Hemenway et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Vernessa Richard, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Ana Pascual Ortiz, John Doe 35, John Doe 41, Cleveland B. John, Juan Lopez Reyes, Dorothy Ogren, Orwyn John, John Doe 45, Carmen Yosef Lopez, John Doe 47, Jane Doe 50, Robert Murray, Dolores Lara, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr., Vernon A. Richard, II, Diego Lopez Reyes, Flor Lopez Pascual, Stefan Hemenway, Karen Barrett, Raquel Lopez Pascual, John Doe 33, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Shirley Hemenway, John Doe 28, Desiree Hemenway, Cristobal Lopez, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 31, Carolyn LaFrance, Joan M. Houston, John Doe 39, Lance Edward Ogren, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Jessica Leduc, John Doe 52, John Doe 40, Janet Lopez Pascual, Robert T. Ogren, Anthony Mancini, Anna Ledee, Jean Oitice, Christopher Kloepfer, John Doe 36, Marinella Hemenway, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Clint Quappe, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, John Doe 44, John Doe 46, Anastasia Mancini, Alexis John Leduc, Showkatara Sharif, Jose Liz, John Doe 49, Terilyn Patrick Esse, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, John Doe 51, John Doe 34, Arlene Miller, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves, Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Kristian G. Kincaid, John Doe 30, John Doe 32, John Doe 29, Graciela Lopez Pascual, John Doe 27, Trina Sabb, Samantha Blake, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, John Doe 38, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Sharif Chowdhury, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Kathleen Novich, Olivia Ledee Lindsey, John Doe 48, John Doe 43, Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Leslie K. Lesperance, John Doe 37, Mary Agatha South, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, Bakul Miah, Domingo Liz, Samantha Bianca Herring, Anastasia Louvelos, Terilyn Patrick and Kerene Sherica Clarke
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv12277
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, affidavit of translator (along with translations of the above documents) mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, Attn: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif on 03/27/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8606 6542 7340, c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Roberts, Melina)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, affidavit of translator (along with translations of the above documents) mailed to H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 02/20/2019 by Registered Mail tracking # RB596317555US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Roberts, Melina)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Karen Barrett, Samantha Blake, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Sharif Chowdhury, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 36, John Doe 37, John Doe 38, John Doe 39, John Doe 40, John Doe 41, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 43, John Doe 44, John Doe 45, John Doe 46, John Doe 47, John Doe 48, John Doe 49, Jane Doe 50, John Doe 51, John Doe 52, Terilyn Patrick Esse(as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, Shirley Hemenway, Stefan Hemenway, Joan M. Houston, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Cleveland B. John, Orwyn John, Kristian G. Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Christopher Kloepfer, Carolyn LaFrance, Dolores Lara, Anna Ledee, Alexis John Leduc, Jessica Leduc, Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Jose Liz(individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), Jose Liz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Carmen Yosef Lopez, Cristobal Lopez, Anastasia Mancini(individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Bakul Miah, Arlene Miller, Robert Murray, Kathleen Novich, Dorothy Ogren, Lance Edward Ogren, Robert T. Ogren, Jean Oitice, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Flor Lopez Pascual, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Janet Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Kerene Reeves(individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Diego Lopez Reyes, Juan Lopez Reyes, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Trina Sabb, Showkatara Sharif, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Mary Agatha South. (Strong, Bruce)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Maxwell on behalf of Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Karen Barrett, Samantha Blake, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Sharif Chowdhury, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 36, John Doe 37, John Doe 38, John Doe 39, John Doe 40, John Doe 41, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 43, John Doe 44, John Doe 45, John Doe 46, John Doe 47, John Doe 48, John Doe 49, Jane Doe 50, John Doe 51, John Doe 52, Terilyn Patrick Esse(as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, Shirley Hemenway, Stefan Hemenway, Joan M. Houston, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Cleveland B. John, Orwyn John, Kristian G. Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Christopher Kloepfer, Carolyn LaFrance, Dolores Lara, Anna Ledee, Alexis John Leduc, Jessica Leduc, Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Jose Liz(individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), Jose Liz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Carmen Yosef Lopez, Cristobal Lopez, Anastasia Mancini(individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Bakul Miah, Arlene Miller, Robert Murray, Kathleen Novich, Dorothy Ogren, Lance Edward Ogren, Robert T. Ogren, Jean Oitice, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Flor Lopez Pascual, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Janet Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Kerene Reeves(individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Diego Lopez Reyes, Juan Lopez Reyes, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Trina Sabb, Showkatara Sharif, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Mary Agatha South. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kanishka Agarwala on behalf of Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Karen Barrett, Samantha Blake, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Sharif Chowdhury, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 36, John Doe 37, John Doe 38, John Doe 39, John Doe 40, John Doe 41, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 43, John Doe 44, John Doe 45, John Doe 46, John Doe 47, John Doe 48, John Doe 49, Jane Doe 50, John Doe 51, John Doe 52, Terilyn Patrick Esse(as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, Shirley Hemenway, Stefan Hemenway, Joan M. Houston, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Cleveland B. John, Orwyn John, Kristian G. Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Christopher Kloepfer, Carolyn LaFrance, Dolores Lara, Anna Ledee, Alexis John Leduc, Jessica Leduc, Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Jose Liz(individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), Jose Liz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Carmen Yosef Lopez, Cristobal Lopez, Anastasia Mancini(individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Bakul Miah, Arlene Miller, Robert Murray, Kathleen Novich, Dorothy Ogren, Lance Edward Ogren, Robert T. Ogren, Jean Oitice, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Flor Lopez Pascual, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Janet Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Kerene Reeves(individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Diego Lopez Reyes, Juan Lopez Reyes, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Trina Sabb, Showkatara Sharif, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Mary Agatha South. (Agarwala, Kanishka)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Liz; Jose Liz; Anastasia Mancini; Anastasia Mancini; Terilyn Patrick; Terilyn Patrick; Terilyn Patrick; Kerene Reeves; Kerene Reeves; Samantha Blake. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $150000000000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Karen Barrett, Samantha Blake, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Sharif Chowdhury, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 36, John Doe 37, John Doe 38, John Doe 39, John Doe 40, John Doe 41, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 43, John Doe 44, John Doe 45, John Doe 46, John Doe 47, John Doe 48, John Doe 49, Jane Doe 50, John Doe 51, John Doe 52, Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, Shirley Hemenway, Stefan Hemenway, Joan M. Houston, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Cleveland B. John, Orwyn John, Kristian G. Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Christopher Kloepfer, Carolyn LaFrance, Dolores Lara, Anna Ledee, Alexis John Leduc, Jessica Leduc, Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz, individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Carmen Yosef Lopez, Cristobal Lopez, Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Bakul Miah, Arlene Miller, Robert Murray, Kathleen Novich, Dorothy Ogren, Lance Edward Ogren, Robert T. Ogren, Jean Oitice, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Flor Lopez Pascual, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Janet Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Diego Lopez Reyes, Juan Lopez Reyes, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Trina Sabb, Showkatara Sharif, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Mary Agatha South.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mirna Huerta Aguirre, Karen Barrett, Samantha Blake, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Sharif Chowdhury, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 36, John Doe 37, John Doe 38, John Doe 39, John Doe 40, John Doe 41, Jane Doe 42, John Doe 43, John Doe 44, John Doe 45, John Doe 46, John Doe 47, John Doe 48, John Doe 49, Jane Doe 50, John Doe 51, John Doe 52, Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, Shirley Hemenway, Stefan Hemenway, Joan M. Houston, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Cleveland B. John, Orwyn John, Kristian G. Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Christopher Kloepfer, Carolyn LaFrance, Dolores Lara, Anna Ledee, Alexis John Leduc, Jessica Leduc, Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz, individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Carmen Yosef Lopez, Cristobal Lopez, Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Bakul Miah, Arlene Miller, Robert Murray, Kathleen Novich, Dorothy Ogren, Lance Edward Ogren, Robert T. Ogren, Jean Oitice, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Flor Lopez Pascual, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Janet Lopez Pascual, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Natalie Quappe, Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Diego Lopez Reyes, Juan Lopez Reyes, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Trina Sabb, Showkatara Sharif, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Mary Agatha South. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16114084)Document filed by Leslie K. Lesperance(individually, as surviving child of Charles A. Lesperance), Leslie K. Lesperance(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Lesperance, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles A. Lesperance), John Doe 44, Samantha Blake, Karen Barrett, Cristobal Lopez, Kathleen Novich, John Doe 52, Janet Lopez Pascual, John Doe 35, Vernessa Richard(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Kristian G. Kincaid, Rafael Lopez Pascual, Orwyn John, John Doe 38, Bakul Miah, Graciela Lopez Pascual, Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as Natural Guardian of JJPE a/k/a JJP, a minor, as surviving child of James Patrick), John Doe 36, Arlene Miller, John Doe 49, Lance Edward Ogren, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Mary Agatha South, Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Ra), Trina Sabb, Alexis John Leduc, John Doe 37, John Doe 29, Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake, Manuela Lopez Pascual, Ana I. Peguero-Miliano, Clint Quappe, Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual, John Doe 47, Ana Pascual Ortiz, Anna Ledee, Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero, Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, individually, as surviving spouse of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), John Doe 45, Vernon A. Richard, II(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as Natural Guardian of SM, a minor, as surviving child of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), John Doe 30, John Doe 43, Cleveland B. John, Carmen Yosef Lopez, John Doe 41, Dorothy Ogren, Jane Doe 42, Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual, Mirna Huerta Aguirre, John Doe 39, John Doe 51, Natalie Quappe, Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual, Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico, Jean Oitice, Showkatara Sharif, Diego Lopez Reyes, Mariela Lopez Huerta, Juan Lopez Reyes, John Doe 27, John Doe 33, Marinella Hemenway, Kerene Reeves(aka Kerene Sherica Clarke, individually, as surviving child of Carol Rabalais a/k/a Carol South-Rabalais), Jessica Leduc, Vernon A. Richard, II(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Richard, deceased, the late spouse of Vernon A. Richard), Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, individually, as surviving spouse of James Patrick), Carolyn LaFrance, Olivia Ledee Lindsey, Flor Lopez Pascual, Terilyn Patrick Esse(a/k/a Terilyn Patrick, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Patrick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Patrick), Anastasia Mancini(a/k/a Anastasia Louvelos, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Mancini (a/k/a Frank Mancini), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Manci), John Doe 32, Robert T. Ogren, Lizeth Lopez Huerta, Jacqueline Mejia Peguero, Christopher Kloepfer, Sharif Chowdhury, Raquel Lopez Pascual, Robert Murray, Anthony Mancini(individually, as surviving sibling of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), John Doe 40, John Doe 34, John Doe 31, Jane Doe 50, Robert B. Hemenway, Sr, John Doe 46, Stefan Hemenway, Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz, individually, as surviving sibling of Nancy Liz), John Doe 48, Manuel E. Mejia Peguero, Joan M. Houston, Dolores Lara, John Doe 28, Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez, Vernessa Richard(individually, as surviving child of Vernon A. Richard), Desiree Hemenway, Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless, Jose Liz(a/k/a Domingo Liz as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jose Liz, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Nancy Liz), Anthony Mancini(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lea Sola (a/k/a Lea Mancini), deceased, the late parent of Francisco M. Mancini a/k/a Frank Mancini), Shirley Hemenway.(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemenway et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel E. Mejia Peguero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernessa Richard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mejia Peguero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Pascual Ortiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 35
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 41
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland B. John
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lopez Reyes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Ogren
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orwyn John
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 45
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Yosef Lopez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 47
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 50
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murray
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Lara
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Hemenway, Sr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon A. Richard, II
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Lopez Reyes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Hemenway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barrett
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 33
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilaja A. Shealy-Loveless
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Hemenway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 28
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Hemenway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristobal Lopez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 42
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 31
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn LaFrance
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M. Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 39
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Edward Ogren
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elvia Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Leduc
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 52
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 40
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Ogren
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mancini
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Ledee
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Oitice
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kloepfer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 36
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marinella Hemenway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariela Lopez Huerta
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Quappe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana I. Peguero-Miliano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena De La Cruz Lope Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 44
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 46
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Mancini
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis John Leduc
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showkatara Sharif
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Liz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 49
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terilyn Patrick Esse
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyl Kincaid-Noel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 51
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 34
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Miller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Quappe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerene Reeves
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Huerta Aguirre
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian G. Kincaid
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 30
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 32
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 29
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 27
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Sabb
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Blake
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizeth Lopez Huerta
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 38
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Luisa Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharif Chowdhury
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selvyn Neil Patrick Blake
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Novich
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Ledee Lindsey
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 48
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 43
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Liz-Ramirez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Miguel Mejia Peguero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Lopez Pascual
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie K. Lesperance
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 37
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Agatha South
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn "Kay" D'Amico
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakul Miah
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Liz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Bianca Herring
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Louvelos
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terilyn Patrick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerene Sherica Clarke
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?