Steadfast Financial LP et al v. Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF et al
Plaintiff: Steadfast Financial LP and Steadfast Capital Management LP
Defendant: Martin Franke, Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF, Marco Bernecker, Steadfast Capital GP S.a.r.l., Nick Money-Kyrle, Neil Synnott, James Homer, Justin Partington and Steadfast Capital GmbH
Case Number: 1:2018cv12079
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Nick Money-Kyrle served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP ; Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. James Homer served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP ; Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Martin Franke served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP ; Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Steadfast Capital GmbH served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP ; Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Franke. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marco Bernecker. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Homer. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nick Money-Kyrle. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steadfast Capital GmbH. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steadfast Capital GP S.a.r.l.. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Partington. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neil Synnott. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin Franke, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marco Bernecker, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Homer, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nick Money-Kyrle, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steadfast Capital GmbH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steadfast Capital GP S.a.r.l., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Partington, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neil Synnott, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP.(Pearson, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marco Bernecker, Martin Franke, James Homer, Nick Money-Kyrle, Justin Partington, Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF, Steadfast Capital GP S.a.r.l., Steadfast Capital GmbH, Neil Synnott. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16092399)Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pearson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadfast Financial LP et al v. Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Capital Fund IV SCS, SICAV-RAIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Bernecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Capital GP S.a.r.l.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Money-Kyrle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Synnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Partington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Capital GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Financial LP
Represented By: Lisa Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Capital Management LP
Represented By: Lisa Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?