QBE Insurance Corporation v. Broan-Nutone LLC et al
Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Jakel Motors Incorporated and Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv12035
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION IS MISSING THE APPROPRIATE LANGUAGE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.3.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit)(Zielinski, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 (ma).
February 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16357471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit/Declaration missing per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16357471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zielinski, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/15/2019 (bcu).
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RBC Horizon Corporation, Inc., Corporate Parent Regal Beloit Corporation for Jakel Motors Incorporated. Document filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated.(Rowin, Marc)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marc Rowin to RE-FILE Document #15 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Patrick Lynch on behalf of Broan-Nutone LLC. (Lynch, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone LLC. Document filed by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Rowin, Marc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Regal Beloit America, Inc. for Jakel Motors Incorporated. Document filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated.(Rowin, Marc) Modified on 2/4/2019 (lb).
February 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENTS - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marc Rowin to RE-FILE Documents #13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file these documents and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Rowin, Marc) Modified on 2/1/2019 (lb).
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated.(Rowin, Marc) Modified on 2/1/2019 (lb).
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Rowin, Marc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jakel Motors Incorporated served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Grear, Kenneth)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Broan-Nutone LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Grear, Kenneth)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been designated an electronic case and has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are required to promptly register as filing "USERS" in accordance with the procedure for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to attend a conference at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures, and to furnish chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Wednesday, March 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/19) (yv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jakel Motors Incorporated. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED n/k/a and/or d/b/a JAKEL INCORPORATED, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Grear, Kenneth)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grear, Kenneth)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Brian Grear to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested is incorrect on the docket entry text for Document No. #4 . Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Broan-Nutone LLC. (pne)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Brian Grear. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: QBE Insurance Corporation, Jakel Motors Incorporated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 21, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Brian Grear to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet can not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED n/k/a and/or d/b/a JAKEL INCORPORATED, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Grear, Kenneth) Modified on 12/21/2018 (pne).
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BROAN NUTONE, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Grear, Kenneth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited for QBE Insurance Corporation. Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Grear, Kenneth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16088188)Document filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grear, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QBE Insurance Corporation v. Broan-Nutone LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakel Motors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Lynch
Represented By: Marc Rowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Grear
Represented By: Jeffrey Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?