Williams v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams
Defendant: United States, Illinois Dept. of Rev., U.S. Department of Treasury, IRS; SSA, NY Dept. of State, Fitted Sole, LLC, Kings Co., Maryland Admin. Office of the Courts, U.S. Department of Justice, Dept. of Public Safety, Rockefeller GP. Int., Inc., Fitted Sole Clothing Co., PSW NYC, LLC, White Plains Dept. of Public Safety, Tishman Speyer Crown Eqp, LLC, Blackrock, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., NYC MTA, Amal. life Insurance Co., Walker & Dunlp Cap, LLC, UBS AG, U.S. Postal Service, Blackstone Adv. Partners, LP, Borah, Goldstein, Altschaier, Nahins & Godel, P.C., Aviom R. Vann, P.C., NY Times Fed., Tishman Speyer Crown, Esq., LLC, NYC Dept. of Homeless Services, Bank of Amer, NA, Credit Union, U.S. Dept. of Trans., U.S. Department of Labor, Dept. of Homeless Serv., FMR, LLC, Google, Inc., White Plains Hosp., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Statefarm Life Insurance, Co., Pershing, LLC, NY Times Co., Fortress Investment Grp. LLC, Compass Rock Re, LLC, Pershing Sq. Hldgs, Ltd., Fortress Investment Grp, LLC, NYS Dept. of Trans., NY Sup. Ct., NYPD, U.S. Dept. of Justice and Breaking Ground
Case Number: 1:2018cv12064
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING;re: for Permission for Steven Talbert Williams to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER from C. Steven Talbert Williams, re: MISSING FROM DOCKET 18-CV-12064, FILED 1/7/19. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 14, 2019 Received returned mail re: #5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #4 Order of Dismissal. Mail was addressed to Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams, General Delivery Services, 333 1st Avenue, NY, NY 10003 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender not Deliverable as Addressed unable to Forward. (vn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION; re: to Separate & Title the Exhibits of Doc. 12. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from C. Steven Talbert Williams, dated 1/14/19 re: Plaintiff writes that he seeks to have the IFP status renewed for the appellate trial of Dock. No. 19-39(2nd Cir.Ct.) where such redaction (originally granted by Hon. C. McMahon, on 12/21/18; Doc. "6" of 18cv12064) as currently delayed court processes to serve all of the defendants upon PACER(including numerous defendants excluded from the appellate court's docket). Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 11, 2019 Received returned mail re: #6 Order Granting IFP Application. Mail was addressed to Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams, General Delivery Services, 333 1st Avenue, NY, NY 10003 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender no such number unable to forward. (vn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION; re: See "Emergency Motion to Direct the Clerk to Perform Duty (Not All Defendants on Docket)" - To compel Pro Se Intake Unit of SDNY to perform duties of logging in all named defendants onto the docket"(28:1361) may incur lashes for proof of service and dismissal of travel. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT NOS. 1, 2, & 3 In association with: "Complaint" (Form) Etc. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Steven T. Williams IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT, PART III In Association with "Notice of Appeal" Etc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams. (sc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from C. Steven Talbert Williams, dated 1/3/19 re: UPDATED TITLE PAGE TO "MOTION FOR FED.R.CIV.P. 60". Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Steven T. Williams IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT("PART II")In Association with: "Notice of Appeal" Etc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams. (sc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from C. Steven Talbert Williams, dated 1/3/19 re: AFFIDAVIT (IN PARTS) AND IFP STATUS FOR PRINTING OF DOCUMENTS. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
January 3, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
January 3, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
January 2, 2019 Appeal Remark as to #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams. IFP DENIED 12/26/2018. LITIGANT INSISTED ON FILING TWO SEPARATE NOA'S. EACH NOA HAS OTHER DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO IT. NOA #2 IS ATTACHED TO THE FIRST. (tp)
January 2, 2019 Appeal Fee Due: for #8 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 1/16/2019. (tp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #4 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP, #2 Notice of Appeal 2, #3 Application for IFP) (tp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Steven T. Williams IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT ("Part 1"); re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document)(sc)
December 27, 2018 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application to Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams General Delivery Services 333 1st Avenue NY, NY 10003. (aea)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued December 26, 2018, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/26/2018) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package)(mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/26/2018) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 21, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #6 Order Granting IFP Application, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rdz)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/21/2018) (rdz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from C. Steven Talbert Williams, dated 12/22/18 re: NATURE OF SUIT & DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(sc)
December 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against IRS; SSA, Illinois Dept. of Rev., U.S. Department of Treasury, United States. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(rdz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Dept. of Rev.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS; SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Dept. of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitted Sole, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Admin. Office of the Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockefeller GP. Int., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitted Sole Clothing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSW NYC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Plains Dept. of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Speyer Crown Eqp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC MTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amal. life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker & Dunlp Cap, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Adv. Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borah, Goldstein, Altschaier, Nahins & Godel, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviom R. Vann, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Times Fed.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Speyer Crown, Esq., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Dept. of Homeless Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Amer, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Trans.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Homeless Serv.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Plains Hosp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statefarm Life Insurance, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pershing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Times Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Investment Grp. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Rock Re, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pershing Sq. Hldgs, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Investment Grp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Dept. of Trans.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Sup. Ct.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Ground
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cestui Que Steven Talbert Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?