RL 900 Park, LLC v. Ender et al
Plaintiff: RL 900 Park, LLC
Defendant: Joan Mann, Monique Ender Silberman, Danuta Maryiak, Simone Ender, Jack Mann, Brigette Laing, Unkown Tenant in Possession # 2 and Unknown Tenant in Possession # 1
Case Number: 1:2018cv12121
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #55 Response to Motion, filed by Jack Mann, Joan Mann. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. Counsel for Defendants Jack and Joan Mann shall appear at any conference held in this case for as long as they remain defendants. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/15/2019) (cf)
February 12, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re: #49 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: Set/Reset Deadlines, #28 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, #10 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: #1 Complaint, . . Declaration of Jason L. Libou, Esq.. Document filed by Jack Mann, Joan Mann. (Libou, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of DE 26 Order; DE 27 Initial Pretrial Order and DE 28 Order Regarding Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Danuta Maryiak on January 16, 2019. Service was accepted by Danuta Maryiak. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of DE 26 Order; DE 27 Initial Pretrial Order and DE 28 Order Regarding Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Monique Ender Silberman on January 18, 2019. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of DE 26 Order; DE 27 Initial Pretrial Order and DE 28 Order Regarding Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Joan Mann on January 18, 2019. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of DE 26 Order; DE 27 Initial Pretrial Order and DE 28 Order Regarding Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Jack Mann on Janaury 18, 2019. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of DE 26 Order; DE 27 Initial Pretrial Order and DE 28 Order Regarding Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Simone Ender on January 18, 2019. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: Set/Reset Deadlines, #28 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, #10 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: #1 Complaint, . . Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slade, Roger)
February 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Roger Slade to RE-FILE Document #48 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: Set/Reset Deadlines, #28 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #10 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: #1 Complaint . ERROR(S): No Case Number on PDF. (db)
February 11, 2019 Filing 48 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: Set/Reset Deadlines, #28 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, #10 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: #1 Complaint, . . Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC.(Slade, Roger) Modified on 2/11/2019 (db).
February 6, 2019 Filing 47 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Monique Ender Silberman. (km)
February 5, 2019 Filing 46 AFFIRMATION of Roger Slade, Esq. in Support re: #1 Complaint, #33 Affidavit of Service Other,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 5, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #12 Complaint,. Document filed by Jack Mann, Joan Mann.(Libou, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #12 Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against Simone Ender, Monique Ender Silberman. Document filed by Danuta Maryiak.(Wamser, Val)
January 28, 2019 Filing 42 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Simone Ender. (km)
January 25, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIRMATION of ROGER SLADE, ESQ re: #40 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Roger Slade. RE-FILE Document No. #40 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): An affidavit in support needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km)
January 25, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #38 Letter Motion for Conference. DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/24/2019) (ks)
January 23, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #27 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Appear Telephonically addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Roger Slade dated January 23, 2019. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC.(Slade, Roger)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #36 Letter filed by Jack Mann, Joan Mann, Jack Mann answer due 2/5/2019; Joan Mann answer due 2/5/2019. Defendants respectfully requests Court approval of an extension of time to February 5, 2019 to respond to the complaint herein. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/22/2019) (js)
January 22, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jason L. Libou dated 1/22/2019 re: Request for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Answer. Document filed by Jack Mann, Joan Mann.(Libou, Jason)
January 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Val Edmund Wamser on behalf of Danuta Maryiak. (Wamser, Val)
January 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Louis Libou on behalf of Jack Mann, Joan Mann. (Libou, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons,Verified Complaint, Notice to Tenant of Foreclosure Action, Notice of Pendency, Motion for Assignement of Rents served on Monique Ender Silberman on December 31, 2018. Service was accepted by Monique Ender Silberman, personally. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 16, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons,Verified Complaint, Notice to Tenant of Foreclosure Action, Notice of Pendency, Motion for Assignement of Rents served on Joan Mann on January 2, 2019. Service was accepted by Jon Doe, Concierge. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 16, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons,Verified Complaint, Notice to Tenant of Foreclosure Action, Notice of Pendency, Motion for Assignement of Rents served on Jack Mann on January 2, 2019. Service was accepted by John Doe, Concierge. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 16, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Notice to Tenant of Foreclosure Action, Verified Complaint, Notice of Pendency, Motion for Assignment of Rent served on Simone Ender on December 27, 2018. Service was accepted by Simone Ender, persoanlly. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 16, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Verified Complaint, Notice of Pendency, Motion for Assignment of Rents served on Danuta Maryiak on December 29, 2018. Service was accepted by Danuta Maryiak, Personally. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
January 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for assignment of rents due by 2/11/2019. Defendants Responses due by 2/25/2019. Plaintiff Replies due by 3/4/2019. Service due by 2/13/2019. (ks)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By February 11, 2019, Plaintiff shall file its motion for assignment of rents; 2. By February 25, 2019, Defendants shall file their opposition; and 3. By March 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. It is further ORDERED that by February 11, 2019, Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the complaint, this order, and the motion for assignment of rents by personal service on all Defendants. By February 13, 2019, Plaintiff shall file affidavits of such service. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/15/2019) (ks)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 12:40 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/2/2019) (cf)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/2/2019) (cf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Assignment of Rents on behalf of Plaintiff, RL 900 Park, LLC addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Roger Slade, Esq. dated December 28, 2018. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Letter to Judge Torres, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Letter to Judge Torres)(Slade, Roger)
December 27, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joan Mann. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monique Ender Silberman. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simone Ender(individually), Simone Ender(and as Executrix of the Estate of Paul Anthony Ender). (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jack Mann. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danuta Maryiak. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brigette Laing. (vf)
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MONIQUE ENDER SILBERMAN, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SIMONE ENDER, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOAN MANN, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JACK MANN, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DANUTA MARYIAK, as Guardian For EMELYE ENDER, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIGETTE LAING, re: #12 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against Simone Ender, Simone Ender, Brigette Laing, Jack Mann, Joan Mann, Danuta Maryiak, Monique Ender Silberman, Unknown Tenant in Possession # 1, Unkown Tenant in Possession # 2. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Brigette Laing, Jack Mann, Joan Mann, Danuta Maryiak, Monique Ender Silberman, Unknown Tenant in Possession # 1, Unkown Tenant in Possession # 2, Simone Ender added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Slade, Roger)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Roger Slade to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
December 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roger Slade. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RL 900 Park, LLC; Simone Ender; Danuta Maryiak. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Roger Slade to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF, (Add parties Simone Ender with party text "as the Execurtix of Paul Anthony Ender; Unknown Tenant in Possession #1; Unknown Tenant in Possession #2); not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC.(Slade, Roger)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Assignment of Rents re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slade, Roger)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Southern District of New York. Other Court Case Number: 18-cv-12121. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slade, Roger)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simone Ender, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monique Ender Silverman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joan Mann, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jack Mann, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danuta Maryiak, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brigette Laing, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Slade, Roger)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Simone Ender, Brigette Laing, Jack Mann, Joan Mann, Danuta Maryiak, Monique Ender Silberman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16097746)Document filed by RL 900 Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Slade, Roger) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RL 900 Park, LLC v. Ender et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Mann
Represented By: Jason Louis Libou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Ender Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danuta Maryiak
Represented By: Val Edmund Wamser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simone Ender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Mann
Represented By: Jason Louis Libou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigette Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Tenant in Possession # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant in Possession # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RL 900 Park, LLC
Represented By: Roger Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?