In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (Skatteforvaltningen) Tax Refund Scheme Litigation
Plaintiff: SKAT, Richard Markowitz and Skatteforvaltningen
Defendant: Svetlin Petkov, The Stark Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, Robert Klugman, Michael Ben-Jacob, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, John Doscas, Adam LaRosa, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, Gavin Crescenzo, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Sander Gerber Pension Plan, Doston Bradley, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Mitchell Protass, The SVP 401K Plan, Raubritter LLC Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The West River Pension Plan, Sean Driscoll, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari, Thomas Kertelits, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Roger Lehman, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, KRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, John Lachance, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, SV Holdings, LLC Retirement Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, Matthew Tucci, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, Bernard Tew, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Todd Bergeron, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Shreepah Shah, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Tew, LP Retirement Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, Industrial Pensions Group Trust, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC, SRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, Vincent Tew, The Sinclair Pension Plan, MSJJ Retirement Group Trust, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, Vincent Natoli, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Christopher Nowell, MGH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, Andrea Tew, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, Bluegrass Retirement Group Trust, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Casting Pensions Group Trust, JSH Farms 401(K) Plan, Stephanie Tew, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC Retirement Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, Tew Enterprises, LLC Retirement Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Central Technologies Pensions Group Trust, Kevin Kenning, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Gregory Summers, Autoparts Pensions Group Trust, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, George Hofmeister, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Tveter LLC Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Omineca Pension Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Bernina Pension Plan, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Perry Lerner, Azalea Pension Plan, Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, Robin Jones, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Tarvos Pension Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, David Zelman, John van Merkensteijn, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ronald Altbach, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Delvian LLC Pension Plan, Rajan Investments LLC Pension Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan Trust, Davin Investments Pension Plan, Traden Investments Pension Plan, Bernina Pension Plan Trust, Next Level Pension Plan, Spirit on the Water Pension Plan, California Catalog Company Pension Plan, Clove Pension Plan, Laegeler Asset Management Pension Plan, 2321Capital Pension Plan, Bowline Management Pension Plan, DFL Investments Pension Plan, Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan and Mill River Capital Management Pension Plan
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, Federated Logistics LLC 401K, Sheldon Goldstein, David Freelove, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Stacey Kaminer, David Schulman, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan and The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan
Consolidated Defendant: The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan and The CSCC Capital Pension Plan
3Rd Party Defendant: ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018md02865
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 279 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Marc A. Weinstein dated February 26, 2020 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al..(Weinstein, Marc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE of FILING WAIVERS OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:19-cv-10713-LAK.(Weinstein, Marc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 277 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of John Doscas..(Smith, Eric)
February 25, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan..(Smith, Eric)
February 25, 2020 Filing 275 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of David Freelove..(Smith, Eric)
February 25, 2020 Filing 274 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of Federated Logistics LLC 401K..(Smith, Eric)
February 25, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of David Freelove..(Smith, Eric)
February 25, 2020 Filing 272 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Smith on behalf of Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan..(Smith, Eric)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING COUNTERCLAIMS: NOW THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree as follows: 1. The Court's Utah Plans Opinion dismissing the Utah Plans' counterclaims for unjust enrichment and promissory estoppel on the ground that they are barred by the act of state doctrine applies to the Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' counterclaims for unjust enrichment and promissory estoppel. 2. The Court's Goldstein Opinion dismissing Goldstein's counterclaim for promissory estoppel on the ground that Goldstein failed to plead a clear and unambiguous promise applies to the Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' counterclaims for promissory estoppel. 3. For the reasons set forth in the Utah Plans and Goldstein Opinions, the Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' counterclaims should be, and by this Order are hereby, dismissed without prejudice to Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' rights to appeal. 4. SKAT shall not be required to file an answer to the Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' counterclaims or otherwise move to dismiss the counterclaims pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jca)
February 21, 2020 Filing 270 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen..(Weinstein, Marc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 269 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: (97 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK) Stipulation and Order, to Monday, March 2, 2020 addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Brian Fraser dated February 13, 2020. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al..(Fraser, Brian)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties hereby stipulate and agree that ED&F Man will serve a responsive pleading to each of the aforementioned Third-Party Complaints on or before March 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jca)
February 11, 2020 Filing 267 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
February 3, 2020 Filing 266 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Michael G. Bongiorno dated February 3, 2020 re: Filing of Answers. Document filed by Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan Trust, Routt Capital Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer of Avanix Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Batavia Capital Pension Plan, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer of Calypso Investments Pension Plan, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer of Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan Richard Markowitz, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, #6 Exhibit 6 - Answer of Richard Markowitz, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer of Richard Markowitz, #8 Exhibit 8 - Answer of RJM Capital Pension Plan, #9 Exhibit 9 - Routt Capital Pension Plan, #10 Exhibit 10 - Richard Markowitz, #11 Exhibit 11 - Richard Markowitz).(Bongiorno, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 265 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sharon L. McCarthy dated 02/03/2020 re: Filing of Answers to Complaints on Individual Dockets. Document filed by Azalea Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bernina Pension Plan, Bernina Pension Plan Trust, John van Merkensteijn, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Omineca Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, John van Merkensteijn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer of Azalea Pension Plan and Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, #2 Exhibit B - Answer and Counterclaims of Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401K Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #3 Exhibit C - Answer of Bernina Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #4 Exhibit D - Answer of John van Merkensteijn and Bernina Pension Plan Trust, #5 Exhibit E - Answer of Michelle Investments Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #6 Exhibit F - Answer of Omineca Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #7 Exhibit G - Answer of Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #8 Exhibit H - Answer and Counterclaims of Starfish Management LLC Roth 401K Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #9 Exhibit I - Answer of Tarvos Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #10 Exhibit J - Answer of Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401K Plan and John van Merkensteijn, #11 Exhibit K - Answer of Xiphias LLC Pension Plan and John van Merkensteijn).(McCarthy, Sharon)
February 3, 2020 Filing 264 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Michelle Rice dated 02/03/2020 re: Filing of Answers and Counterclaims. Document filed by Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ronald Altbach, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Robin Jones, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Perry Lerner, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, David Zelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26).(Rice, Michelle)
February 3, 2020 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on January 31,2020, and picked up by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP to produce documents and obtain testimony in Copenhagen, Denmark. (km)
January 24, 2020 Filing 263 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #262 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Skatteforvaltningen against 2321Capital Pension Plan, Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Autoparts Pensions Group Trust, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Bernina Pension Plan, Bernina Pension Plan Trust, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC, Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC Retirement Plan, Bluegrass Retirement Group Trust, Bowline Management Pension Plan, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, California Catalog Company Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Casting Pensions Group Trust, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Central Technologies Pensions Group Trust, Clove Pension Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, DFL Investments Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Davin Investments Pension Plan, Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Delvian LLC Pension Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Federated Logistics LLC 401K, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Industrial Pensions Group Trust, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, JSH Farms 401(K) Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, KRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Laegeler Asset Management Pension Plan, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, MGH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, MSJJ Retirement Group Trust, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Mill River Capital Management Pension Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Next Level Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Omineca Pension Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan Trust, Rajan Investments LLC Pension Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Raubritter LLC Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, SRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan, SV Holdings, LLC Retirement Plan, Sander Gerber Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, Spirit on the Water Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Tew Enterprises, LLC Retirement Plan, Tew, LP Retirement Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Traden Investments Pension Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tveter LLC Pension Plan, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Andrea Tew, Bernard Tew, Bradley Crescenzo, Carl Andrew Vergari, Christopher Nowell, David Freelove, David Schulman, David Zelman, Doston Bradley, Edwin Miller, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Gavin Crescenzo, George Hofmeister, Gregory Summers, Joan Schulman, Jocelyn Markowitz, John Doscas, John Lachance, John van Merkensteijn, John van Merkensteijn, Joseph Herman, Kevin Kenning, Matthew Tucci, Michael Ben-Jacob, Mitchell Protass, Perry Lerner, Richard Markowitz, Robert Klugman, Robin Jones, Roger Lehman, Ronald Altbach, Sean Driscoll, Sheldon Goldstein, Shreepah Shah, Stacey Kaminer, Stephanie Tew, Svetlin Petkov, Thomas Kertelits, Todd Bergeron, Vincent Natoli, Vincent Tew. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated January 23, 2020, Plaintiff's motion to dismiss is granted. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/24/2020) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(km)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Plaintiffs motion to dismiss [18-md-2865, DI-113] is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(jca) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The motion to dismiss the Utah Plans' counterclaims [DI-179] is granted. 12 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 14 (Status Reports, Status Conference, and Other Matters): 1. The Court will hold a status conference on March 5, 2020 in Courtroom 21B at 2:15 pm. 3. On or before February 26, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report covering all of the above topics to the extent possible or, failing agreement on a single joint status report, separate statements on matters as to which agreement is not reached. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(va)
January 22, 2020 Filing 259 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting granting (251) Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK and all related cases. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Movant to submit execution copy of request. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/22/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jwh)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. The Parties hereby stipulate and agree that ED&F Man will serve a responsive pleading to each of the aforementioned Third-Party Complaints on or before February 14, 2020. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/16/2020). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (rjm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 257 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 256 NOTICE of of Filing Waivers of Service. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Waivers of Service, #2 Waivers of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:19-cv-10713-LAK(McGoey, John)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The motion to dismiss Goldstein's third-party complaint [18-md-2865, DI-239] is denied. ED&F Man's alternative request for a stay is denied. As ED&F Man elected not to challenge Goldstein's claims under any other provision of Rule 12(b), any such arguments are waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(jca)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that the current December 30, 2019 deadline for Defendants in the cases enumerated in the caption to answer the Complaints is hereby extended thirty-five (35) days up to and including February 3, 2020. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the Defendants' second request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaints. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
December 27, 2019 Filing 253 DECLARATION of Neil J. Oxford in Support re: (41 in 1:19-cv-01931-LAK) MOTION for Discovery Re: Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark.. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Oxford, Neil)
December 27, 2019 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (41 in 1:19-cv-01931-LAK) MOTION for Discovery Re: Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Oxford, Neil)
December 27, 2019 Filing 251 MOTION for Discovery Re: Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Oxford, Neil)
December 27, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dustin Philip Smith on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Smith, Dustin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 249 THIRD PARTY REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Third Party Plaintiffs' Amended Third-Party Complaint. Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(2) Or For Forum Non Conveniens Or In The Alternative To Stay All Proceedings Against It. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Niven, Kristen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 248 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Richard Markowitz, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (108 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Third Party Plaintiffs' Amended Third-Party Complaint. . Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties hereby Stipulate and Agree that ED&F will file and serve a pleading or motion responsive to the Amended Third-Party Complaint on or before January 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05374-LAK, 1:18-cv-08655-LAK(jca)
December 18, 2019 Filing 245 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 244 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. Document filed by Federated Logistics LLC 401K; David Freelove; Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05374-LAK, 1:18-cv-08655-LAK(Skarlatos, Bryan)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 13 (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(l)) denying (134) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. The motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(l) [18-md-2865, DI-134] is denied for substantially the reasons stated in SKAT's memorandum dated July 19, 2019 [18-md-2865, DI-158]. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jca)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (ED&F Man's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Protective Order) in case 1:18-cv-05053-LAK; denying (230) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. ED&F's motion for reconsideration [18-md-2865 Dkt. 230, 18-cv-5053 Dkt. 103] is denied. ED&F has not pointed to any controlling decisions or data that the Court overlooked in its November 7, 2019 order [PTO 11] denying ED&F' s motion for a protective order. ED&F's motion for reconsideration raises substantially the same arguments the Court previously considered and rejected. The reasons the Court is not persuaded by ED&F' s arguments are stated in the November 7, 2019 order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (jca)
December 6, 2019 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Third Party Plaintiffs' Amended Third-Party Complaint. . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 240 DECLARATION of Kristen G. Niven in Support re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Third Party Plaintiffs' Amended Third-Party Complaint.. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-Part 1, #7 Exhibit F-Part 2)(Fraser, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Third Party Plaintiffs' Amended Third-Party Complaint. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..(Fraser, Brian)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties hereby Stipulate and Agree that ED&F will serve a responsive pleading to the Amended Third-Party Complaint on or before January 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/5/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(jca)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties hereby Stipulate and Agree that ED&F will file and serve a responsive pleading to the Amended Third-Party Complaint on or before January 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/5/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK(jca)
December 2, 2019 Filing 236 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (103 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (101 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, . . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 235 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 234 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. answer due 12/6/2019. (jca)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties, hereby Stipulate and Agree as follows: 1. ED&F will file and serve its responsive pleading or motion to the Amended Third-Party Complaint on or before December 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/6/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(jca)
November 27, 2019 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (103 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (101 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, . . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Weinstein, Marc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (103 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (101 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, . . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (101 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 229 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
November 14, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Gabriela Niven on behalf of ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05374-LAK, 1:18-cv-08655-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Niven, Kristen)
November 14, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Fraser on behalf of ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05374-LAK, 1:18-cv-08655-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 226 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #172 Third Party Complaint,, against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Stacey Kaminer, American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Joan Schulman, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman. Related document: #172 Third Party Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Blessington, John)
November 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John C. Blessington to Document No. #224 Third Party Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): A Third Party Complaint was already filed and accepted (document 173). Add Moria Associates Defined Benefit Plan to CM ECF. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 225 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #173 Third Party Complaint against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Related document: #173 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Blessington, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 224 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Stacey Kaminer, American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Joan Schulman, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, David Schulman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Blessington, John) Modified on 11/13/2019 (pc).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 11 (ED&F Man's Motion for Protective Order) in case 1:18-cv-05053-LAK; denying (208) Motion for Protective Order. in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. ED&F's motion for a protective order [18-md-2865 Dkt. 208, 18-cv-5053 Diet. 90] is denied. I find that halting discovery would be inappropriate where SKAT has demonstrated that its requests bear on an understanding of the alleged falsity of tax vouchers issued by ED&F, and that such understanding is potentially relevant to many of the cases in these consolidated proceedings. Moreover, ED&F has not persuaded me that the possibility that it will prevail on a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) would render this discovery oppressive or unduly burdensome under Rule 26(c). Indeed, it is ED&F's position that at least some of this discovery will be relevant also to proceedings in London. This fact suggests that ED&F would suffer little hardship from being required to produce the same or similar materials in connection with this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (jca) Modified on 11/7/2019 (jca).
November 6, 2019 Filing 222 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (pc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 221 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., re: (220 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, Federated Logistics LLC 401K, David Freelove. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05374-LAK, 1:18-cv-08655-LAK(Skarlatos, Bryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 220 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Federated Logistics LLC 401K, David Freelove, Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tax vouchers issued by ED&F Man Capital Markets Ltd to the Del Mar Plan, #2 Exhibit Tax vouchers issued by ED&F Man Capital Markets Ltd to the Federated Plan)(Skarlatos, Bryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 219 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #101 Amended Answer to Complaints, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Related document: #101 Amended Answer to Complaints, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended English Answer, #2 Exhibit B Tax Voucher TDC, #3 Exhibit C Tax Voucher Danske Bank, #4 Exhibit D Tax Voucher Novo Nordisk, #5 Exhibit E Tax Voucher D/S Norden, #6 Exhibit F Custody Agreement, #7 Exhibit G Security and Set-Off Deed, #8 Exhibit H Letter Agreement, #9 Exhibit I Custody Fee Letter TDC, #10 Exhibit J Custody Fee Letter Danske Bank, #11 Exhibit K Custody Fee Letter Novo Nordisk, #12 Exhibit L Custody Fee Letter D/S Norden)(Parks, Kari)
October 25, 2019 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Luther Kisanga in Support re: (90 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (90 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 216 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III; Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Dillman, Brandon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 215 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. Document filed by Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan; Stacey Kaminer; American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan; Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan; Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan; Joan Schulman; Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan; Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan; DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan; David Schulman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Dillman, Brandon)
October 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(jca)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 10: (ED&F Man's Motions to Dismiss and for Protective Order) Insofar as the PTO 9 ruled on ED&F 's motion for a protective order [18-md-2865 Dkt. 208, 18-cv-5053 Dkt. 90], it is vacated. The Clerk shall restore EDF's motion to the docket. The Court will rule on it promptly following the receipt of any reply papers ED&F may file in its support, which shall be filed no later than October 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(jca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 213 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen's Opposition to Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, LTD's Motion for a Protective Order addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Marc A. Weinstein dated October 22, 2019. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Weinstein, Marc)
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (rjm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9. Third party defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. ("ED&F") has moved to dismiss the third party complaint of Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldstein (collectively, "Goldstein") and for a protective order staying Goldstein's outstanding document request unless and until personal jurisdiction is established over ED&F. Goldstein maintains that the third party complaint sufficiently alleges personal jurisdiction but argues in the alternative that it should be permitted to amend in order better to do so. There seems little point to deciding the present motion to dismiss given the possibility that such a decision would simply trigger a motion for leave to amend and, in all probability, then a new pleading and a new motion to dismiss. In the circumstances, ED&F's motion to dismiss [18-md-2865 Dkt 169, 18-cv-5053 Dkt. 74] is granted without prejudice to Goldstein's position and purely as a matter of efficiency and administrative convenience. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 1. Goldstein's alternative motion for leave to amend their third party complaint is granted. Any such amended complaint shall be filed no later than November 5, 2019. ED&F's motion for a protective order [18-md-2865 Dkt. 208, 18-cv-5053 Dkt. 90] is granted to the extent that ED&F need not respond to Goldstein's outstanding document request until 10 days after the Court's ruling on any motion by ED&F to dismiss the amended third party complaint or such other date as the Court may fix. It is denied in all other respects. SO ORDERED. Granting (74) Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part and denying in part (90) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:18-cv-05053-LAK; Granting (169) Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part and denying in part (208) Motion for Protective Order. in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (rjm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-05053-LAK; granting (194) Motion for Protective Order. Please visit the Court's Website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov for Sealed Records Filing Instructions. in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis)
October 18, 2019 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Brian S. Fraser in Support re: (90 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Luther Kisanga in Support re: (90 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 208 MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-04047-LAK; granting (206) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Loomis Cave terminated in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (Kaplan, Lewis)
October 2, 2019 Filing 206 MOTION for Sara L. Cave to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Weinstein, Marc)
October 1, 2019 Filing 205 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Brian S. Fraser dated October 1, 2019 re: in response to the letter filed by the Goldstein Defendants on September 29, 2019. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Marc A. Weinstein dated 9/19/2019 re: Accordingly, we respectfully request that the Court direct the Clerk to remove the listing identifying Mr. Markowitz as a Plaintiff pro se from the docket. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED., Richard Markowitz terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/1/2019) (jca)
September 29, 2019 Filing 203 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Martin H. Kaplan dated September 29, 2019 re: September 27, 2019 Letter Filed by Brian S. Fraser. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
September 27, 2019 Filing 202 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Brian S. Fraser dated September 27, 2019 re: Amended Defence. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Defence)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 201 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (59 in 1:18-cv-09841-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss The Utah Plans' Counterclaims. . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Weinstein, Marc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (199) MOTION for Markus A. Stadler to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Markus A. Stadler terminated in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/16/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jca)
September 16, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION for Markus A. Stadler to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Weinstein, Marc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Brian S. Fraser, Esq. in Support re: (80 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK, 194 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order Notice Of Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.'s Motion For Protective Order.. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 197 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (169 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK)., (74 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Reply Declaration Of Kristen G. Niven In Support Of Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets Limited's Motion To Dismiss The Third Party Complaint. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 196 DECLARATION of Kristen G. Niven, Esq. in Support re: (169 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK)., (74 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint.. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (80 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK, 194 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION for Protective Order Notice Of Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.'s Motion For Protective Order. Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets Ltd.'s Motion For Protective Order. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION for Protective Order Notice Of Third-Party Defendant ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.'s Motion For Protective Order. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Fraser, Brian)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(1)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen ("SKAT") and Defendant Adam LaRosa and their respective counsel that the above-captioned action is dismissed as against Defendant Adam LaRosa with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This stipulation is signed by counsel for all parties who have appeared. SKAT's dismissal is not intended to and does not affect any of the claims asserted against Defendant Raubritter LLC Pension Plan, which has not yet appeared in this action. So Ordered. *** Party Adam LaRosa terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04833-LAK(js) Modified on 9/12/2019 (js).
September 10, 2019 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (179 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss The Utah Plans' Counterclaims. . Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon R. Dillman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Blessington, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SKATTEFORVALTNINGEN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE UTAH PLAN DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS: 1. The Utah Plans' current September 3, 2019 deadline to submit a response to the Motion is hereby extended seven (7) days up to and including September 10, 2019. 2. SKAT's deadline to submit a reply in further suppo1t of its Motion shall be September 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 9/10/2019, Replies due by 9/24/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (74 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. . Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kari Parks, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
August 23, 2019 Filing 189 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Joan Schulman, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Stacey Kaminer, American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan. (Blessington, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 188 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Adam LaRosa and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04833-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
August 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Sarah Cave. RE-FILE Document No. (61 in 1:18-cv-04833-LAK) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (Signatures) by the attorneys. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04833-LAK(dt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 187 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Adam LaRosa and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04833-LAK(Cave, Sarah) Modified on 8/20/2019 (dt).
August 19, 2019 Filing 186 JOINDER to join re: (184 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,, (183 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,, . Document filed by Omineca Pension Plan, John van Merkensteijn, Bernina Pension Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 185 JOINDER to join re: (184 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,, (183 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,, . Document filed by Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, David Zelman, Robin Jones, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Ronald Altbach, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Perry Lerner, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Rice, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 184 DECLARATION of Michael G. Bongiorno in Support re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff SKAT's Responses and Objections, #2 Exhibit B - Re-Amended Particulars of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - Ninth Witness Statement of Jonathan Robert Fortnam, #4 Exhibit D - Expert Opinion of Dr. Frederik Waage)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 183 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . The Complaints Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Marc A. Weinstein in Support re: #179 MOTION to Dismiss The Utah Plans' Counterclaims.. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Weinstein, Marc)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-05053-LAK; granting (178) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (169 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK)., (74 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Application granted. The Goldstein Defendants' deadline to respond to the Motion is extended to August 30, 2019; any reply is due no later than September 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/30/2019, Replies due by 9/13/2019.) in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods Part One on 8/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK (jca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #179 MOTION to Dismiss The Utah Plans' Counterclaims. . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Weinstein, Marc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss The Utah Plans' Counterclaims. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.(Weinstein, Marc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 178 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (169 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK)., (74 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Martin H. Kaplan dated August 15, 2019. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
August 14, 2019 Filing 177 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (sj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 176 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Filing 175 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ED&F Man Capital Markets Ltd., re: (173 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Dillman, Brandon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 174 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ED&F Man Capital Markets Ltd., re: (172 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Third Party Complaint,,. Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Stacey Kaminer, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Dillman, Brandon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 173 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blessington, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 172 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Stacey Kaminer, David Schulman, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Joan Schulman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Blessington, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #169 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK). . Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 170 DECLARATION of Kristen G. Niven in Support re: #169 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK).. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Fraser, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (1:18-cv-05053-LAK). Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..(Fraser, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE granting #163 MOTION for Brittany Gigliotti to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney BRITTANY GIGLIOTTI terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/30/2019) (jca)
July 29, 2019 Filing 167 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John C. Blessington dated July 29, 2019 re: In Re Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (Skatteforvaltningen) Tax Refund Litigation, Docket Number 18-md-2865. Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Stacey Kaminer, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. (Attachments: #1 DW Construction, Inc. Retirement Plan and Stacey Kaminers Answer to the Complaint and DW Construction, Inc. Retirement Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #2 Kamco Investments, Inc. Pension Plan and Stacey Kaminers Answer to the Complaint and Kamco Investments, Inc. Pension Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #3 Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan and Stacey Kaminers Answer to the Complaint and Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #4 Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan and Joan Schulmans Answer to the Complaint and Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #5 Moira Associates LLC 401(K) Plan and Stacey Kaminers Answer to the Complaint and Moira Associates LLC 401(K) Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #6 Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan and David Schulmans Answer to the Complaint and Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #7 American Investment Group of New York, L.P. Pension Plan and Stacey Kaminers Answer to the Complaint and American Investment Group of New York L.P. Pension Plans Counterclaims Against Skatteforvaltningen, #8 Newsong Fellowship Church 401K Plan and Alexander Jamie Mitchell IIIs Answer to the Complaint)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Blessington, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 166 FIFTH LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 07/29/2019 re: Answers. Document filed by Bradley Crescenzo, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, John Lachance, Roger Lehman, Vincent Natoli, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, Matthew Tucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 165 FOURTH LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 07/26/2019 re: Answers. Document filed by Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Roger Lehman, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Matthew Tucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Filing 164 THIRD LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 07/25/2019 re: Answers. Document filed by Cole Enterprises USA Retirement Plan & Trust, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Todd Bergeron, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Kevin Kenning, Robert Klugman, Roger Lehman, Random Holdings 401K Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Filing 163 MOTION for Brittany Gigliotti to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the time within which Defendants in the above-captioned cases may answer the Complaints is hereby extended up to and including July 29, 2019. This stipulated extension of time is consistent with the proposed schedule set forth in the Letter filed by the Plaintiff with this Court on April 4, 2019 (Dkt. No. 93), which identified the answer deadline for the enumeratedDefendants to be 45 days from the Court's ruling on the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 63). The Court ruled on the Order to Show Cause on June 12, 2019 (Pretrial Order No. 8, 0kt. No. 133). No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the parties' first request for extension of time to answer to the Complaints for the enumerated cases, as the previous request filed with the Court on July 11, 2019 (Proposed Stipulation and Order, Dkt. No. 151) incorrectly stated the date of the extension. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
July 19, 2019 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Sarah L. Cave in Opposition re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Gry Ahlefeld-Engel in Opposition re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Mads Bryde Andersen in Opposition re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan.(Hanamirian, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gregory Summers.(Hanamirian, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust.(Hanamirian, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 154 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, Matthew Tucci, Roger Lehman, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, Todd Bergeron, Cole Enterprises USA Retirement Plan & Trust, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, John Lachance, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, Vincent Natoli, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Kevin Kenning, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Robert Klugman, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan. (Allison, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ackview Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Ronald Altbach answer due 7/19/2019; American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Autoparts Pensions Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Azalea Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Batavia Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Michael Ben-Jacob answer due 7/19/2019; Todd Bergeron answer due 7/19/2019; Bernina Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC answer due 7/19/2019; Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Bluegrass Retirement Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Doston Bradley answer due 7/19/2019; CSCC Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Calypso Investments Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Casting Pensions Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Central Technologies Pensions Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Bradley Crescenzo answer due 7/19/2019; Gavin Crescenzo answer due 7/19/2019; Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; John Doscas answer due 7/19/2019; Sean Driscoll answer due 7/19/2019; Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Federated Logistics LLC 401K answer due 7/19/2019; Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; David Freelove answer due 7/19/2019; Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Sheldon Goldstein answer due 7/19/2019; Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Joseph Herman answer due 7/19/2019; George Hofmeister answer due 7/19/2019; Industrial Pensions Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; JML Capital LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; JSH Farms 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Robin Jones answer due 7/19/2019; KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust answer due 7/19/2019; KRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Stacey Kaminer answer due 7/19/2019; Kevin Kenning answer due 7/19/2019; Thomas Kertelits answer due 7/19/2019; Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Robert Klugman answer due 7/19/2019; Adam LaRosa answer due 7/19/2019; John Lachance answer due 7/19/2019; Roger Lehman answer due 7/19/2019; Perry Lerner answer due 7/19/2019; Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; MGH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; MSJJ Retirement Group Trust answer due 7/19/2019; Jocelyn Markowitz answer due 7/19/2019; Richard Markowitz answer due 7/19/2019; Michelle Investments Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Edwin Miller answer due 7/19/2019; Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III answer due 7/19/2019; Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Vincent Natoli answer due 7/19/2019; Natoli Management Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Christopher Nowell answer due 7/19/2019; Omineca Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Svetlin Petkov answer due 7/19/2019; Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Mitchell Protass answer due 7/19/2019; RJM Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Random Holdings 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Raubritter LLC Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Routt Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; SRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; SV Holdings, LLC Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Sander Gerber Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Sanford Villa Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; David Schulman answer due 7/19/2019; Joan Schulman answer due 7/19/2019; Shreepah Shah answer due 7/19/2019; Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Gregory Summers answer due 7/19/2019; Tarvos Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Andrea Tew answer due 7/19/2019; Bernard Tew answer due 7/19/2019; Stephanie Tew answer due 7/19/2019; Vincent Tew answer due 7/19/2019; Tew Enterprises, LLC Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; Tew, LP Retirement Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Aria Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Belforte Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Bella Consultants Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Blackbird 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Bradley London Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Busby Black 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Costello Advisors Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Crow Associates Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The DMR Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Eskin Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Fieldcrest Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Green Group Site Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Hawk Group Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Heron Advisors Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The ISDB Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The KASV Group Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Kyber Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The LBR Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Lerici Capital Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Monin Amper Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Mueller Investments Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Oak Tree One 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Oaks Group Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Petkov Partners Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Regoleth Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Robin Daniel Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The SKSL LLC Pension Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The SPKK LLC 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The SVP 401K Plan answer due 7/19/2019; The Sa
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that the time within which Defendants in the cases enumerated in the caption may answer to the Complaints is hereby extended up to and including July 19, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the parties' first request for extension of time to answer to the Complaints for the enumerated cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/12/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(ama)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties that the briefing schedule for the Motion to Dismiss filed on June 12, 2019 (D.I. 134) (the "Motion") is modified as follows: 1. Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen' s current July 12, 2019 deadline to submit a response to the Motion is hereby extended seven (7) days up to and including July 19, 2019. 2. Defendants' deadline to submit a reply in further support of their Motion is hereby extended by 21 days up to and including August 19, 2019. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/19/2019, Replies due by 8/19/2019.) (Signed by Part I Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/12/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(ama)
July 11, 2019 Filing 151 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, Matthew Tucci, Roger Lehman, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, Todd Bergeron, Cole Enterprises USA Retirement Plan & Trust, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, John Lachance, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, Vincent Natoli, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Kevin Kenning, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Robert Klugman, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan. (Allison, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 150 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Cave, Sarah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties that the briefing schedule for the Motion to Dismiss filed on June 12, 2019 (DJ. 134)(the "Motion") is modified as follows: 1. Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen's current June 26, 201 9 deadline to submit a response to the Motion is hereby extended sixteen (16) days up to and including July 12, 2019. 2. Defendants' deadline to submit a reply in further support of their Motion is hereby extended by ten (10) days up to and including July 29, 2019. This is the parties' first request to modify the briefing schedule for the Motion. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/12/2019, Replies due by 7/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 147 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Cave, Sarah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 146 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (62 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 145 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Omineca Pension Plan, Bernina Pension Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 144 JOINDER to join re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Omineca Pension Plan, John van Merkensteijn, Bernina Pension Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 143 JOINDER to join re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (139 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,, (140 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Notice (Other), (135 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,, . Document filed by Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, David Zelman, Robin Jones, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Ronald Altbach, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Perry Lerner, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Rice, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle A. Rice on behalf of Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ronald Altbach, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Robin Jones, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Perry Lerner, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, David Zelman. (Rice, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 141 JOINDER to join re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Michael Ben-Jacob.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Dewey, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Reliance Upon Foreign Law. Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Kasper Bech Pilgaard in Support re: (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Constitutional Act of Denmark, #2 Exhibit B - Public Accounts Law, #3 Exhibit C - Service Regulation, #4 Exhibit D - Overview Section of 2019 Finance Act, #5 Exhibit E - Provisions 2(2) and 3 of the State Accounts Act, #6 Exhibit F - Ministerial Order No. 116, #7 Exhibit G - Provision 4 of Order No. 116, #8 Exhibit H - Agreement between the Ministry of Finance and Danmarks Nationalbank, #9 Exhibit I - Consolidated Act no. 849 of 22 June 2010, #10 Exhibit J - Tax Assessment Act 14 G, #11 Exhibit K - Tax Assessment Act 32 D, #12 Exhibit L - Tax Assessment Act 33 A, #13 Exhibit M - Tax Assessment Act 34, #14 Exhibit N - Tax Administration Act 8, #15 Exhibit O - Tax Administration Act 15 a, #16 Exhibit P - Tax Administration Act 49, #17 Exhibit Q - Tax Administration Act 64, #18 Exhibit R - Tax Control Act 8, #19 Exhibit S - Tax Control Act 14, #20 Exhibit T - Tax Control Act 41, #21 Exhibit U - Tax Control Act 52, #22 Exhibit V - Tax at Source Act 54, #23 Exhibit W - Tax at Source Act 55 A, #24 Exhibit X - Tax at Source Act 85, #25 Exhibit Y - Tax at Source Act 114, #26 Exhibit Z - Local Income Tax Act 14, #27 Exhibit AA - The Act Regulating the Economy of the State Church 3, #28 Exhibit BB - The Collection of Debt Act 10)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 138 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd..(Fraser, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Gabriela Niven on behalf of ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Niven, Kristen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Fraser on behalf of ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Fraser, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (134 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (24 in 1:19-cv-01895-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01906-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01867-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01911-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01904-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01898-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01868-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:19-cv-01924-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (28 in 1:19-cv-01869-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (23 in 1:19-cv-01896-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan.(Bongiorno, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8: Accordingly, the January 9, 2019 opinion governs all the cases subject to Pretrial Order No. 7 except as follows: The payment by mistake claim asserted against defendants in 18-cv-l0100 is dismissed. The aiding and abetting fraud claim asserted against defendants in 18-cv-l0133, 18-cv-10134, 18-cv-10135, and 18-cv-10136 is dismissed. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/12/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
June 12, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Stoddart on behalf of Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Stoddart, Allison)
June 12, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert G. Posada on behalf of Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Posada, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bongiorno, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 129 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan. Document filed by RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Scott Bahnsen on behalf of Omineca Pension Plan, John van Merkensteijn, Bernina Pension Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 127 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. filed by George Hofmeister on behalf of himself and associated Plans Document filed by George Hofmeister.(Toll, Sheldon)
June 3, 2019 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (62 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
June 3, 2019 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Martin H. Kaplan in Opposition re: (62 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims.. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
May 22, 2019 Filing 124 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein; The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that the current May 13, 2019 deadline for Defendant Michael Ben-Jacob in the cases enumerated in the caption to answer or file a motion in response to the Complaints is hereby extended thirty (30) days up to and including June 12, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant expressly reserves, any and all defenses. This is Defendant's first request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaints. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/17/2019) (jca)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that the current May 13, 2019 deadline for defendants Michelle Investments Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, and Xiphias LLC Pension Plan (the "Defendants") in the cases enumerated in the caption to answer or file a motion in response to the Complaints is hereby extended thirty (30) days up to and including June 12, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the Defendants' first request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaints. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:19-cv-01906-LAK, 1:19-cv-01911-LAK, 1:19-cv-01924-LAK(jca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 121 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan. (McCarthy, Sharon)
May 10, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Louise McCarthy on behalf of Xiphias LLC Pension Plan, Remece Investments LLC Pension Plan, Michelle Investments Pension Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:19-cv-01906-LAK, 1:19-cv-01911-LAK, 1:19-cv-01924-LAK(McCarthy, Sharon)
May 9, 2019 Filing 119 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Ben-Jacob. (Dewey, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas E.L. Dewey on behalf of Michael Ben-Jacob. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Dewey, Thomas)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the patties that the current May 13, 2019 deadline for Defendants in the cases enumerated in the caption to answer or file a motion in response to the Complaints is hereby extended thirty (30) days up to and including June 12, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the Defendants' first request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaints. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
May 6, 2019 Filing 116 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Vanderlee Technologies Pension Plan, David Zelman, Robin Jones, Monomer Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Fairlie Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Joseph Herman, Ronald Altbach, Roadcraft Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Keystone Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Edwin Miller, Battu Holdings LLC Roth 401K Plan, Eclouge Industry LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Perry Lerner, Loggerhead Services LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cantata Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Sternway Logistics LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Trailing Edge Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Green Scale Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Dicot Technologies LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tumba Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Albedo Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Crucible Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Cedar Hill Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, True Wind Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, First Ascent Worldwide LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Bareroot Capital Investments LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Ballast Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, PAB Facilities Global LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Plumrose Industries LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fulcrum Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Limelight Global Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. (Rice, Michelle)
May 6, 2019 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Sarah L. Cave in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims.. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cave, Sarah)
May 6, 2019 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Cave, Sarah)
May 6, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants-Counterclaimants Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan and Sheldon Goldsteins Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.(Cave, Sarah)
May 3, 2019 Filing 112 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Omineca Pension Plan, John van Merkensteijn, Bernina Pension Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. (McCarthy, Sharon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 111 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Louise McCarthy on behalf of Omineca Pension Plan, John van Merkensteijn, Bernina Pension Plan, Starfish Capital Management LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Basalt Ventures LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Azalea Pension Plan, Elizabeth van Merkensteijn, Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Tarvos Pension Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(McCarthy, Sharon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of Richard Markowitz, RJM Capital Pension Plan, Hadron Industries LLC Roth 401(K) Plan, Avanix Management LLC Roth 401K Plan, Routt Capital Pension Plan, Calypso Investments Pension Plan, Jocelyn Markowitz, Batavia Capital Pension Plan, Cavus Systems LLC Roth 401(K) Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 108 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #110 Notice of Appearance) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Louise McCarthy on behalf of John van Merkensteijn. (McCarthy, Sharon) Modified on 5/6/2019 (db).
April 29, 2019 Filing 107 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.. (pne)
April 26, 2019 Filing 106 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd., re: (101 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 101 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 101 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Amended Answer to Complaints,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim,. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
April 23, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William R. Maguire on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Maguire, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Loomis Cave on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
April 23, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil John Oxford on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Oxford, Neil)
April 23, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Alan Weinstein on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Weinstein, Marc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 101 AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ED&F Man Capital Markets, Ltd.., COUNTERCLAIM against Skatteforvaltningen. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Kari Parks)(Parks, Kari)
April 23, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Thomas McGoey on behalf of Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(McGoey, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Filing Waivers of Service. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
April 22, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 97 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated 3/25/2019 re: We write on behalf of Plaintiff Skatteforvaltningen ("SKAT"), the Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark. At the last case management conference, the Court requested additional information with respect to one provision in SKAT's revised proposed Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance ("Letter of Request"). That provision asks the Court to certify that "the evidence sought is directly relevant to the issues in dispute and is not discovery within the meaning of Article 23 of the Hague Evidence Convention, that is, discovery intended to lead to relevant evidence for trial." Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.(jca)
April 8, 2019 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Skatteforvaltningen. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parks, Kari)
April 8, 2019 Filing 94 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
April 4, 2019 Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated April 4, 2019 re: Waivers of service and case schedule. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
April 3, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Filing Waivers of Service. Document filed by Skatteforvaltningen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 91 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (87 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Letter, filed by Skatteforvaltningen, SKAT. ENDORSEMENT: 19cv1795 discontinued without prejudice. The clerk shall refund the filing fee. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/20/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:19-cv-01795-LAK(jca) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
March 8, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kari Parks on behalf of Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK(Parks, Kari)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER FOR DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SKATTEFORVALTNINGEN CASES: To facilitate the assignment of these new cases to the undersigned for inclusion in the MDL and the orderly timing of newly filed actions related to 18-MDL-2865 (LAK), the Clerk of Court shall assign all newly filed and related SKAT, or SKATTEFORVALTNINGEN, actions to my docket, related to 18-MDL-2865 (LAK). When commencing the newly filed action, the filing party shall: (a) prominently note in the Related Case Statement the existing case, citing the case name and docket number and order number filed within MDL, along with a copy of this order as an attachment to the Related Case Statement. and also, (b) select origin 8-Multidistrict Litigation (Direct File), on the civil cover sheet for direct filing of this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/05/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(ama)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff andDefendants, by and through their duly authorized respective counsel, that: 1. The title and caption for the multidistrict litigation shall be amended to In re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (Skatteforvaltningen) Tax Refund Scheme Litigation. 2. The titles and captions for all actions consolidated within this multidistrict litigation, listed in the attached Schedule of Actions, shall be amended to reflect Plaintiff's name change to Skatteforvaltningen. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/5/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
March 4, 2019 Filing 87 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated 03/04/2019 re: Related Actions and Duplicate Action. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated 03/01/2019 re: Proposed Order Governing the Role of Lead Counsel. Document filed by SKAT.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 85 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John M. Hanamirian, Esq. dated February 27, 2019 re: In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation. Document filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Christopher Nowell, Gregory Summers, Tveter LLC Pension Plan.(Hanamirian, John)
February 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #84 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
February 25, 2019 Filing 84 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Todd Bergeron, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, Gavin Crescenzo, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Kevin Kenning, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, John Lachance, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Vincent Natoli, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Matthew Tucci, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari. (Allison, Mark) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 22, 2019 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Bryan Skarlatos dated 02/22/2019 re: In re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation, 18-md-2685 (LAK). Document filed by Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, John Doscas, Federated Logistics LLC 401K, David Freelove, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Skarlatos, Bryan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Edward M. Spiro dated February 22, 2019 re: Defendant Adam LaRosa's Answer to Complaint. Document filed by Adam LaRosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spiro, Edward)
February 22, 2019 Filing 81 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 02/22/2019 re: Answers. Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Doston Bradley, Sean Driscoll, Thomas Kertelits, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael Ben-Jacob.(Dewey, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 79 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by SKAT. (Cave, Sarah)
February 22, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sander Gerber Pension Plan.(Andrews, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 77 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 02/20/2019 re: Answers. Document filed by Gavin Crescenzo, Roger Lehman, The Aria Pension Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: (39 in 1:18-cv-10122-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10122-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10133-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10133-LAK, 60 in 1:18-cv-10119-LAK, 60 in 1:18-cv-10119-LAK, 54 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 54 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10126-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10126-LAK, 38 in 1:18-cv-10123-LAK, 38 in 1:18-cv-10123-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10135-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10135-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10124-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10124-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10134-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10134-LAK, 37 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK, 37 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 40 in 1:18-cv-10125-LAK, 40 in 1:18-cv-10125-LAK) Order to Show Cause,,, Set Deadlines,,. Document filed by SKAT. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/24/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 7, 2019 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/24/2019 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Notwithstanding anything to the contrary herein: 1.Any papers filed under seal in this action shall be made part of the public record on or after 2/5/2024 unless the Court otherwise orders. 2.Any person may apply to the Court for access to any papers filed under seal pursuant to this order. Should such an application be made, the person or persons who designated the sealed material as Confidential shall have the burden of establishing good cause for the continuation of the sealing order unless the Court previously made an individualized determination of the existence of good cause for sealing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/5/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
February 4, 2019 Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L Cave dated 02/04/2019 re: Proposed Stipulated Protective Order Governing Confidentiality of Discovery Materials. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
January 31, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: (54 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 54 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Order to Show Cause,,, Set Deadlines,,. Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: (39 in 1:18-cv-10122-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10122-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10133-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10133-LAK, 60 in 1:18-cv-10119-LAK, 60 in 1:18-cv-10119-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10126-LAK, 39 in 1:18-cv-10126-LAK, 38 in 1:18-cv-10123-LAK, 38 in 1:18-cv-10123-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10135-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10135-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10124-LAK, 35 in 1:18-cv-10124-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10134-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10134-LAK, 37 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK, 37 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 63 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 40 in 1:18-cv-10125-LAK, 40 in 1:18-cv-10125-LAK) Order to Show Cause,,, Set Deadlines,,. Document filed by Roger Lehman, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, Doston Bradley, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark D. Allison, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Case Management Conference held on 1/24/2019. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (Mohan, Andrew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John M. Hanamirian, Esq. dated January 23, 2019 re: In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation. Document filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Christopher Nowell, Shreepah Shah, Gregory Summers, Tveter LLC Pension Plan.(Hanamirian, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 68 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated January 23, 2019 re: The proposed role of the Lead Counsel. Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, Todd Bergeron, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, Gavin Crescenzo, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Kevin Kenning, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, John Lachance, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Vincent Natoli, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Matthew Tucci, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that the time within which Defendants in the cases enumerated in the caption may answer to the Complaints is hereby extended up to and including February 22, 2019. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. This is the parties' first request for extension of time to answer to the Complaints. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
January 14, 2019 Filing 66 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, Mitchell Protass, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, Gavin Crescenzo, Roger Lehman, The Stark Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, Doston Bradley, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, John Doscas, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, Svetlin Petkov, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, David Freelove, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, Sander Gerber Pension Plan, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, Thomas Kertelits, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, Adam LaRosa, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan. (Allison, Mark)
January 11, 2019 Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from JOHN M. HANAMIRIAN, ESQ. dated JANUARY 11, 2019 re: In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation. Document filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Christopher Nowell, Gregory Summers, Tveter LLC Pension Plan.(Hanamirian, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated 1/11/2019 re: Proposed Order Regarding the Role of Lead Counsel. Document filed by SKAT.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7 [ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE] The Court having rendered a decision [DI 62] on January 9, 2019 on a motion to dismiss many of these cases under the revenue rule and otherwise, it is hereby ORDERED, as follows: I. The defendants in those cases not enumerated in the caption of that memorandum opinion [DI 62] should show cause on or before January 31, 2019 why the opinion should not govern in their cases. 2. Any reply to such submissions shall be filed on or before February 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 2/14/2019, Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The defendants' motion to dismiss the complaints is denied in all respects. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/9/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(jca)
January 9, 2019 Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
January 9, 2019 Filing 60 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting (57) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis)
January 4, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (39 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION for Discovery /Motion for Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. . Document filed by SKAT. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 57 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (50 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 56 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 45 in 1:18-cv-09797-LAK) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,, addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John C. Blessington dated 12/27/2018. Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Stacey Kaminer, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (36 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK, 36 in 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 39 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 30 in 1:18-cv-05053-LAK) MOTION for Discovery /Motion for Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. . Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, DW Construction Inc Retirement Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Stacey Kaminer, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Sheldon Goldstein, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-05053-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff SKAT and the Pennsylvania Defendants, by and through their duly authorized respective counsel, that: 1. The Motion is hereby stayed pending further direction from the Court, and Plaintiff SKA T's time to respond to the Motion is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(jca)
December 20, 2018 Filing 54 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by SKAT. (Cave, Sarah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated December 18, 2018 re: Proposed Order Outlining the Role of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, Todd Bergeron, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, Gavin Crescenzo, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, JML Capital LLC 401k Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Kevin Kenning, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, John Lachance, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Vincent Natoli, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Matthew Tucci, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mark Allison to RE-FILE Document #52 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings,Other Documents, Letter. (km)
December 18, 2018 Filing 52 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Matthew Tucci, Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, Todd Bergeron, Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan, Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan, Doston Bradley, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, Bradley Crescenzo, Gavin Crescenzo, Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan, Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust, Kevin Kenning, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, John Lachance, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Vincent Natoli, Natoli Management Pension Plan, Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan, Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan, Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan, The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bella Consultants Pension Plan, The Blackbird 401k Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan, The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Crow Associates Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan, The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Green Group Site Pension Plan, The Hawk Group Pension Plan, The Heron Advisors Pension Plan, The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan, The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan, The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan, The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan, The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Mueller Investments Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Oak Tree One 401K Plan, The Oaks Group Pension Plan, The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The Robin Daniel Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sandpiper Pension Plan, The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, The Sinclair Pension Plan, The Skybax LLC 401k Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan, The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan, Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari. (Allison, Mark) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/19/2018 (km).
December 18, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Allison on behalf of Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Robert Klugman, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-07824-LAK, 1:18-cv-07827-LAK, 1:18-cv-07828-LAK, 1:18-cv-07829-LAK(Allison, Mark)
December 18, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zhanna Angert Ziering on behalf of Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Robert Klugman, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-07824-LAK, 1:18-cv-07827-LAK, 1:18-cv-07828-LAK, 1:18-cv-07829-LAK(Ziering, Zhanna)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER, NOW IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that Defendants' deadline to respond to the Motion is extended to December 21, 2018, and SKAT's reply shall be filed by January 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/21/2018, Replies due by 1/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(kv)
December 13, 2018 Filing 48 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by SKAT. (Cave, Sarah)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the parties that the Defendants' deadline to respond to the Motion is extended to December 14, 2018, and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by December 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken, Part I on 12/7/2018) **Filed In All Member Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(anc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 46 DECLARATION of John C. Blessington in Support re: (44 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (40 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss ., (40 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan.(Blessington, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by SKAT. (Cave, Sarah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
November 30, 2018 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Sarah L. Cave in Support re: (27 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK) MOTION for Discovery /Motion for Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark.. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (27 in 1:18-cv-10136-LAK) MOTION for Discovery /Motion for Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. . Document filed by SKAT. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Discovery /Motion for Issuance of a Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Evidence in Denmark. Document filed by SKAT.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a confernece proceeding held on 11/20/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2018 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/20/2018 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff SKAT, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, notifies the Court that SKAT voluntarily dismisses without prejudice Counts I (Fraud), II (Aiding and Abetting Fraud), and VI (Negligent Misrepresentation) against Defendants Newsong Fellowship Church 401K Plan and Alexander Jamie Mitchell III. The Defendants have not answered, moved, or otherwise responded to the Complaint. Therefore, SKAT's dismissal of Counts I, II, and VI is permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) without a Court Order. SKAT's dismissal is not intended to and does not affect any of the other claims asserted in the Complaint or any of its claims against other defendants in this multi-district litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(anc)
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. (35 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 34 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): Only dismisses counts, not the entire action. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(dt)
November 20, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Document filed by SKAT. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
November 20, 2018 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah Cave dated 11/20/2018 re: Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Cave, Sarah)
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sarah cave to RE-FILE Document (32 in 1:18-cv-10100-LAK) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,. Use the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Proposed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, then file the Letter under Other Documents, Letter. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(dt)
November 20, 2018 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. Document filed by SKAT. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Cave, Sarah) Modified on 11/20/2018 (dt).
November 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Oral Argument held on 11/20/2018 re: (8 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) MOTION to Approve Alternative Service . filed by SKAT. See written order issued 11/20/2018. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Mohan, Andrew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil John Oxford on behalf of SKAT. (Oxford, Neil)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF SKAT'S MOTION TO APPROVE ALTERNATIVE SERVICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. SKAT's Motion is DENIED AS MOOT with respect to Defendants Headsail, Aerovane, Edgepoint, and Random Holdings. 2. SKAT's Motion is GRANTED with respect to Defendant Raubritter and SKAT's efforts to serve Defendant Raubritter to date, as described in the Motion, are deemed good and effective service. So ordered. Granting in part and denying in part (27) Motion to Approve Alternative Service in case 1:18-cv-04833-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (rjm)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6. The Court having conducted a Rule 16 conference with counsel, it is hereby ORDERED, as follows: 1. The application of Mark D. Allison, Esq., of the firm of Caplin & Diysdale for appointment as Lead Counsel for defendants [DI 6] is granted. 2. The parties shall confer with respect to the role of Lead Counsel for defendants and all other matters relating to the just, speedy and inexpensive conduct of the litigation, including among other things, the management and coordination of discovery and of motion practice. Lead Counsel shall file its proposed order with respect to these matters on or before December 18, 2018. Any response to that proposal shall be filed on or before January 11, 2019. The Court shall conduct a conference on these matters on January 24, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. 3. The dates set forth in paragraphs 6.1, 6.2 and 6.4 of Pretrial Order No. 4 are adjourned sine die. 4. Lead Counsel shall consult with the Clerk of Court to ensure that all individual actions with this multidistrict litigation are related to this master docket number 18-md-2865 for electronic filing purposes. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) Deadlines Terminated*** The following deadline(s) was terminated: Amended Pleadings Deadline, Joinder of Parties Deadline, Deposition Deadline, Discovery Deadline. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al, as per Chambers. (rjm).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting (26) Motion for Brandon R Dillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting (25) Motion for John C Blessington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis)
November 19, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John C. Blessington dated November 19, 2018 re: status of the SKAT v. Newsong Fellowship Church 401K Plan and Alexander Jamie Mitchell III, Civ. No. 18-cv-10100-LAK (the Newsong Action).. Document filed by Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Brandon R. Dillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-15935987. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brandon R. Dillman, #2 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Dillman, Brandon)
November 19, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for John C. Blessington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-15935821. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Investment Group Of New York, L.P. Pension Plan, Kamco Investments Inc Pension Plan, Kamco LP Profit Sharing Pension Plan, Linden Associates Defined Benefit Plan, Moira Associates LLC 401K Plan, Riverside Associates Defined Benefit Plan, David Schulman, Joan Schulman, Alexander Jamie Mitchell, III, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan, Newsong Fellowship Church 401k Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Blessington, #2 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-09797-LAK, 1:18-cv-10100-LAK(Blessington, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David L Goldberg on behalf of Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Robert Klugman, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, Random Holdings 401K Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Goldberg, David)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff SKAT and Defendant Klugman, by and through their duly authorized respective counsel, that: Counsel for Defendant Klugman is hereby ordered to accept service of process on behalf of the Defendant Plans. The service of process on the Defendant Plans shall be deemed completed nunc pro tune to August 28, 2018. The Defendant Plans shall be deemed to have joined the Joint Motion to Dismiss, filed on August 15, 2018 in the Southern District of New York Master Docket in this litigation, No. 18-cv-4047 (LAK) (Dck. Nos. 34-36). The appearance of the Defendant Plans in this litigation, and their acceptance of service of process, shall not prejudice any claim or defense that Plaintiff SKAT, Defendant Klugman, or the Defendant Plans may have, including but not limited to claims or defenses by reason of dissolution. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-07824-LAK, 1:18-cv-07827-LAK, 1:18-cv-07828-LAK, 1:18-cv-07829-LAK(anc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 11/5/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 11/5/2018 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by SKAT. (Cave, Sarah)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/13/2018) (jca)
November 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/21/2018. (jca)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-04047-LAK; granting (17) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:18-md-02865-LAK. Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al. (jca)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To SKAT's Motion To Approve Alternative Service, addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David L. Goldberg dated November 9, 2018. Document filed by Robert Klugman.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Goldberg, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John M. Hanamirian, Esq. dated November 7, 2018 re: In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation. Document filed by Christopher Nowell, Tveter LLC Pension Plan, Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Shreepal Shah, Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Gregory Summers.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK, 1:18-cv-10088-LAK, 1:18-cv-10090-LAK, 1:18-cv-10130-LAK(Hanamirian, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David L. Goldberg dated November 7, 2018 re: Support Of The October 24, 2018 Letter Of Mark D. Allison For Appointment As Lead Counsel. Document filed by Robert Klugman.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(Goldberg, David)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.5: As counsel previously were notified, the oral argument on the motion to dismiss [DI 34 in 18-CV-4047(LAK)] will be heard on Monday, 11/5/2018 at 2:00 PM. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 11/5/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/1/2018)**Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(anc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sarah L. Cave dated 10/31/2018. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Morten Niels Jakobsen)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mark D. Allison in Support re: (34 in 1:18-cv-04047-LAK) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints.. Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, Doston Bradley, Gavin Crescenzo, Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, John Doscas, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, David Freelove, Sheldon Goldstein, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, Adam LaRosa, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Raubritter LLC Pension Plan, Sander Gerber Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 63A, #4 Exhibit 63B, #5 Exhibit 64, #6 Exhibit 64A, #7 Exhibit 64B, #8 Exhibit 65)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(Allison, Mark)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (34 in 1:18-cv-04047-LAK) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints. . Document filed by Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, Doston Bradley, Gavin Crescenzo, Del Mar Asset Management Saving & Retirement Plan, John Doscas, Sean Driscoll, Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan, David Freelove, Sheldon Goldstein, Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan, Thomas Kertelits, Robert Klugman, Adam LaRosa, Roger Lehman, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, Mitchell Protass, Random Holdings 401K Plan, Raubritter LLC Pension Plan, Sander Gerber Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The Goldstein Law Group PC 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Stark Pension Plan, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The West River Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(Allison, Mark)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Sarah L. Cave in Support re: (27 in 1:18-cv-07828-LAK, 28 in 1:18-cv-07827-LAK, 8 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 27 in 1:18-cv-04833-LAK, 28 in 1:18-cv-07824-LAK, 27 in 1:18-cv-07829-LAK) MOTION to Approve Alternative Service .. Document filed by SKAT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (8 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 27 in 1:18-cv-04833-LAK, 28 in 1:18-cv-07824-LAK, 27 in 1:18-cv-07828-LAK, 27 in 1:18-cv-07829-LAK, 28 in 1:18-cv-07827-LAK) MOTION to Approve Alternative Service . . Document filed by SKAT. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Approve Alternative Service . Document filed by SKAT.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Cave, Sarah)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John M. Hanamirian, Esq. dated October 25, 2018 re: Application for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Christopher Nowell, Shreepah Shah, Gregory Summers.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(Hanamirian, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark D. Allison dated 10/24/2018 re: Application for appointment of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Roger Lehman, The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan, Gavin Crescenzo, The Stark Pension Plan, The Costello Advisors Pension Plan, The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan, Doston Bradley, The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan, CSCC Capital Pension Plan, The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan, The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The Kyber Pension Plan, Sanford Villa Pension Plan, The Lerici Capital Pension Plan, The SKSL LLC Pension Plan, NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan, Carl Andrew Vergari, The LBR Capital Pension Plan, The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan, The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan, Ackview Solo 401K Plan, Sean Driscoll, The Busby Black 401K Plan, The ISDB Pension Plan, Thomas Kertelits, The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan, Svetlin Petkov, The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan, Michael Ben-Jacob, The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan, The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan, The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan, The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan, The Cambridge Town Line Pension Plan, The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan, Mitchell Protass, The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan, The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan, The Aria Pension Plan, The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan, The Belforte Pension Plan, The Bradley London Pension Plan, The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan, The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan, The DMR Pension Plan, The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan, The Eskin Pension Plan, The Fieldcrest Pension Plan, The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan, The KASV Group Pension Plan, The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan, The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan, The Monin Amper Pension Plan, The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan, The Petkov Partners Pension Plan, The Regoleth Pension Plan, The SPKK LLC 401K Plan, The SVP 401K Plan, The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan, The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan, The Snow Hill Pension Plan, The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan, The West River Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A. List of Cases, #2 Appendix B. Public Profiles)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(Allison, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (54 in 1:18-cv-04047-LAK, 4 in 1:18-md-02865-LAK) Letter,, filed by Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Shreepah Shah, Christopher Nowell, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Tveter LLC Pension Plan, Gregory Summers, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust. ENDORSEMENT: Reconsideration granted. The Court adheres to its prior order. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(anc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John M. Hanamirian, Esq. dated October 22, 2018 re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (SKAT) Tax Refund Litigation - Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Gregory Summers, Christopher Nowell, Shreepah Shah, Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan, Tveter LLC Pension Plan, Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan, Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK, 1:18-cv-04047-LAK(Hanamirian, John)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE: Counsel are advised as follows: 1. The wife of the undersigned was employed by Random House prior to her retirement in or about 2000 and thus prior to her marriage to the undersigned in 2004. 2. She receives pension payments related to that prior employment from Advance Pension Plan and supplemental payments under the Random House Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan. 3. To the best of the knowledge of the undersigned, his wife has no connection to Random Holding 401K Plan, which is a defendant in one of the cases in this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/10/2018) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(anc)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: It is hereby ORDERED, as follows: Every paper hereafter filed in the consolidated action shall bear the caption set forth above and shall state in the caption in accordance with Pretrial Order No. 1 filed in 18-cv-4047 either that the paper applies to All Cases or, if it does not, the Southern District of New York docket number of each case to which the paper applies. Counsel filing papers electronically shall ensure that each filing is made in the master docket and "spread" to each additional action to which it applies. Counsel are invited to consult the Clerk's Office if assistance is required in complying with this direction. This order is without prejudice to the rights of any party to move to sever any claim or action; and as further set forth herein. Joinder of Parties due by 1/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Deposition due by 10/31/2019. Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2019. Motions due by 10/24/2018. Responses due by 11/7/2018 Status Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/10/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:18-md-02865-LAK et al.(anc)
October 9, 2018 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:18-cv-04047 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04049 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04050 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04051 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04052 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04430 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04434 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04522 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04531 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04536 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04538 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04541 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04543 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04767 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04770 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04771(LAK), 1:18-cv-04833 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04890 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04892 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04894 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04896 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04898 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04899 (LAK), 1:18-cv-04900 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05045 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05053 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05147 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05150 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05151 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05158 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05164 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05180 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05183 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05185 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05186 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05188 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05189 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05190 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05192 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05193 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05194 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05299 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05300 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05305 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05307 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05308 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05309 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05374 (LAK), 1:18-cv-05057 (LAK), 1:18-cv-07824 (LAK), 1:18-cv-07827 (LAK), 1:18-cv-07828 (LAK), 1:18-cv-07829 (LAK), 1:18-cv-08655 (LAK),. (sjo)
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 9, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Connecticut, Florida, Illinois, Kentucky, Massachusetts, New Jersey, New York, Ohio, Pennsylvania, Texas and Utah, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Lewis A. Kaplan, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/3/2018) (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Customs and Tax Administration of the Kingdom of Denmark (Skatteforvaltningen) Tax Refund Scheme Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlin Petkov
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stark Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The LBR Capital Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The M2F Wellness LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dosmon Bly Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Villa Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bravos Advisors 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fieldcrest Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The India Bombay LLC 401K Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Costello Advisors Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Petkov Management LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The NYC Stanismore Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Klugman
Represented By: Michael Max Rosensaft
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ben-Jacob
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: David S. Pegno
Represented By: Thomas E.L. Dewey
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proper Pacific LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bradley London Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doscas
Represented By: Juliet Leah Fink
Represented By: Bryan C. Skarlatos
Represented By: Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam LaRosa
Represented By: Audrey Sarah Minnie Feldman
Represented By: Edward M. Spiro
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headsail Manufacturing LLC Roth 401K Plan
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TKKJ LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stor Capital Consulting LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Petkov Partners Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sector 230 LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The ISDB Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regoleth Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Belforte Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lerici Capital Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Crescenzo
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ludlow Holdings 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ackview Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sander Gerber Pension Plan
Represented By: Juliet Leah Fink
Represented By: Stephen D. Andrews
Represented By: Amy McKinlay
Represented By: Bryan C. Skarlatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doston Bradley
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The MPQ Holdings LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Busby Black 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Houston Rocco LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Alpha LLC 401K Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Juliet Leah Fink
Represented By: Bryan C. Skarlatos
Represented By: Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Monin Amper Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random Holdings 401K Plan
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The SPKK LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYCATX LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Protass
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The SVP 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raubritter LLC Pension Plan
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Krabi Holdings LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The KASV Group Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Atlantic DHR 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Eskin Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Aria Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kyber Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Texas Rocco LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Saba Capital LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The West River Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Driscoll
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Westport Advisors LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The DMR Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Andrew Vergari
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kertelits
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Canada Rock LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgepoint Capital LLC Roth 401K Plan
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kodiak Capital Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Aston Advisors LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerovane Logistics LLC Roth 401K Plan
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Lehman
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Valerie Marie Talkers
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The SKSL LLC Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wave Maven LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Westridge Ave LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heron Advisors Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Egret Associates LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Osprey Associates LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hotel Fromance Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Diamond Scott Capital Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Fox 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Way LLC Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KK Law Firm Retirement Plan Trust
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Shay-Ann Michelle Heiser Singh
Represented By: Guinevere Marie Moore
Represented By: Jenny Louise Johnson Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shapiro Blue Management LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Way LLC 401k Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lachance
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cardinal Consulting Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 78 Yorktown Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mueller Investments Pension Plan
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Represented By: Valerie Marie Talkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Skybax LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SV Holdings, LLC Retirement Plan
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Patrick Partners Conglomerate Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Robin Daniel Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tucci
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sea Bright Advisors LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Tew
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hawk Group Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSCC Capital Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lakeview Advisors 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blackbird 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Group Site Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Valerie Marie Talkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natoli Management Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreepah Shah
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delgado Fox LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tew, LP Retirement Plan
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mountain Air LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Oaks Group Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dink14 LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ocean Equity LLC Retirement Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Shay-Ann Michelle Heiser Singh
Represented By: Guinevere Marie Moore
Represented By: Jenny Louise Johnson Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onezerofive LLC Solo 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Pensions Group Trust
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joanne E. Bradley Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Zen Training LLC 401(K) Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Tew
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sinclair Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Valerie Marie Talkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSJJ Retirement Group Trust
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sandpiper Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acorn Capital Corporation Employee Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Everything Clean LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chambers Property Management LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Beech Tree Partners 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Natoli
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The RDL Consulting Group LLC Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiftyeightsixty LLC Solo 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crow Associates Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Oak Tree One 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The FWC Capital LLC Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Nowell
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Represented By: David B. Zabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGH Farms LLC 401(K) Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jump Group LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JML Capital LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jayfran Blue Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Tew
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The JT Health Consulting LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Throckmorton Realty Advisors 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hoboken Advisors LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Retirement Group Trust
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: Ross Hooper
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Balmoral Management LLC 401k Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Fonta Trading LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casting Pensions Group Trust
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSH Farms 401(K) Plan
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Tew
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrain Pegasus LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Crescenzo
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Snow Hill Pension Plan
Represented By: Elissa C. S. Burton
Represented By: Mark D. Allison
Represented By: Zhanna Ziering
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hibiscus Partners LLC 401k Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Investment Management, LLC Retirement Plan
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bella Consultants Pension Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Valerie Marie Talkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tag Realty Advisors LLC 401k
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tew Enterprises, LLC Retirement Plan
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acorn Capital Strategies LLC Employee Pension Profit Sharing Plan & Trust
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Technologies Pensions Group Trust
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Thomas Ross Hooper
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kenning
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Shay-Ann Michelle Heiser Singh
Represented By: Guinevere Marie Moore
Represented By: Jenny Louise Johnson Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerius LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Summers
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoparts Pensions Group Trust
Represented By: John W. Pollom
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Maple Advisors LLC 401k Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hofmeister
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gyos 23 LLC Solo 401K Plan
Represented By: Zhanna Angert Ziering
Represented By: Mark David Allison
Represented By: Kellen Ross Scott
Represented By: Ryan Oliver Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tveter LLC Pension Plan
Represented By: John M. Hanamirian
Represented By: David B. Zabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voojo Productions LLC Roth 401(K) Plan
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bahnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omineca Pension Plan
Represented By: Sharon Louise McCarthy
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bahnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinax Holdings LLC Roth 401(K) Plan
Represented By: Michelle A. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web