
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeed Hussein
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Katzman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jalca
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Carrasco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolivar Caivinagua
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hudson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Jimenez Carlos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Bierylo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Kagan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobs
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Hualpa
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Imbesi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Castelluccio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeAnn Johnson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Kay
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizette Carvajal
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Johnson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Casey
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Iacobelli
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bivona
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?