Labozzetta et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Julio Montenegro, Thomas P McDonough, Howard Jr. Lee, Allan Michael, Marie Masella, John Myers, Christine Magan, Denise Moore-Ford, Stephanie McDaniel, Allan Needle, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Jacqueline Mills-Hamlett, John McKeon, Vance Sr. Mitchell, Thomas Murray, Dee Minter, Gayle Jones Lofton, Lillian Matos, Phyllis McBride, Ramon Maldonado, Aldo Mauro, John R Lofton, James Laino, Robert Masella, Michael Murza, Nancy Lapid, William McCullough, Lois Murray, Kim Love, Kevin McDaniel, Scott Mulford, Socorro Marquez, Johnny D. Moore, Michael McPhee, Serena Manning, Charles Maikish, Jonathan Labozzetta, Brian Manning, Thomas Mcnally, Diana Lumbrazo, Joel Hamlett, Mary L. Murray, Myah Mathura, Karen Mitchell, Michaela Meyers, William Low, Joseph Jr. LaRosa, Nicholas Mouhlas, Sarah Lam, Alonzo E. McBean, John McGuinness, June Lowe, Annette Needle, Beverly Maysonet, anthony Lamanna, Mark McNally, Willie Matos, Darrell McIlwain, Iovanny Medina, Doris Natal, Clifton Marshall, Robin Lohier, Glenda Lee, Edward Lubach, Kalmus Lowe, Vickie Moore, Maryann Low, Patrick Moriarity, Raymond McNeil, Anand Mathura, Jack Migliore, Danny Natal, John Metcalf, Timothy N. Nash, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, Jacquelynn Mitchell, Remon Lapid, Sandra Marcus, Alice Murza, Allegra Maple, Robert Lamattina, George Lam, Linda Myers, Flora Lawyer, Barbara Myers, Paul Meyers, Rocco Lumbrazo, Jacques Lafontant, Doretha McPhee, Norman Marino, Claire Mouhlas, Beth Masseo, Michael Lee, Michele Mainvielle, Cheryl Mangin, Elizabeth Lammatina, Joseph LaRosa, Jr., Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Jacquelyn Mitchell, Corrine McNally, Howard Lee, Jr., Raymond M. McNeil and Vance Mitchell, Sr.
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Case Number: 1:2018cv12362
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John McGuinness, John R Lofton, Julio Montenegro, Willie Matos, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Norman Marino, Sarah Lam, Claire Mouhlas, Remon Lapid, Patrick Moriarity, Raymond M. McNeil, Thomas P McDonough, Nancy Lapid, Barbara Myers, Myah Mathura, Scott Mulford, anthony Lamanna, Serena Manning, Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Paul Meyers, Joseph LaRosa, Jr, Allan Michael, Gayle Jones Lofton, Thomas Mcnally, Timothy N. Nash, Allegra Maple, Charles Maikish, Beverly Maysonet, Danny Natal, Kevin McDaniel, Robin Lohier, Michael Murza, William Low, Mark McNally, Aldo Mauro, Howard Lee, Jr, Jacques Lafontant, Rocco Lumbrazo, Brian Manning, Edward Lubach, Kim Love, Vance Mitchell, Sr, Maryann Low, Sandra Marcus(as Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Kraham, deceased), Glenda Lee, Christine Magan(as Administrator of the Estate of Keith Magan, deceased), Christine Magan(Individually), Diana Lumbrazo, John Myers, Nicholas Mouhlas, William McCullough, Jonathan Labozzetta, Alonzo E. McBean, Darrell McIlwain, Marie Masella, Thomas Murray, Socorro Marquez, Robert Lamattina, Anand Mathura, Jack Migliore, Ramon Maldonado, Cheryl Mangin, Lois Murray, Doris Natal, Linda Myers, George Lam, Beth Masseo, Elizabeth Lammatina, Joel Hamlett, Alice Murza, Johnny D. Moore, Iovanny Medina, John Metcalf, Clifton Marshall, Stephanie McDaniel, Denise Moore-Ford, Michele Mainvielle, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, James Laino, Annette Needle, Michael McPhee, Robert Masella, Sandra Marcus(Individually), Jacquelyn Mitchell, Dee Minter, Phyllis McBride, Michaela Meyers, John McKeon, Kalmus Lowe, Flora Lawyer, Lillian Matos, Allan Needle, Karen Mitchell, Michael Lee, Doretha McPhee, Mary L. Murray, June Lowe, Vickie Moore, Corrine McNally added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by John McGuinness, John R Lofton, Julio Montenegro, Willie Matos, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Norman Marino, Sarah Lam, Claire Mouhlas, Remon Lapid, Patrick Moriarity, Raymond M. McNeil, Thomas P McDonough, Nancy Lapid, Barbara Myers, Myah Mathura, Scott Mulford, anthony Lamanna, Serena Manning, Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Paul Meyers, Joseph LaRosa, Jr, Allan Michael, Gayle Jones Lofton, Thomas Mcnally, Timothy N. Nash, Allegra Maple, Charles Maikish, Beverly Maysonet, Danny Natal, Kevin McDaniel, Robin Lohier, Michael Murza, William Low, Mark McNally, Aldo Mauro, Howard Lee, Jr, Jacques Lafontant, Rocco Lumbrazo, Brian Manning, Edward Lubach, Kim Love, Vance Mitchell, Sr, Maryann Low, Sandra Marcus(as Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Kraham, deceased), Glenda Lee, Christine Magan(as Administrator of the Estate of Keith Magan, deceased), Christine Magan(Individually), Diana Lumbrazo, John Myers, Nicholas Mouhlas, William McCullough, Jonathan Labozzetta, Alonzo E. McBean, Darrell McIlwain, Marie Masella, Thomas Murray, Socorro Marquez, Robert Lamattina, Anand Mathura, Jack Migliore, Ramon Maldonado, Cheryl Mangin, Lois Murray, Doris Natal, Linda Myers, George Lam, Beth Masseo, Elizabeth Lammatina, Joel Hamlett, Alice Murza, Johnny D. Moore, Iovanny Medina, John Metcalf, Clifton Marshall, Stephanie McDaniel, Denise Moore-Ford, Michele Mainvielle, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, James Laino, Annette Needle, Michael McPhee, Robert Masella, Sandra Marcus(Individually), Jacquelyn Mitchell, Dee Minter, Phyllis McBride, Michaela Meyers, John McKeon, Kalmus Lowe, Flora Lawyer, Lillian Matos, Allan Needle, Karen Mitchell, Michael Lee, Doretha McPhee, Mary L. Murray, June Lowe, Vickie Moore, Corrine McNally. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570. Document filed by Joel Hamlett, Joseph LaRosa, Jr, Jonathan Labozzetta, Jacques Lafontant, James Laino, George Lam, Sarah Lam, anthony Lamanna, Robert Lamattina, Elizabeth Lammatina, Nancy Lapid, Remon Lapid, Flora Lawyer, Glenda Lee, Howard Lee, Jr, Michael Lee, Gayle Jones Lofton, John R Lofton, Robin Lohier, Kim Love, Maryann Low, William Low, June Lowe, Kalmus Lowe, Edward Lubach, Diana Lumbrazo, Rocco Lumbrazo, Christine Magan(as Administrator of the Estate of Keith Magan, deceased), Christine Magan(Individually), Charles Maikish, Michele Mainvielle, Ramon Maldonado, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Cheryl Mangin, Brian Manning, Serena Manning, Allegra Maple, Sandra Marcus(as Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Kraham, deceased), Sandra Marcus(Individually), Norman Marino, Socorro Marquez, Clifton Marshall, Marie Masella, Robert Masella, Beth Masseo, Anand Mathura, Myah Mathura, Lillian Matos, Willie Matos, Aldo Mauro, Beverly Maysonet, Alonzo E. McBean, Phyllis McBride, William McCullough, Kevin McDaniel, Stephanie McDaniel, Thomas P McDonough, John McGuinness, Darrell McIlwain, John McKeon, Mark McNally, Raymond M. McNeil, Doretha McPhee, Michael McPhee, Thomas Mcnally, Iovanny Medina, John Metcalf, Michaela Meyers, Paul Meyers, Allan Michael, Jack Migliore, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Dee Minter, Jacquelyn Mitchell, Karen Mitchell, Vance Mitchell, Sr, Julio Montenegro, Johnny D. Moore, Vickie Moore, Denise Moore-Ford, Patrick Moriarity, Claire Mouhlas, Nicholas Mouhlas, Scott Mulford, Lois Murray, Mary L. Murray, Thomas Murray, Alice Murza, Michael Murza, Barbara Myers, John Myers, Linda Myers, Timothy N. Nash, Danny Natal, Doris Natal, Allan Needle, Annette Needle.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by John McGuinness, John R Lofton, Julio Montenegro, Willie Matos, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Norman Marino, Sarah Lam, Claire Mouhlas, Remon Lapid, Patrick Moriarity, Raymond M. McNeil, Thomas P McDonough, Nancy Lapid, Barbara Myers, Myah Mathura, Scott Mulford, anthony Lamanna, Serena Manning, Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Paul Meyers, Joseph LaRosa, Jr, Allan Michael, Gayle Jones Lofton, Thomas Mcnally, Timothy N. Nash, Allegra Maple, Charles Maikish, Beverly Maysonet, Danny Natal, Kevin McDaniel, Robin Lohier, Michael Murza, William Low, Mark McNally, Aldo Mauro, Howard Lee, Jr, Jacques Lafontant, Rocco Lumbrazo, Brian Manning, Edward Lubach, Kim Love, Vance Mitchell, Sr, Maryann Low, Sandra Marcus(as Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Kraham, deceased), Glenda Lee, Christine Magan(as Administrator of the Estate of Keith Magan, deceased), Christine Magan(Individually), Diana Lumbrazo, John Myers, Nicholas Mouhlas, William McCullough, Jonathan Labozzetta, Alonzo E. McBean, Darrell McIlwain, Marie Masella, Thomas Murray, Socorro Marquez, Robert Lamattina, Anand Mathura, Jack Migliore, Ramon Maldonado, Cheryl Mangin, Lois Murray, Doris Natal, Linda Myers, George Lam, Beth Masseo, Elizabeth Lammatina, Joel Hamlett, Alice Murza, Johnny D. Moore, Iovanny Medina, John Metcalf, Clifton Marshall, Stephanie McDaniel, Denise Moore-Ford, Michele Mainvielle, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, James Laino, Annette Needle, Michael McPhee, Robert Masella, Sandra Marcus(Individually), Jacquelyn Mitchell, Dee Minter, Phyllis McBride, Michaela Meyers, John McKeon, Kalmus Lowe, Flora Lawyer, Lillian Matos, Allan Needle, Karen Mitchell, Michael Lee, Doretha McPhee, Mary L. Murray, June Lowe, Vickie Moore.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570. Document filed by Joel Hamlett, Joseph LaRosa, Jr, Jonathan Labozzetta, Jacques Lafontant, James Laino, George Lam, Sarah Lam, anthony Lamanna, Robert Lamattina, Elizabeth Lammatina, Nancy Lapid, Remon Lapid, Flora Lawyer, Glenda Lee, Howard Lee, Jr, Michael Lee, Gayle Jones Lofton, John R Lofton, Robin Lohier, Kim Love, Maryann Low, William Low, June Lowe, Kalmus Lowe, Edward Lubach, Diana Lumbrazo, Rocco Lumbrazo, Christine Magan(as Administrator of the Estate of Keith Magan, deceased), Christine Magan(Individually), Charles Maikish, Michele Mainvielle, Ramon Maldonado, Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Cheryl Mangin, Brian Manning, Serena Manning, Allegra Maple, Sandra Marcus(as Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Kraham, deceased), Sandra Marcus(Individually), Norman Marino, Socorro Marquez, Clifton Marshall, Marie Masella, Robert Masella, Beth Masseo, Anand Mathura, Myah Mathura, Lillian Matos, Willie Matos, Aldo Mauro, Beverly Maysonet, Alonzo E. McBean, Phyllis McBride, William McCullough, Kevin McDaniel, Stephanie McDaniel, Thomas P McDonough, John McGuinness, Darrell McIlwain, John McKeon, Mark McNally, Raymond M. McNeil, Doretha McPhee, Michael McPhee, Thomas Mcnally, Iovanny Medina, John Metcalf, Michaela Meyers, Paul Meyers, Allan Michael, Jack Migliore, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, Claudette Mills-Hamlett, Dee Minter, Jacquelyn Mitchell, Karen Mitchell, Vance Mitchell, Sr, Julio Montenegro, Johnny D. Moore, Vickie Moore, Denise Moore-Ford, Patrick Moriarity, Claire Mouhlas, Nicholas Mouhlas, Scott Mulford, Lois Murray, Mary L. Murray, Thomas Murray, Alice Murza, Michael Murza, Barbara Myers, John Myers, Linda Myers, Timothy N. Nash, Danny Natal, Doris Natal, Allan Needle, Annette Needle.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (Corrine McNally must be added); the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected due to party modification to correspond with pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Raymond M. McNeil; Claudette Mills-Hamlett; Jacquelyn Mitchell; Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lois Murray, Barbara Myers, Mary L. Murray, Nicholas Mouhlas, Claire Mouhlas, Linda Myers, John Myers, Julio Montenegro, Timothy N. Nash, Michael Murza, Annette Needle, Danny Natal, Allan Needle, Doris Natal, Scott Mulford, Thomas Murray, Alice Murza added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Lois Murray, Barbara Myers, Mary L. Murray, Nicholas Mouhlas, Claire Mouhlas, Linda Myers, John Myers, Julio Montenegro, Timothy N. Nash, Michael Murza, Annette Needle, Danny Natal, Allan Needle, Doris Natal, Scott Mulford, Thomas Murray, Alice Murza. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Karen Mitchell, Vickie Moore, Vance Sr. Mitchell, Jacqueline Mills-Hamlett, Joel Hamlett, Patrick Moriarity, Denise Moore-Ford, Dee Minter, Jacquelynn Mitchell, Johnny D. Moore added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Karen Mitchell, Vickie Moore, Vance Sr. Mitchell, Jacqueline Mills-Hamlett, Joel Hamlett, Patrick Moriarity, Denise Moore-Ford, Dee Minter, Jacquelynn Mitchell, Johnny D. Moore. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mark McNally, Iovanny Medina, Thomas Mcnally, Darrell McIlwain, Michaela Meyers, Paul Meyers, John Metcalf, Allan Michael, Michael McPhee, Jack Migliore, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, John McKeon, Raymond McNeil, Doretha McPhee added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Mark McNally, Iovanny Medina, Thomas Mcnally, Darrell McIlwain, Michaela Meyers, Paul Meyers, John Metcalf, Allan Michael, Michael McPhee, Jack Migliore, Jacqueline Miller-Edwards, John McKeon, Raymond McNeil, Doretha McPhee. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Thomas P McDonough, John McGuinness, William McCullough, Stephanie McDaniel, Kevin McDaniel added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Thomas P McDonough, John McGuinness, William McCullough, Stephanie McDaniel, Kevin McDaniel. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Phyllis McBride, Robert Masella, Lillian Matos, Marie Masella, Norman Marino, Clifton Marshall, Beverly Maysonet, Myah Mathura, Socorro Marquez, Beth Masseo, Aldo Mauro, Alonzo E. McBean, Willie Matos, Anand Mathura added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Phyllis McBride, Robert Masella, Lillian Matos, Marie Masella, Norman Marino, Clifton Marshall, Beverly Maysonet, Myah Mathura, Socorro Marquez, Beth Masseo, Aldo Mauro, Alonzo E. McBean, Willie Matos, Anand Mathura. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Sandra Marcus, Cheryl Mangin, Charles Maikish, Michele Mainvielle, Brian Manning, Ramon Maldonado, Sandra Marcus, Allegra Maple, Serena Manning added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Anna Marie Mangiaracina, Sandra Marcus, Cheryl Mangin, Charles Maikish, Michele Mainvielle, Brian Manning, Ramon Maldonado, Sandra Marcus, Allegra Maple, Serena Manning. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Edward Lubach, Diana Lumbrazo, Maryann Low, Rocco Lumbrazo, Kim Love, Christine Magan, William Low, Christine Magan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Edward Lubach, Diana Lumbrazo, Maryann Low, Rocco Lumbrazo, Kim Love, Christine Magan, William Low, Christine Magan. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John R Lofton, Gayle Jones Lofton, Michael Lee, Robin Lohier, Howard Jr. Lee, June Lowe, Glenda Lee, Kalmus Lowe added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by John R Lofton, Gayle Jones Lofton, Michael Lee, Robin Lohier, Howard Jr. Lee, June Lowe, Glenda Lee, Kalmus Lowe. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Flora Lawyer, Joseph Jr. LaRosa, Jacques Lafontant, George Lam, Nancy Lapid, Remon Lapid, anthony Lamanna, James Laino, Elizabeth Lammatina, Sarah Lam, Robert Lamattina added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Flora Lawyer, Joseph Jr. LaRosa, Jacques Lafontant, George Lam, Nancy Lapid, Remon Lapid, anthony Lamanna, James Laino, Elizabeth Lammatina, Sarah Lam, Robert Lamattina. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120317)Document filed by Jonathan Labozzetta.(Lannigan, Stephenie) Modified on 1/2/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labozzetta et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Montenegro
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P McDonough
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Jr. Lee
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Michael
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Masella
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Myers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Magan
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Moore-Ford
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie McDaniel
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Needle
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Mangiaracina
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mills-Hamlett
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McKeon
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Sr. Mitchell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Murray
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Minter
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Jones Lofton
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Matos
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis McBride
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Maldonado
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Mauro
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Lofton
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Laino
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Masella
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murza
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lapid
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McCullough
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Murray
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Love
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McDaniel
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mulford
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Marquez
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny D. Moore
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McPhee
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Manning
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Maikish
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Labozzetta
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Manning
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mcnally
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lumbrazo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Hamlett
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Murray
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myah Mathura
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mitchell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Meyers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Low
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jr. LaRosa
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Mouhlas
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lam
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo E. McBean
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McGuinness
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Lowe
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Needle
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Maysonet
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: anthony Lamanna
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McNally
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Matos
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell McIlwain
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iovanny Medina
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Natal
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Marshall
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Lohier
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Lee
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lubach
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalmus Lowe
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Moore
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Low
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Moriarity
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond McNeil
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anand Mathura
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Migliore
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Natal
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Metcalf
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy N. Nash
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Miller-Edwards
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelynn Mitchell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remon Lapid
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Marcus
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Murza
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegra Maple
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lamattina
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lam
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Myers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Lawyer
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Myers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Meyers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Lumbrazo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Lafontant
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha McPhee
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Marino
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Mouhlas
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Masseo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Mainvielle
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Mangin
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lammatina
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph LaRosa, Jr.
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Mills-Hamlett
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Mitchell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrine McNally
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Lee, Jr.
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond M. McNeil
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Mitchell, Sr.
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?