Perez-Zapata et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Joseph Pignataro, Catherine Phillips, Michael Potts, Juan Rivero, Nanci Siguencia, Orlando Rodriguez, Anthony Polenzo, Manuel Rodriguez, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Edgardo Rodriguez, Gene Ritter, Anthony Porrata, Patrick Rocco, Michael Plate, Zelda Riddick, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Luz Rodriguez, Beth Ritter, Howard Pincus, Willie Richardson, Freddy Pineda, Napoleon Pina, David Roman, Liza Rodriguez, Fabian Ringrisaca, Robert Petti, Janet Pohlmann, Michael Rizzo, Jose Rivera, Robert Rivera, Miriam Piretti, Cesar Rios, Edwin Rivera, Nicholas Polidoro, Christopher Roberts, Mark Perillo, John Rodriguez, Steven Pilla, James Polanco, George Richards, Jr., Peter Rogers, James Powers, Steven Rodriguez, Marc Riccio, Linda Roberts, John Ring, Victor Rivera, Pat Petito, Peter Potapchuk, Alfonso Riera, Louis Planas, Jr., Diana Rohan, Charles Rice, John Ponce, Julio Roman, George Perli, Maria Rivera, Steven Poulos, Joseph Pica, Andrew Pisani, Linda Piazza, David Perez-Zapata, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Lucia Rivera, David Riegel, Angel Roldan, Scott Roberts, Rosa Rodriguez, Napoleon Rodriguez, Michael Pluchino, Zenon Piotrowski, Gabriel Sikorjak, Jeffrey Rivera, Thomas Rindos, Philip J Rogan, Gerald Robinson, Richard Riccardi, Enzo Piazza, Joseph Piraino, Joseph Petrella, Virginia Rigby, Rafael Rivera, Andre Pierre-Louis, Christopher Rogers, Edwin Rodriguez, Angelo Rodriguez, Mirian Rodriguez, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Tony Pizarro, Jesus Pina, Michael Robles, James Petrosino, Nicholas Polacco, Marques Rios, Michael Piecuch and Frank Polito
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12100
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by David Perez-Zapata, Mark Perillo, George Perli, Pat Petito, Joseph Petrella, James Petrosino, Robert Petti, Catherine Phillips, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Enzo Piazza, Linda Piazza, Joseph Pica, Michael Piecuch, Andre Pierre-Louis, Joseph Pignataro, Steven Pilla, Jesus Pina, Napoleon Pina, Howard Pincus, Freddy Pineda, Zenon Piotrowski, Joseph Piraino, Miriam Piretti, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Andrew Pisani, Tony Pizarro, Louis Planas, Jr., Michael Plate, Michael Pluchino, Janet Pohlmann, Nicholas Polacco, James Polanco, Anthony Polenzo, Nicholas Polidoro, Frank Polito, John Ponce, Anthony Porrata, Peter Potapchuk, Michael Potts, Steven Poulos, James Powers, Richard Riccardi, Marc Riccio, Charles Rice, George Richards, Jr., Willie Richardson, Zelda Riddick, David Riegel, Alfonso Riera, Virginia Rigby, Thomas Rindos, John Ring, Fabian Ringrisaca, Cesar Rios, Marques Rios, Beth Ritter, Gene Ritter, Edwin Rivera, Jeffrey Rivera, Jose Rivera, Lucia Rivera, Maria Rivera, Rafael Rivera, Robert Rivera, Victor Rivera, Juan Rivero, Michael Rizzo, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Christopher Roberts, Linda Roberts, Scott Roberts, Gerald Robinson, Michael Robles, Patrick Rocco, Angelo Rodriguez, Edgardo Rodriguez, Edwin Rodriguez, John Rodriguez, Liza Rodriguez, Luz Rodriguez, Manuel Rodriguez, Mirian Rodriguez, Napoleon Rodriguez, Orlando Rodriguez, Rosa Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Philip J Rogan, Christopher Rogers, Peter Rogers, Diana Rohan, Angel Roldan, David Roman, Julio Roman, Nanci Siguencia, Gabriel Sikorjak. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/26/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by David Perez-Zapata, Mark Perillo, George Perli, Pat Petito, Joseph Petrella, James Petrosino, Robert Petti, Catherine Phillips, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Enzo Piazza, Linda Piazza, Joseph Pica, Michael Piecuch, Andre Pierre-Louis, Joseph Pignataro, Steven Pilla, Jesus Pina, Napoleon Pina, Howard Pincus, Freddy Pineda, Zenon Piotrowski, Joseph Piraino, Miriam Piretti, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Andrew Pisani, Tony Pizarro, Louis Planas, Jr., Michael Plate, Michael Pluchino, Janet Pohlmann, Nicholas Polacco, James Polanco, Anthony Polenzo, Nicholas Polidoro, Frank Polito, John Ponce, Anthony Porrata, Peter Potapchuk, Michael Potts, Steven Poulos, James Powers, Richard Riccardi, Marc Riccio, Charles Rice, George Richards, Jr., Willie Richardson, Zelda Riddick, David Riegel, Alfonso Riera, Virginia Rigby, Thomas Rindos, John Ring, Fabian Ringrisaca, Cesar Rios, Marques Rios, Beth Ritter, Gene Ritter, Edwin Rivera, Jeffrey Rivera, Jose Rivera, Lucia Rivera, Maria Rivera, Rafael Rivera, Robert Rivera, Victor Rivera, Juan Rivero, Michael Rizzo, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Christopher Roberts, Linda Roberts, Scott Roberts, Gerald Robinson, Michael Robles, Patrick Rocco, Angelo Rodriguez, Edgardo Rodriguez, Edwin Rodriguez, John Rodriguez, Liza Rodriguez, Luz Rodriguez, Manuel Rodriguez, Mirian Rodriguez, Napoleon Rodriguez, Orlando Rodriguez, Rosa Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Philip J Rogan, Christopher Rogers, Peter Rogers, Diana Rohan, Angel Roldan, David Roman, Julio Roman, Nanci Siguencia, Gabriel Sikorjak.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/26/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by David Perez-Zapata, Mark Perillo, George Perli, Pat Petito, Joseph Petrella, James Petrosino, Robert Petti, Catherine Phillips, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Enzo Piazza, Linda Piazza, Joseph Pica, Michael Piecuch, Andre Pierre-Louis, Joseph Pignataro, Steven Pilla, Jesus Pina, Napoleon Pina, Howard Pincus, Freddy Pineda, Zenon Piotrowski, Joseph Piraino, Miriam Piretti, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Andrew Pisani, Tony Pizarro, Louis Planas, Jr., Michael Plate, Michael Pluchino, Janet Pohlmann, Nicholas Polacco, James Polanco, Anthony Polenzo, Nicholas Polidoro, Frank Polito, John Ponce, Anthony Porrata, Peter Potapchuk, Michael Potts, Steven Poulos, James Powers, Richard Riccardi, Marc Riccio, Charles Rice, George Richards, Jr., Willie Richardson, Zelda Riddick, David Riegel, Alfonso Riera, Virginia Rigby, Thomas Rindos, John Ring, Fabian Ringrisaca, Cesar Rios, Marques Rios, Beth Ritter, Gene Ritter, Edwin Rivera, Jeffrey Rivera, Jose Rivera, Lucia Rivera, Maria Rivera, Rafael Rivera, Robert Rivera, Victor Rivera, Juan Rivero, Michael Rizzo, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Christopher Roberts, Linda Roberts, Scott Roberts, Gerald Robinson, Michael Robles, Patrick Rocco, Angelo Rodriguez, Edgardo Rodriguez, Edwin Rodriguez, John Rodriguez, Liza Rodriguez, Luz Rodriguez, Manuel Rodriguez, Mirian Rodriguez, Napoleon Rodriguez, Orlando Rodriguez, Rosa Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Philip J Rogan, Christopher Rogers, Peter Rogers, Diana Rohan, Angel Roldan, David Roman, Julio Roman, Nanci Siguencia, Gabriel Sikorjak.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by David Perez-Zapata, Mark Perillo, George Perli, Pat Petito, Joseph Petrella, James Petrosino, Robert Petti, Catherine Phillips, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Enzo Piazza, Linda Piazza, Joseph Pica, Michael Piecuch, Andre Pierre-Louis, Joseph Pignataro, Steven Pilla, Jesus Pina, Napoleon Pina, Howard Pincus, Freddy Pineda, Zenon Piotrowski, Joseph Piraino, Miriam Piretti, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Andrew Pisani, Tony Pizarro, Louis Planas, Jr., Michael Plate, Michael Pluchino, Janet Pohlmann, Nicholas Polacco, James Polanco, Anthony Polenzo, Nicholas Polidoro, Frank Polito, John Ponce, Anthony Porrata, Peter Potapchuk, Michael Potts, Steven Poulos, James Powers, Richard Riccardi, Marc Riccio, Charles Rice, George Richards, Jr., Willie Richardson, Zelda Riddick, David Riegel, Alfonso Riera, Virginia Rigby, Thomas Rindos, John Ring, Fabian Ringrisaca, Cesar Rios, Marques Rios, Beth Ritter, Gene Ritter, Edwin Rivera, Jeffrey Rivera, Jose Rivera, Lucia Rivera, Maria Rivera, Rafael Rivera, Robert Rivera, Victor Rivera, Juan Rivero, Michael Rizzo, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Christopher Roberts, Linda Roberts, Scott Roberts, Gerald Robinson, Michael Robles, Patrick Rocco, Angelo Rodriguez, Edgardo Rodriguez, Edwin Rodriguez, John Rodriguez, Liza Rodriguez, Luz Rodriguez, Manuel Rodriguez, Mirian Rodriguez, Napoleon Rodriguez, Orlando Rodriguez, Rosa Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Philip J Rogan, Christopher Rogers, Peter Rogers, Diana Rohan, Angel Roldan, David Roman, Julio Roman, Nanci Siguencia, Gabriel Sikorjak.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16106371)Document filed by Anthony Polenzo, James Polanco, Milagro Rodriguez-Frank, Maria Rivera, Zenon Piotrowski, Christopher Roberts, Robert Petti, Mirian Rodriguez, Tony Pizarro, Gabriel Sikorjak, Napoleon Pina, Linda Roberts, Steven Pilla, Charles Rice, Marques Rios, Edgardo Rodriguez, Gerald Robinson, Louis Planas, Jr., Angel Roldan, Gene Ritter, Lucia Rivera, Freddy Pineda, Christopher Rogers, Angelo Rodriguez, Linda Piazza, Nicholas Polacco, Frank Polito, Enzo Piazza, Philip J Rogan, Napoleon Rodriguez, David Riegel, Manuel Rodriguez, Peter Rogers, Luz Rodriguez, Edwin Rivera, Michael Pluchino, Virginia Rigby, Michael Potts, Robert Rivera, Julio Roman, Rafael Rivera, James Powers, Joseph Pica, Joseph Pignataro, Steven Rodriguez, John Ring, Beth Ritter, Scott Roberts, George Richards, Jr., Liza Rodriguez, Patrick Rocco, Howard Pincus, Victor Rivera, Cesar Rios, Jose Rivera, Maritza Robero-Pizzanez, Juan Rivero, Mark Perillo, Jesus Pina, David Perez-Zapata, Janet Pohlmann, John Rodriguez, Andrew Pisani, Michael Plate, Orlando Rodriguez, Michael Robles, Steven Poulos, Andre Pierre-Louis, Michael Rizzo, Jeffrey Rivera, Alfonso Riera, Enrico Pirro, Jr., Fabian Ringrisaca, Rosa Rodriguez, Joseph Piraino, Richard Riccardi, Willie Richardson, Miriam Piretti, Michael Piecuch, David Roman, James Petrosino, Edwin Rodriguez, George Perli, John Ponce, Diana Rohan, Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson, Thomas Rindos, Zelda Riddick, Catherine Phillips, Peter Potapchuk, Nanci Siguencia, Pat Petito, Nicholas Polidoro, Anthony Porrata, Marc Riccio, Joseph Petrella. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/31/2018. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Zapata et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pignataro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Phillips
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Potts
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rivero
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanci Siguencia
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Polenzo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Pirro, Jr.
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Ritter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Porrata
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Rocco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Plate
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelda Riddick
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagro Rodriguez-Frank
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Ritter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Pincus
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Richardson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Pineda
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon Pina
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Roman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Ringrisaca
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Petti
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Pohlmann
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rizzo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Piretti
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Rios
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Polidoro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Roberts
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Perillo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Pilla
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Polanco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Richards, Jr.
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Rogers
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Powers
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Riccio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Roberts
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ring
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Petito
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Potapchuk
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Riera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Planas, Jr.
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rohan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rice
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ponce
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Roman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Perli
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Poulos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pica
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pisani
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Piazza
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Perez-Zapata
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Robero-Pizzanez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Riegel
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Roldan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Roberts
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pluchino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenon Piotrowski
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Sikorjak
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rindos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J Rogan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Robinson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Riccardi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enzo Piazza
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Piraino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Petrella
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Rigby
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Rivera
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Pierre-Louis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rogers
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirian Rodriguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Phillipson-Thompson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Pizarro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Pina
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robles
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Petrosino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Polacco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marques Rios
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Piecuch
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Polito
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?