Carothers v. General Motors, LLC

Plaintiff: Cheryl Carothers
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11945
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Motors, LLC served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers. Document filed by Cheryl Carothers. (Emison, Brett)
January 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1). As this case, Carothers v. General Motors LLC, 18-CV-11945, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. (14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5). Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543 Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:18-cv-11945-JMF(mro)
January 1, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (mro)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
December 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
December 26, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cheryl Carothers. (Emison, Brett)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-MD-2543. Document filed by Cheryl Carothers.(Emison, Brett)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emison, Brett)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16077232)Document filed by Cheryl Carothers.(Emison, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carothers v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Carothers
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?