NetSoc, LLC v. LinkedIn Corporation

Plaintiff: NETSOC, LLC
Defendant: LINKEDIN CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv12215
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LinkedIn Corporation. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE MARCH 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
February 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16360927. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Christopher Kao dated 2-15-19. Document filed by LinkedIn Corporation.(Kao, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16360927. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Ramey, William)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LinkedIn Corporation. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Kao on behalf of LinkedIn Corporation. New Address: Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP, 4 Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor, San Francisco, CA, USA 94111, 415-983-1159. (Kao, Christopher)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Christopher Kao dated 1-23-19. Document filed by LinkedIn Corporation.(Kao, Christopher)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kao on behalf of LinkedIn Corporation. (Kao, Christopher)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. LinkedIn Corporation served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Hoffman, David)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hoffman, David)
January 2, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC.(Ramey, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramey, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LinkedIn Corporation. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The PDF is not complete. Please complete the following sections:CAUSE OF ACTION; BASIS OF JURISDICTION; COURTHOUSE ASSIGNMENT; SIGNATURE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD. Only complete the CITIZENSHIP OF PRINCIPAL PARTIES if the Basis of Jurisdiction in Diversity. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NETSOC, LLC ; LINKEDIN CORPORATION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LINKEDIN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NETSOC, LLC. (Hoffman, David)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hoffman, David)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LINKEDIN CORPORATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-16107702)Document filed by NETSOC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetSoc, LLC v. LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINKEDIN CORPORATION
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETSOC, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?