Mercer et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Sean Moody, Horace Morris, Anthony Modafferi, Ferdinand Morrone, Portia Morales, Deval Mowatt, Devon Mowatt, Erin Moody, Jan-Sheri Morris, Alyssa Morrone, Queen Mercer, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero, Yvette Moussa, Ellen Moran Brennan, Mercedes Hernandez Molina, Winford F Lamb, Maria Revilla, Kevin Mulligan, Alfia L Gilligan, Mitchell Murphy, Michael Moussa, Joseph Moussa, Jackie J Mercer, Mona OConnor, Jacqueline Milam, Jaime Montoya-Londono, Gilberto Montoya-Londono, Dylan Moran, Gregory Morrone, Shannon Moran, Sherwin Morales, Mazen Moussa, Colleen Andello, Patricia Codispoti, Katherine Miller, Keith Morris, Frank Moccia, Timothy Muldowney, Masako Murphy, Andrea Mowatt, Elaine Moccia, Michael Moran, Eileen M Morello, Kevin Moran, Laurie Miller, Jessica Spiers, Linda Morrone, Deirdre Moody, George Jebrine, Magarita Londono de Montoya, Rachel Miller, Anne Muldowney, Brian Muldowney, Mary Muldowney, Jessica Moody, Steven Morello, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Stacey Montoya, Dahlia Morris, Kevin Muldowney, Kim Racklin, Ryan Moran, Michael Mulligan, Patricia Mulligan, Raffaela Modafferi, Mary Cooper, Linda Loran, Ellen Moran, Brian Mulligan, Andre Mowatt, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Donna Velazquez and Luis F Montoya-Londono
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11965
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Colleen Andello, Ellen Moran Brennan, Patricia Codispoti, Mary Cooper(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth M. Parker, deceased, the late sibling of Wesley Mercer), Mary Cooper(individually, as surviving sibling of Wesley Mercer), Alfia L Gilligan, George Jebrine, Winford F Lamb, Magarita Londono de Montoya, Linda Loran, Jackie J Mercer, Queen Mercer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Wesley Mercer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Wesley Mercer), Queen Mercer(individually, as surviving spouse of Wesley Mercer), Jacqueline Milam(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Major Ronald D. Milam, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of MM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(individually, as surviving spouse of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of RDM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Katherine Miller, Laurie Miller(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas C. Miller, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Douglas C. Miller), Laurie Miller(individually, as surviving spouse of Douglas C. Miller), Rachel Miller, Elaine Moccia(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank V. Moccia), Elaine Moccia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank V. Moccia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank V. Moccia), Frank Moccia, Anthony Modafferi, Raffaela Modafferi, Mercedes Hernandez Molina(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Manuel De Jesus Molina, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Mercedes Hernandez Molina(individually, as surviving spouse of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Stacey Montoya(individually, as surviving spouse of Carlos A. Montoya), Stacey Montoya(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos A. Montoya, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carlos A. Montoya), Gilberto Montoya-Londono, Jaime Montoya-Londono, Luis F Montoya-Londono, Deirdre Moody, Erin Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Dylan Moran, Ellen Moran, Kevin Moran, Michael Moran, Ryan Moran, Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Eileen M Morello(individually, as surviving spouse of Steven Morello), Eileen M Morello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Morello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Steven Morello), Steven Morello, Dahlia Morris, Horace Morris(individually, as surviving spouse of Odessa V. Morris), Horace Morris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Odessa V. Morris, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Odessa V. Morris), Jan-Sheri Morris, Keith Morris, Alyssa Morrone, Ferdinand Morrone, Gregory Morrone, Linda Morrone(individually, as surviving spouse of Ferdinand Morrone), Linda Morrone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ferdinand Morrone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ferdinand Morrone), Joseph Moussa, Mazen Moussa, Michael Moussa, Yvette Moussa, Andre Mowatt, Andrea Mowatt(individually, as surviving parent of Damion Mowatt), Andrea Mowatt(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Damion Mowatt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Damion Mowatt), Deval Mowatt, Devon Mowatt, Anne Muldowney, Brian Muldowney, Kevin Muldowney, Mary Muldowney, Timothy Muldowney, Brian Mulligan, Kevin Mulligan, Michael Mulligan, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis M. Mulligan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(individually, as surviving sibling of Dennis M. Mulligan), Masako Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick J. Murphy), Masako Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick J. Murphy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick J. Murphy), Mitchell Murphy, Mona OConnor, Kim Racklin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Moran), Kim Racklin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Moran), Maria Revilla(individually, as surviving spouse of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Maria Revilla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Jessica Spiers, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Donna Velazquez. (Strong, Bruce)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 3/21/2019. Document filed by Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody); Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody); Brian Mulligan; Raffaela Modafferi; Winford F Lamb; Michael Moussa; Maria Revilla(individually, as surviving spouse of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier); Kevin Muldowney; Stacey Montoya(individually, as surviving spouse of Carlos A. Montoya); Elaine Moccia(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank V. Moccia); George Jebrine; Katherine Miller; Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran); Eileen M Morello(individually, as surviving spouse of Steven Morello); Mary Muldowney; Yvette Moussa; Stacey Montoya(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos A. Montoya, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carlos A. Montoya); Mitchell Murphy; Alfia L Gilligan; Horace Morris(individually, as surviving spouse of Odessa V. Morris); Frank Moccia; Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan); Michael Mulligan; Jacqueline Milam(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Major Ronald D. Milam, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Major Ronald D. Milam); Magarita Londono de Montoya; Jessica Moody; Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of RDM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam); Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan); Andrea Mowatt(individually, as surviving parent of Damion Mowatt); Michael Moran; Patricia Mulligan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis M. Mulligan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis M. Mulligan); Masako Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick J. Murphy); Devon Mowatt; Gregory Morrone; Jaime Montoya-Londono; Ryan Moran; Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales); Keith Morris; Jessica Spiers; Sherwin Morales; Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of MM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam); Laurie Miller(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas C. Miller, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Douglas C. Miller); Timothy Muldowney; Ellen Moran Brennan; Jan-Sheri Morris; Eileen M Morello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Morello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Steven Morello); Joseph Moussa; Ferdinand Morrone; Kevin Moran; Patricia Mulligan(individually, as surviving sibling of Dennis M. Mulligan); Deval Mowatt; Elaine Moccia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank V. Moccia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank V. Moccia); Horace Morris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Odessa V. Morris, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Odessa V. Morris); Steven Morello; Linda Morrone(individually, as surviving spouse of Ferdinand Morrone); Mazen Moussa; Linda Morrone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ferdinand Morrone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ferdinand Morrone); Donna Velazquez; Queen Mercer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Wesley Mercer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Wesley Mercer); Queen Mercer(individually, as surviving spouse of Wesley Mercer); Kevin Mulligan; Luis F Montoya-Londono; Brian Muldowney; Mercedes Hernandez Molina(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Manuel De Jesus Molina, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Manuel De Jesus Molina); Gilberto Montoya-Londono; Petal S Stanford-Sylvert; Anne Muldowney; Andre Mowatt; Laurie Miller(individually, as surviving spouse of Douglas C. Miller); Dahlia Morris; Alyssa Morrone; Dylan Moran; Mercedes Hernandez Molina(individually, as surviving spouse of Manuel De Jesus Molina); Mona OConnor; Andrea Mowatt(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Damion Mowatt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Damion Mowatt); Patricia Codispoti; Portia Morales; Kim Racklin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Moran); Anthony Modafferi; Rachel Miller; Mary Cooper(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth M. Parker, deceased, the late sibling of Wesley Mercer); Colleen Andello; Deirdre Moody; Linda Loran; Masako Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick J. Murphy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick J. Murphy); Jacqueline Milam(individually, as surviving spouse of Major Ronald D. Milam); Ellen Moran; Kim Racklin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Moran); Maria Revilla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier); Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales); Jackie J Mercer; Erin Moody; Sean Moody; Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran); Mary Cooper(individually, as surviving sibling of Wesley Mercer). (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (sj)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 999,999,999,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (sj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Colleen Andello, Ellen Moran Brennan, Patricia Codispoti, Mary Cooper(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth M. Parker, deceased, the late sibling of Wesley Mercer), Mary Cooper(individually, as surviving sibling of Wesley Mercer), Alfia L Gilligan, George Jebrine, Winford F Lamb, Magarita Londono de Montoya, Linda Loran, Jackie J Mercer, Queen Mercer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Wesley Mercer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Wesley Mercer), Queen Mercer(individually, as surviving spouse of Wesley Mercer), Jacqueline Milam(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Major Ronald D. Milam, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of MM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(individually, as surviving spouse of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of RDM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Katherine Miller, Laurie Miller(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas C. Miller, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Douglas C. Miller), Laurie Miller(individually, as surviving spouse of Douglas C. Miller), Rachel Miller, Elaine Moccia(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank V. Moccia), Elaine Moccia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank V. Moccia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank V. Moccia), Frank Moccia, Anthony Modafferi, Raffaela Modafferi, Mercedes Hernandez Molina(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Manuel De Jesus Molina, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Mercedes Hernandez Molina(individually, as surviving spouse of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Stacey Montoya(individually, as surviving spouse of Carlos A. Montoya), Stacey Montoya(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos A. Montoya, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carlos A. Montoya), Gilberto Montoya-Londono, Jaime Montoya-Londono, Luis F Montoya-Londono, Deirdre Moody, Erin Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Dylan Moran, Ellen Moran, Kevin Moran, Michael Moran, Ryan Moran, Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Eileen M Morello(individually, as surviving spouse of Steven Morello), Eileen M Morello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Morello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Steven Morello), Steven Morello, Dahlia Morris, Horace Morris(individually, as surviving spouse of Odessa V. Morris), Horace Morris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Odessa V. Morris, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Odessa V. Morris), Jan-Sheri Morris, Keith Morris, Alyssa Morrone, Ferdinand Morrone, Gregory Morrone, Linda Morrone(individually, as surviving spouse of Ferdinand Morrone), Linda Morrone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ferdinand Morrone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ferdinand Morrone), Joseph Moussa, Mazen Moussa, Michael Moussa, Yvette Moussa, Andre Mowatt, Andrea Mowatt(individually, as surviving parent of Damion Mowatt), Andrea Mowatt(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Damion Mowatt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Damion Mowatt), Deval Mowatt, Devon Mowatt, Anne Muldowney, Brian Muldowney, Kevin Muldowney, Mary Muldowney, Timothy Muldowney, Brian Mulligan, Kevin Mulligan, Michael Mulligan, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis M. Mulligan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(individually, as surviving sibling of Dennis M. Mulligan), Masako Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick J. Murphy), Masako Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick J. Murphy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick J. Murphy), Mitchell Murphy, Mona OConnor, Kim Racklin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Moran), Kim Racklin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Moran), Maria Revilla(individually, as surviving spouse of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Maria Revilla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Jessica Spiers, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Donna Velazquez.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Colleen Andello, Ellen Moran Brennan, Patricia Codispoti, Mary Cooper(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth M. Parker, deceased, the late sibling of Wesley Mercer), Mary Cooper(individually, as surviving sibling of Wesley Mercer), Alfia L Gilligan, George Jebrine, Winford F Lamb, Magarita Londono de Montoya, Linda Loran, Jackie J Mercer, Queen Mercer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Wesley Mercer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Wesley Mercer), Queen Mercer(individually, as surviving spouse of Wesley Mercer), Jacqueline Milam(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Major Ronald D. Milam, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of MM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(individually, as surviving spouse of Major Ronald D. Milam), Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of RDM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Katherine Miller, Laurie Miller(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas C. Miller, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Douglas C. Miller), Laurie Miller(individually, as surviving spouse of Douglas C. Miller), Rachel Miller, Elaine Moccia(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank V. Moccia), Elaine Moccia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank V. Moccia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank V. Moccia), Frank Moccia, Anthony Modafferi, Raffaela Modafferi, Mercedes Hernandez Molina(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Manuel De Jesus Molina, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Mercedes Hernandez Molina(individually, as surviving spouse of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Stacey Montoya(individually, as surviving spouse of Carlos A. Montoya), Stacey Montoya(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos A. Montoya, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carlos A. Montoya), Gilberto Montoya-Londono, Jaime Montoya-Londono, Luis F Montoya-Londono, Deirdre Moody, Erin Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Dylan Moran, Ellen Moran, Kevin Moran, Michael Moran, Ryan Moran, Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Eileen M Morello(individually, as surviving spouse of Steven Morello), Eileen M Morello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Morello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Steven Morello), Steven Morello, Dahlia Morris, Horace Morris(individually, as surviving spouse of Odessa V. Morris), Horace Morris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Odessa V. Morris, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Odessa V. Morris), Jan-Sheri Morris, Keith Morris, Alyssa Morrone, Ferdinand Morrone, Gregory Morrone, Linda Morrone(individually, as surviving spouse of Ferdinand Morrone), Linda Morrone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ferdinand Morrone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ferdinand Morrone), Joseph Moussa, Mazen Moussa, Michael Moussa, Yvette Moussa, Andre Mowatt, Andrea Mowatt(individually, as surviving parent of Damion Mowatt), Andrea Mowatt(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Damion Mowatt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Damion Mowatt), Deval Mowatt, Devon Mowatt, Anne Muldowney, Brian Muldowney, Kevin Muldowney, Mary Muldowney, Timothy Muldowney, Brian Mulligan, Kevin Mulligan, Michael Mulligan, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis M. Mulligan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(individually, as surviving sibling of Dennis M. Mulligan), Masako Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick J. Murphy), Masako Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick J. Murphy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick J. Murphy), Mitchell Murphy, Mona OConnor, Kim Racklin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Moran), Kim Racklin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Moran), Maria Revilla(individually, as surviving spouse of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Maria Revilla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Jessica Spiers, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Donna Velazquez. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16077764)Document filed by Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Brian Mulligan, Raffaela Modafferi, Winford F Lamb, Michael Moussa, Maria Revilla(individually, as surviving spouse of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Kevin Muldowney, Stacey Montoya(individually, as surviving spouse of Carlos A. Montoya), Elaine Moccia(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank V. Moccia), George Jebrine, Katherine Miller, Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Eileen M Morello(individually, as surviving spouse of Steven Morello), Mary Muldowney, Yvette Moussa, Stacey Montoya(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos A. Montoya, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carlos A. Montoya), Mitchell Murphy, Alfia L Gilligan, Horace Morris(individually, as surviving spouse of Odessa V. Morris), Frank Moccia, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Mulligan, Jacqueline Milam(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Major Ronald D. Milam, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Major Ronald D. Milam), Magarita Londono de Montoya, Jessica Moody, Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of RDM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Andrea Mowatt(individually, as surviving parent of Damion Mowatt), Michael Moran, Patricia Mulligan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis M. Mulligan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Dennis M. Mulligan), Masako Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick J. Murphy), Devon Mowatt, Gregory Morrone, Jaime Montoya-Londono, Ryan Moran, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Keith Morris, Jessica Spiers, Sherwin Morales, Jacqueline Milam(as Natural Guardian of MM, a minor, as surviving child of Major Ronald D. Milam), Laurie Miller(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas C. Miller, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Douglas C. Miller), Timothy Muldowney, Ellen Moran Brennan, Jan-Sheri Morris, Eileen M Morello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Morello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Steven Morello), Joseph Moussa, Ferdinand Morrone, Kevin Moran, Patricia Mulligan(individually, as surviving sibling of Dennis M. Mulligan), Deval Mowatt, Elaine Moccia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank V. Moccia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank V. Moccia), Horace Morris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Odessa V. Morris, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Odessa V. Morris), Steven Morello, Linda Morrone(individually, as surviving spouse of Ferdinand Morrone), Mazen Moussa, Linda Morrone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ferdinand Morrone, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ferdinand Morrone), Donna Velazquez, Queen Mercer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Wesley Mercer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Wesley Mercer), Queen Mercer(individually, as surviving spouse of Wesley Mercer), Kevin Mulligan, Luis F Montoya-Londono, Brian Muldowney, Mercedes Hernandez Molina(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Manuel De Jesus Molina, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Gilberto Montoya-Londono, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Anne Muldowney, Andre Mowatt, Laurie Miller(individually, as surviving spouse of Douglas C. Miller), Dahlia Morris, Alyssa Morrone, Dylan Moran, Mercedes Hernandez Molina(individually, as surviving spouse of Manuel De Jesus Molina), Mona OConnor, Andrea Mowatt(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Damion Mowatt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Damion Mowatt), Patricia Codispoti, Portia Morales, Kim Racklin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Moran), Anthony Modafferi, Rachel Miller, Mary Cooper(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth M. Parker, deceased, the late sibling of Wesley Mercer), Colleen Andello, Deirdre Moody, Linda Loran, Masako Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick J. Murphy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patrick J. Murphy), Jacqueline Milam(individually, as surviving spouse of Major Ronald D. Milam), Ellen Moran, Kim Racklin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Moran), Maria Revilla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luis Clodoaldo Revilla Mier), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Jackie J Mercer, Erin Moody, Sean Moody, Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Mary Cooper(individually, as surviving sibling of Wesley Mercer).(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercer et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Modafferi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferdinand Morrone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Morales
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deval Mowatt
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Mowatt
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan-Sheri Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Morrone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Mercer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Morales-Guerrero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Moussa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Moran Brennan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Hernandez Molina
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winford F Lamb
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Revilla
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mulligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfia L Gilligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Murphy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moussa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moussa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie J Mercer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona OConnor
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Milam
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Montoya-Londono
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Montoya-Londono
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Morrone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin Morales
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazen Moussa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Andello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Codispoti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Moccia
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masako Murphy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Mowatt
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Moccia
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen M Morello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Miller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Spiers
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Morrone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jebrine
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magarita Londono de Montoya
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Miller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Morello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petal S Stanford-Sylvert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Montoya
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dahlia Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Racklin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mulligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mulligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffaela Modafferi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cooper
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Loran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mulligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Mowatt
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Moody-Theinert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Velazquez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis F Montoya-Londono
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?