Rowenhorst et al v Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Haleema Salie, Kathy Buell, John Doe 64, Margarita Theodoridis, John Doe 62, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Margaret M. Tobin, Tyler W. Graf, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Jessica K. Kostaris, John Doe 58, Daren White, John Doe 55, Susan Simon, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Trevor S. Rescorla, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Susan G. Rescorla, Timothy Soulas, Jr., Tsahai S. Santiago, John Doe 53, Aaron Straub, Barbara Tobin, Todd Simon, Thomas F. Owens, Michael Stackpole, Matthew Rowenhorst, John Doe 56, John Owens, John Doe 54, Andrew McMahon, John Doe 65, Joan Youmans, Showkatara Sharif, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Katherine Soulas, Marc C. White, Edward Stackpole, Richard Gary, Clotilda Vola, Kevin Owens, Damon McMahon, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, John Doe 57, John Muldowney, Sean Tobin, Javier Guzman, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr., Christopher Soulas, Shirley Nottingham, Mandy Exantus, Terence Owens, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Kimberly J. Rescorla, John Doe 60, Constance Muldowney, Michael K. Thompson, Matthew Soulas, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Wesley J. Graf, Mary Kessler, Patricia Murphy, BNY Mellon, John Doe 66, Kristen C. Graf, Gonzalo Morales, Jennifer Dolan, Sylvia Ball, Jane Doe 69, Daryl Gabriel, John Doe 63, John Doe 61, Andrew Soulas, Michael Tobin, Jordanis Theodoridis, Anthony F. Russo, Rahsaan Thompson, Jennica Perez, Vasanta Velamuri and John Doe 59
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv12387
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, affidavit of translator (along with translations of the above documents) mailed to H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 02/20/2019 by Registered Mail tracking # RB596317533US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Roberts, Melina)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez. (Strong, Bruce)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Maxwell on behalf of BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kanishka Agarwala on behalf of BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez. (Agarwala, Kanishka)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (vf)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bruce Elliot Strong. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 150,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerry Stephen Goldman on behalf of BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez.(Strong, Bruce)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by BNY Mellon, Sylvia Ball, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Kathy Buell, John Doe 53, John Doe 54, John Doe 55, John Doe 56, John Doe 57, John Doe 58, John Doe 59, John Doe 60, John Doe 61, John Doe 62, John Doe 63, John Doe 64, John Doe 65, John Doe 66, Jane Doe 69, Jennifer Dolan, Mandy Exantus, Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Javier Guzman, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Patricia Murphy, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Matthew Rowenhorst, Anthony F. Russo, Haleema Salie, Tsahai S. Santiago, Showkatara Sharif, George Sikorsky, Perry J. Sikorsky, Susan Simon, Todd Simon, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Aaron Straub, Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Margarita Theodoridis, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Rahsaan Thompson, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Margaret M. Tobin, Michael Tobin, Sean Tobin, Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Vasanta Velamuri, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Marc C. White, Joan Youmans, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez. (Strong, Bruce)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Strong, Bruce)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120987)Document filed by Margaret M. Tobin, Michael K. Thompson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Harry Thompson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Harry Thompson), Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Kathy Buell, Jessica K. Kostaris, John Doe 57, Margarita Theodoridis, Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), John Doe 62, Richard Gary, Jennifer Simon Berardi, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Daren White, Haleema Salie, John Owens, Tyler W. Graf, Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), John Doe 66, BNY Mellon, Edward Stackpole, Christopher Soulas, Trevor S. Rescorla, John Doe 58, Michael K. Thompson(individually, as surviving child of William Harry Thompson), Jennifer Dolan, John Doe 59, Andrew Soulas, Damon McMahon, Shirley Nottingham(individually, as surviving sibling of Leonard A. White), Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Matthew Soulas, Andrew McMahon, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Tsahai S. Santiago, Shirley Nottingham(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thelma White, deceased, the late parent of Leonard A. White), Salvatore M. Traina, Jr, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, individually, as surviving child of David Vera), John Doe 60, Mary Kessler(individually, as surviving sibling of Suzanne Youmans), Susan Simon, John Muldowney, Sylvia Ball, Joan Youmans, Showkatara Sharif, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Clotilda Vola(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Vola, deceased, the late parent of Maria P. Vola), Kristen C. Graf, Michael Stackpole, Kevin Owens, Jane Doe 69, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, John Doe 65, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Daryl Gabriel, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, John Doe 53, John Doe 61, Matthew Rowenhorst, Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Rahsaan Thompson, Constance Muldowney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), Jordanis Theodoridis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantinos Theodoridis, deceased, the late parent of Michael Theodoridis), Nia Jah-Selah Thompson, Vasanta Velamuri, Wesley J. Graf, Thomas F. Owens, Todd Simon, Mary Kessler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Suzanne Youmans, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Suzanne Youmans), Gonzalo Morales, Shirley Nottingham(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard A. White, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Leonard A. White), Jordanis Theodoridis(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Theodoridis, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Theodoridis), John Doe 64, Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), Patricia Murphy, Jennica Perez(a/k/a Jennica Vera, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Vera, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Vera), Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum, Jordanis Theodoridis(individually, as surviving sibling of Michael Theodoridis), Mandy Exantus, Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), John Doe 56, Terence Owens, Barbara Tobin(individually, as surviving spouse of John Tobin), John Doe 54, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Marc C. White, Perry J. Sikorsky, John Doe 63, Sean Tobin, George Sikorsky, Aaron Straub, Anthony F. Russo, Michael Tobin, Barbara Tobin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Tobin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Tobin), Javier Guzman, John Doe 55.(Strong, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowenhorst et al v Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haleema Salie
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Buell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 64
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Theodoridis
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 62
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Tobin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler W. Graf
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia Jah-Selah Thompson
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica K. Kostaris
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 58
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren White
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 55
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Simon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sikorsky
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry J. Sikorsky
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor S. Rescorla
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan G. Rescorla
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Soulas, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsahai S. Santiago
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 53
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Straub
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tobin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Simon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Owens
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stackpole
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rowenhorst
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 56
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Owens
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 54
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 65
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Youmans
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showkatara Sharif
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa B. Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Soulas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc C. White
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Stackpole
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gary
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clotilda Vola
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Owens
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon McMahon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 57
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Muldowney
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Tobin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Guzman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore M. Traina, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Soulas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Nottingham
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Exantus
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Owens
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. Rescorla
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 60
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Muldowney
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael K. Thompson
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Soulas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Simon Berardi
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley J. Graf
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kessler
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Murphy
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNY Mellon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 66
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen C. Graf
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Morales
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dolan
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Ball
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 69
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Gabriel
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 63
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 61
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Soulas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tobin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordanis Theodoridis
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony F. Russo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahsaan Thompson
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennica Perez
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasanta Velamuri
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 59
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?