Nonparty Subpoenas Duces Tecum et al v. Koko's Confectionary & Novelty

Plaintiff: Tops Company Inc
Defendant: Koko's Confectionary & Novelty
Petitioner: Maurice U. Cahn and Cahn & Samuels LLP
In Re: Nonparty Subpoenas Duces Tecum
Case Number: 1:2018mc00468
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 11, 2018 17 MISCELLANEOUS CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:18-mc-00094. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
October 3, 2018 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, pursuant to Court Order entered 9/18/2018. Sent to Court by extraction. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
September 18, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, pursuant to Rule 45(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Order for details. Transfer due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/18/2018. (lctnm2) Modified on 9/18/2018 (hmc). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
September 4, 2018 15 NOTICE by MAURICE U. CAHN, CAHN & SAMUELS LLP (Samuels, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2018. Non-Party Petitioner's notice due by 9/6/2018. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (hmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the conference call held today, the Non-Party Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file notice with the court on or before September 6, 2018. This notice shall indicate whether Non-Party Petitioner consents to a transfer of its #1 Motion to Quash under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 45. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/30/2018. (lctnm3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/30/2018, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a telephone conference for August 30, 2018, at 3:00 P.M. Eastern Standard Time in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information has been emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/28/2018. (lctnm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 20, 2018 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to opposition to Motion, #5 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by TOPS COMPANY INC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting the #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel Jean-Paul Ciardullo shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2018. (lctnm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 16, 2018 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jean-Paul Ciardullo, :Firm- Foley & Lardner LLP, :Address- 555 South Flower Street, Suite 3300, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-972-4544. Fax No. - 213-972-0065 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5644087. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TOPS COMPANY INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapatkin, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 15, 2018 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to opposition to Motion, #5 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by TOPS COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo)(Kapatkin, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 15, 2018 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to opposition to Motion, #5 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by KOKO'S CONFECTIONARY & NOVELTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Levitt, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 13, 2018 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to opposition to Motion, #5 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by MAURICE U. CAHN, CAHN & SAMUELS LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maurice U. Cahn, #2 Exhibit A)(Samuels, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel David H. Levitt shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/13/2018. (lctnm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 13, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David H. Levitt, :Firm- Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP, :Address- 151 N. Franklin St., Suite 2500. Phone No. - 312-704-3000. Fax No. - 312-704-3001 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5635232. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KOKO'S CONFECTIONARY & NOVELTY (Foster, Nabil) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 8, 2018 8 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Strike #3 Response to motion Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo filed by TOPS COMPANY INC. (Kapatkin, Brian) Modified on 8/9/2018 to correct docket link/text (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 7, 2018 7 MOTION to Strike #6 Reply to opposition to Motion, #5 Reply to opposition to Motion, by TOPS COMPANY INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapatkin, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 2, 2018 6 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by MAURICE U. CAHN, CAHN & SAMUELS LLP. (Samuels, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 2, 2018 5 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 MOTION to Quash Koko's Response to Topps' Opposition filed by KOKO'S CONFECTIONARY & NOVELTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foster, Nabil) Modified link on 8/13/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
August 2, 2018 4 MOTION to Strike #3 Response to motion Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo by MAURICE U. CAHN, CAHN & SAMUELS LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Samuels, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
July 26, 2018 3 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by TOPS COMPANY INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapatkin, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
July 20, 2018 2 Featured Case STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/20/2018. (lctnm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616093645. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]
July 13, 2018 1 MOTION to Quash by MAURICE U. CAHN, CAHN & SAMUELS LLP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5A, #7 Exhibit 5B, #8 Exhibit 5C, #9 Exhibit 5D, #10 Exhibit 5E, #11 Exhibit 5F, #12 Exhibit 5G, #13 Exhibit 5H, #14 Exhibit 5 FNS Declaration, #15 Exhibit 6 MUC Declaration, #16 Exhibit 7, #17 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nonparty Subpoenas Duces Tecum et al v. Koko's Confectionary & Novelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koko's Confectionary & Novelty
Represented By: David H. Levitt
Represented By: Nabil Gallo Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice U. Cahn
Represented By: Frederick Ngosi Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cahn & Samuels LLP
Represented By: Frederick Ngosi Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tops Company Inc
Represented By: Brian Justin Kapatkin
Represented By: Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nonparty Subpoenas Duces Tecum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?