Arichabala et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Denise Clark, Daniel Castoro, Hector Cardenas, Michael Champion, Lametric Butler, James Curran, Tommy Chin, Timothy Cromie, John Coffen, Brian Ciruzzi, William Carberry, Franklin Chandler, Edwin Callahan, Deborah Calise, Paul Carr, Brian Cosmello, Osvaldo Carbonell, Karen Culmer, Joseph Carini, John Carlin, Trevor Chambers, Anthony Cosenza, Manuel Cobo, Michael Clark, Frank Cangiarella, William Conway, Howard Corr, Frederick Caccamo, Anthony T. Castano, Marilyn Cheeks, Benjamin Cintron, Glenn V. Catanzaro, Susan Chew, Connie Castelli, Idalia Caraballo, Brian Coughlin, Richard Ceparano, Patrick Cahill, Craig G. Cowell, Clint Corbett, Richard Collyer, John Caporale, Darlene Curaba, Patricia Colletti, Stephen Chase, Det. Michael Carlo, Donald Curaba, Angela Canfield, Nelson Campoverde, Judith Castellanos, Richard Chintalan, Samuel Cicalese, Kimberly Cowell, Officer Joseph Cimaglia, Michael Corridan, Carlo A. Crespo, Thomas Cunningham, Jhonson Arichabala, Maria Cascio, Octavio Cerquera, Cathy Coster, Dominick Carolei, Joy Chambers, Gary Coffey, Christopher Carini, Stefan Cohen, William Connolly, Olga Castro, Timothy Carroll, Phil Catania, James G. Cosgrove, Kathleen Ciron, Luis Cuevas, Peter Classi, Mary Beth Colby Dalton, Lisa-Anne Capolino, Juan Colon, Paul Califano, Lisa Capolino, Michael Carlo and Joseph Cimaglia
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12350
Filed: December 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Patrick Dearie to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of one of the filers is incorrect on the docket entry text due to a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Patrick Dearie to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of one of the filers is incorrect on the docket entry text due to a typographical error. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Patrick Dearie. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lisa-Anne Capolino was modified to Lisa Capolino. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
January 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
January 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Patrick Dearie. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Patrick Dearie, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jhonson Arichabala, Lametric Butler(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Floyd Phifer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Floyd Phifer), Lametric Butler(, as the Child of Floyd Phifer, deceased), Frederick Caccamo, Patrick Cahill, Paul Califano, Deborah Calise, Deborah Calise, Edwin Callahan, Nelson Campoverde, Angela Canfield(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of John Canfield, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of John Canfield), Angela Canfield(, as the Spouse of John Canfield, deceased), Frank Cangiarella, Lisa-Anne Capolino(, as the Spouse of Craig Capolino, deceased), Lisa-Anne Capolino(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Craig Capolino, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Craig Capolino), John Caporale, Idalia Caraballo, William Carberry, Osvaldo Carbonell, Hector Cardenas, Joseph Carini, Christopher Carini, John Carlin, Michael Carlo, Michael Carlo(, as the Sibling of Madeline Carlo, deceased), Michael Carlo(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Madeline Carlo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Madeline Carlo), Dominick Carolei, Paul Carr, Timothy Carroll, Maria Cascio(, as the Spouse of Anthony Cascio, deceased), Maria Cascio(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Cascio), Anthony T. Castano, Judith Castellanos, Connie Castelli(, as the Spouse of Vincent Castelli, deceased), Connie Castelli(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Vincent Castelli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Vincent Castelli), Daniel Castoro, Olga Castro, Phil Catania, Glenn V. Catanzaro, Richard Ceparano, Octavio Cerquera, Joy Chambers(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Ronald Elliott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Ronald Elliott), Joy Chambers(, as the spouse of Ronald Elliott, deceased), Trevor Chambers, Michael Champion, Franklin Chandler, Stephen Chase, Marilyn Cheeks(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Steven Cheeks, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Steven Cheeks), Marilyn Cheeks(, as the spouse of Steven Cheeks, deceased), Susan Chew(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Carlton Chew, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Carlton Chew), Susan Chew(, as the spouse of Carlton Chew), Tommy Chin, Richard Chintalan, Samuel Cicalese, Joseph Cimaglia, Benjamin Cintron, Kathleen Ciron, Brian Ciruzzi, Denise Clark(, as the spouse of Walter Clark, deceased), Denise Clark(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Walter Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Walter Clark), Michael Clark, Peter Classi, Manuel Cobo, John Coffen, Gary Coffey, Stefan Cohen, Mary Beth Colby Dalton(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Charles Dalton, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Charles Dalton), Mary Beth Colby Dalton(, as the spouse of Charles Dalton, deceased), Patricia Colletti, Richard Collyer, Juan Colon, William Connolly, William Conway, Clint Corbett, Howard Corr, Michael Corridan, Anthony Cosenza, James G. Cosgrove, Brian Cosmello, Cathy Coster, Brian Coughlin, Craig G. Cowell, Kimberly Cowell, Carlo A. Crespo, Timothy Cromie, Luis Cuevas, Karen Culmer(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Roger Culmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Roger Culmer), Karen Culmer(, as the spouse of Roger Culmer), Thomas Cunningham, Darlene Curaba, Donald Curaba, James Curran. (Dearie, John) Modified on 1/3/2019 (pne).
December 30, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16119541)Document filed by Judith Castellanos, Anthony T. Castano, Darlene Curaba, Manuel Cobo, Christopher Carini, Juan Colon, Deborah Calise, Cathy Coster, Michael Carlo, William Carberry, William Connolly, John Caporale, Trevor Chambers, Joseph Cimaglia, Carlo A. Crespo, Clint Corbett, Dominick Carolei, Kathleen Ciron, Michael Clark, Hector Cardenas, James Curran, Thomas Cunningham, Nelson Campoverde, Maria Cascio(, as the Spouse of Anthony Cascio, deceased), Connie Castelli(, as the Spouse of Vincent Castelli, deceased), Angela Canfield(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of John Canfield, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of John Canfield), Donald Curaba, James G. Cosgrove, Marilyn Cheeks(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Steven Cheeks, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Steven Cheeks), Karen Culmer(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Roger Culmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Roger Culmer), Anthony Cosenza, Gary Coffey, Timothy Carroll, Susan Chew(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Carlton Chew, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Carlton Chew), Glenn V. Catanzaro, John Coffen, Brian Ciruzzi, Octavio Cerquera, Angela Canfield(, as the Spouse of John Canfield, deceased), Lisa-Anne Capolino(, as the Spouse of Craig Capolino, deceased), Brian Coughlin, Tommy Chin, Denise Clark(, as the spouse of Walter Clark, deceased), Benjamin Cintron, William Conway, Stefan Cohen, Michael Champion, Luis Cuevas, Michael Corridan, Osvaldo Carbonell, Peter Classi, Samuel Cicalese, Mary Beth Colby Dalton(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Charles Dalton, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Charles Dalton), Richard Collyer, Mary Beth Colby Dalton(, as the spouse of Charles Dalton, deceased), Lametric Butler(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Floyd Phifer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Floyd Phifer), Idalia Caraballo, Jhonson Arichabala, Karen Culmer(, as the spouse of Roger Culmer), Maria Cascio(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Cascio), Kimberly Cowell, Michael Carlo(, as the Sibling of Madeline Carlo, deceased), Paul Carr, Craig G. Cowell, Howard Corr, Richard Ceparano, Lisa-Anne Capolino(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Craig Capolino, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Craig Capolino), Patricia Colletti, Denise Clark(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Walter Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Walter Clark), Marilyn Cheeks(, as the spouse of Steven Cheeks, deceased), Michael Carlo(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Madeline Carlo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Madeline Carlo), Richard Chintalan, Brian Cosmello, Joseph Carini, Joy Chambers(, as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Ronald Elliott, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Ronald Elliott), Franklin Chandler, John Carlin, Frank Cangiarella, Paul Califano, Timothy Cromie, Lametric Butler(, as the Child of Floyd Phifer, deceased), Daniel Castoro, Edwin Callahan, Susan Chew(, as the spouse of Carlton Chew), Stephen Chase, Deborah Calise, Phil Catania, Frederick Caccamo, Connie Castelli(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Vincent Castelli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Vincent Castelli), Olga Castro, Joy Chambers(, as the spouse of Ronald Elliott, deceased), Patrick Cahill.(Dearie, John) Modified on 1/3/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arichabala et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Clark
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Castoro
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Cardenas
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Champion
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lametric Butler
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Curran
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Chin
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Cromie
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Coffen
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ciruzzi
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Carberry
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Chandler
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Callahan
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Calise
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Carr
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Cosmello
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Carbonell
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Culmer
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carini
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carlin
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Chambers
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cosenza
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Cobo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clark
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cangiarella
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Conway
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Corr
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Caccamo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony T. Castano
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Cheeks
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Cintron
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn V. Catanzaro
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Chew
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Castelli
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalia Caraballo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Coughlin
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ceparano
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cahill
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig G. Cowell
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Corbett
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Collyer
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caporale
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Curaba
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Colletti
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Chase
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Det. Michael Carlo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Curaba
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Canfield
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Campoverde
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Castellanos
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chintalan
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Cicalese
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cowell
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Joseph Cimaglia
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Corridan
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo A. Crespo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cunningham
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhonson Arichabala
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cascio
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Cerquera
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Coster
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Carolei
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Chambers
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coffey
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Carini
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Cohen
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Connolly
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Castro
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Carroll
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Catania
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Cosgrove
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Ciron
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Cuevas
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Classi
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Colby Dalton
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa-Anne Capolino
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Colon
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Califano
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Capolino
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carlo
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cimaglia
Represented By: John Patrick Dearie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?