Sorrentino et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: LOUIS SORRENTINO, Olivene Spence, Marie Lisa Sussman, Lucy Ward-Brathwaite, Michael Tricardo, Simon Steele, Daniel Tandy, Philip Wasser, Dimas Galeas, Timothy Strawman, Raymond Velez, Maria Velez, Nanci Thayer, Eunice Vilasceca, Robert Vasquez, Alanena Walker, Kathleen Springham, Nereida Trinidad, Ralph Soto, Pamela Vorillas, Aleksa Stojkovic, Martha Vargas, Lisa Stepton-Howard, Julius Suggs, Juliette Thomas, Ralph Stuart, Arlene Tanner-Glynn, Maria Vargas, Andre Walston, Ron Thomas, Eileen Trimarco, Peter John, Daniel St. Jacques, Steven Springman, Maria Troina, David Tsawy, Shirley Thompkins-Morris, Theresa Tucker, Valisha Nathan, Frank Trief, Gloria Taylor, Carol Valdez, Robert Sweetman, Huston Vaughn, Joseph F Troina, Edward Underwood, Marina Tavarez, Audrey Sutton, Jennifer Strauss, Isaiah Washington, Joanna Barnish, Stacey Torres, Milene P Soto, Shamika Stokes, Valerie Timm Hicks, Graciela Ulloa, Lawrence C Stepinski, Yuan Su, James Spencer, Eva Sweetman, Ann Valentino, Victor Torres, Jonahus Thomas, Stephen Vigilante, James Strandberg, Helen Thompson, Angelica Soto-Arche, Jovanny Velasquez, Julio Velazquez, Terrence King, Kevin Tyler, Thomas Valente, Justin Taveras, Dorita Stewart, Benjamin Taroc, Juan Tapia, Caroline Stetler, Joanne Vasquez Crespo, Howard Walvick, Sheron Stackhouse, Aguilla Steeles, Daniel Spitalnic, Kiefsa Taylor, Patricia Vigilante, Johnnie Vasquez, Linda Tegnestam, Keithlyn J Taylor, Stephanie Pagano, Julissa Vega, Zaide Touma, Frank Stone, Brenda Washington, Angel Ulloa, Jazmine Warren, Joseph Trimarco, Adriana Lopez, Patrick Glynn, Cutie Stone and Frank Ungaro
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12336
Filed: December 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Thomas Valente, Shirley Thompkins-Morris, Martha Vargas, Stacey Torres, Andre Walston, Carol Valdez, Helen Thompson, Stephanie Pagano, Peter John, Johnnie Vasquez, Edward Underwood, Jonahus Thomas, Jazmine Warren, Patricia Vigilante, Dimas Galeas, Juliette Thomas, Maria Vargas, Maria Velez, Isaiah Washington, Alanena Walker, Brenda Washington, Kevin Tyler, Frank Trief, Michael Tricardo, Julissa Vega, Zaide Touma, Joseph Trimarco, Graciela Ulloa, Howard Walvick, Valerie Timm Hicks, Maria Troina, Pamela Vorillas, Eileen Trimarco, Joanne Vasquez Crespo, Frank Ungaro, Julio Velazquez, Stephen Vigilante, Theresa Tucker, Eunice Vilasceca, Jovanny Velasquez, Ann Valentino, Raymond Velez, David Tsawy, Joseph F Troina, Valisha Nathan, Angel Ulloa, Nereida Trinidad, Ron Thomas, Terrence King, Philip Wasser, Lucy Ward-Brathwaite, Victor Torres, Robert Vasquez, Huston Vaughn added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Thomas Valente, Shirley Thompkins-Morris, Martha Vargas, Stacey Torres, Andre Walston, Carol Valdez, Helen Thompson, Stephanie Pagano, Peter John, Johnnie Vasquez, Edward Underwood, Jonahus Thomas, Jazmine Warren, Patricia Vigilante, Dimas Galeas, Juliette Thomas, Maria Vargas, Maria Velez, Isaiah Washington, Alanena Walker, Brenda Washington, Kevin Tyler, Frank Trief, Michael Tricardo, Julissa Vega, Zaide Touma, Joseph Trimarco, Graciela Ulloa, Howard Walvick, Valerie Timm Hicks, Maria Troina, Pamela Vorillas, Eileen Trimarco, Joanne Vasquez Crespo, Frank Ungaro, Julio Velazquez, Stephen Vigilante, Theresa Tucker, Eunice Vilasceca, Jovanny Velasquez, Ann Valentino, Raymond Velez, David Tsawy, Joseph F Troina, Valisha Nathan, Angel Ulloa, Nereida Trinidad, Ron Thomas, Terrence King, Philip Wasser, Lucy Ward-Brathwaite, Victor Torres, Robert Vasquez, Huston Vaughn. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(LoPalo, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Arlene Tanner-Glynn, Robert Sweetman, Linda Tegnestam, Gloria Taylor, Cutie Stone, Ralph Stuart, Kiefsa Taylor, Patrick Glynn, Frank Stone, Keithlyn J Taylor, Nanci Thayer, Justin Taveras, Dorita Stewart, Marina Tavarez, Aleksa Stojkovic, Daniel Tandy, Juan Tapia, Eva Sweetman, Adriana Lopez, Marie Lisa Sussman, James Strandberg, Shamika Stokes, Julius Suggs, Yuan Su, Audrey Sutton, Benjamin Taroc, Timothy Strawman, Jennifer Strauss added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Arlene Tanner-Glynn, Robert Sweetman, Linda Tegnestam, Gloria Taylor, Cutie Stone, Ralph Stuart, Kiefsa Taylor, Patrick Glynn, Frank Stone, Keithlyn J Taylor, Nanci Thayer, Justin Taveras, Dorita Stewart, Marina Tavarez, Aleksa Stojkovic, Daniel Tandy, Juan Tapia, Eva Sweetman, Adriana Lopez, Marie Lisa Sussman, James Strandberg, Shamika Stokes, Julius Suggs, Yuan Su, Audrey Sutton, Benjamin Taroc, Timothy Strawman, Jennifer Strauss. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(LoPalo, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lawrence C Stepinski, Angelica Soto-Arche, Lisa Stepton-Howard, Kathleen Springham, Olivene Spence, Simon Steele, Milene P Soto, James Spencer, Sheron Stackhouse, Daniel St. Jacques, Joanna Barnish, Aguilla Steeles, Steven Springman, Ralph Soto, Daniel Spitalnic, Caroline Stetler added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Lawrence C Stepinski, Angelica Soto-Arche, Lisa Stepton-Howard, Kathleen Springham, Olivene Spence, Simon Steele, Milene P Soto, James Spencer, Sheron Stackhouse, Daniel St. Jacques, Joanna Barnish, Aguilla Steeles, Steven Springman, Ralph Soto, Daniel Spitalnic, Caroline Stetler. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(LoPalo, Christopher)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher R. LoPalo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Incorrect Origin Code selected. Attorney signature has a typo. (pc)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Christopher R. LoPalo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement; the related case number was omitted from the docket entry;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher R. LoPalo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher R. LoPalo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case; Nature of Suit code 896 (Other Statutes: Arbitration); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1605; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 360 (P.I.: Other); the County code has been modified to Sullivan. (pc) Modified on 1/2/2019 (pc).
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher R. LoPalo to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Add every single party listed on the complaint caption title as they appear in each capacity.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher R. LoPalo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LOUIS SORRENTINO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
December 29, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16118959)Document filed by LOUIS SORRENTINO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Related Case Statement)(LoPalo, Christopher) Modified on 1/2/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrentino et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS SORRENTINO
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivene Spence
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lisa Sussman
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Ward-Brathwaite
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tricardo
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Steele
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tandy
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Wasser
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimas Galeas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Strawman
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Velez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Velez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanci Thayer
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Vilasceca
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vasquez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanena Walker
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Springham
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nereida Trinidad
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Soto
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Vorillas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksa Stojkovic
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Vargas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stepton-Howard
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Suggs
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Thomas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Stuart
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Tanner-Glynn
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vargas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Walston
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Thomas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Trimarco
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter John
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel St. Jacques
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Springman
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Troina
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tsawy
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Thompkins-Morris
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Tucker
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valisha Nathan
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Trief
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Taylor
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Valdez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sweetman
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huston Vaughn
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F Troina
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Underwood
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Tavarez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Sutton
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Strauss
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Washington
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Barnish
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Torres
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milene P Soto
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamika Stokes
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Timm Hicks
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Ulloa
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence C Stepinski
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuan Su
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spencer
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Sweetman
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Valentino
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Torres
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonahus Thomas
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Vigilante
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Strandberg
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Thompson
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Soto-Arche
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovanny Velasquez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Velazquez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence King
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Tyler
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Valente
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Taveras
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorita Stewart
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Taroc
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Tapia
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Stetler
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Vasquez Crespo
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Walvick
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheron Stackhouse
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aguilla Steeles
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Spitalnic
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiefsa Taylor
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Vigilante
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Vasquez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tegnestam
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keithlyn J Taylor
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pagano
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julissa Vega
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaide Touma
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Stone
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Washington
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Ulloa
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmine Warren
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Trimarco
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Lopez
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Glynn
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cutie Stone
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ungaro
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?