Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al v. Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488 et al
Plaintiff: Superior Guaranty Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Superior Guaranty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., Lloyds Syndicate AGM 2488, Lloyds Syndicate NVA 2007, U.S. Specialty Insurance Co., Lloyds Syndicate BRT 2987, Lloyds Syndicate PEM 4000, Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488, Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000, Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007 and Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987
Case Number: 1:2018cv12122
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Moving Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/28/19. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra)
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from J. Michael Lewis, Esq. dated 02/12/2019. Document filed by Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488, Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987, Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007, Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000.(Lewis, Joseph)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/30/2019) (ama)
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of of Filing Supplement to Complaint Pursuant to Order Dated January 9, 2019 re: #22 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Complaint Pursuant to Order dated January 9, 2019, #2 Exhibit 1 to Supplement)(Ellison, John)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Aspen Insurance UK Ltd. answer due 2/15/2019; Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488 answer due 2/15/2019; Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987 answer due 2/15/2019; Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007 answer due 2/15/2019; Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000 answer due 2/15/2019. (yv)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The foregoing extension request is granted. DE #23 resolved. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/22/19) (yv)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: U.S. Specialty Insurance Co. answer due 2/15/2019. (ama)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The foregoing extension request is Granted. DE # 24 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/22/2019) (ama)
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Todd Bromberg dated 1/18/2019. Document filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Co..(Bromberg, Todd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from J. Michael Lewis, Esq. dated January 17, 2019. Document filed by Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488, Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987, Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007, Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000.(Lewis, Joseph)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: ORDERED, that plaintiff shall, no later than January 25, 2019, file and serve a Supplement to the Complaint containing factual allegations sufficient to demonstrate a basis for subject matter jurisdiction in this Court or otherwise show cause in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED., ( Service due by 1/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/09/2019) (ama)
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Co. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aspen Insurance UK Ltd.. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Norig Ellison to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff party name error in summons caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
December 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Norig Ellison. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Superior Guaranty Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellison, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vf).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ellison, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (NYSE:WFCm) for Superior Guaranty Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Ellison, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aspen Insurance UK Ltd., Lloyds Syndicate AGM 2488, Lloyds Syndicate BRT 2987, Lloyds Syndicate NVA 2007, Lloyds Syndicate PEM 4000, U.S. Specialty Insurance Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16097841)Document filed by Superior Guaranty Insurance Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Superior Guaranty Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Reinsurance Policy))(Ellison, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al v. Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Insurance UK Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate AGM 2488
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate NVA 2007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Todd Andrew Bromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate BRT 2987
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate PEM 4000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate AGM 2488
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate PEM 4000
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate NVA 2007
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate BRT 2987
Represented By: Joseph Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Norig Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Norig Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Guaranty Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Norig Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?