Arias et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran Featured Case
Plaintiff: Karen Parro, Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Ricardo Asitimbay, Donna Molinaro, Camille Nicole Martin, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Thomas V. Arias, Marcus W. Flagg, Corey G. Gaudioso, Maureen F. Bosco, Margaret Quinn Metz, Mary Dwyer, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Joseph W. Gardner, Elizabeth Parks, Anthony G. Preziose, Edwin Asitimbay, Wilmer Mijia, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi, Norma Jean Margiotta, Colin Glick, Marie Scotto Giordano, Ina Barnes, Naoemi P. Gullickson, Gina Laura Giovanniello, Thomas S. Arias, DOE 136, Sean P. OBrien, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Theresa Giammona, Marion Susan Otten, Wilson Asitimbay, Robert E. Carlo, Joseph W. Gardener, Rita Hopper, Jake D. Preziose, Courtney Glick, Christine Curatolo, DOE 136A, Susan M. Pollio, Jeanene McGregor, Carmen C. Mejia, Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Patricia Olson, Richard K. Ketler, Maria Vigiano-Trapp, Michael Mozzillo, DOE 136B, Christine M. Munson, Jacqueline Genovese, Helen Katrina Dawson, Norma I. Margiotta, Margaret Poulos, Charles V. Margiotta, Patricia N. Papa, Samantha Fishman, Stephen J. Masi, Aseneth Bunin, DOE 136C, Johnny Lee, John David Ketler, Linda Murphy, Lori T. Marshall, John Patrick Conlon, Barbara A. Laurencin, Matthew Bowden, Bibiano Dechavaz, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Julio Caceres, Susan Giberson, Denise Reid Chapa, Theresa Bevilacqua, Ralph Rocco Licciardi, Joanne Licciardi, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Doreen E. Rowland, Stephen Bunin, Lori A. Preziose, Shawn Bittner, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Nigel Durnstan Cox, Barbara Merdinger, Sandra Gidman and Elza Marie McGowan
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2019cv00041
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Michael Eubanks, # 2 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of John Michael Eubanks)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (sj)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: 5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Thomas V. Arias, Thomas S. Arias, Edwin Asitimbay, Ricardo Asitimbay, Wilson Asitimbay, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Ina Barnes(Individually), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Maureen F. Bosco, Matthew Bowden, Julio Caceres, Robert E. Carlo, Denise Reid Chapa, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Nigel Durnstan Cox, Christine Curatolo, Helen Katrina Dawson, Bibiano Dechavaz, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Doe 136, Mary Dwyer, Samantha Fishman, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Joseph W. Gardener, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Jacqueline Genovese, Theresa Giammona, Susan Giberson, Sandra Gidman, Marie Scotto Giordano, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Colin Glick, Courtney Glick, Naoemi P. Gullickson, Rita Hopper, John David Ketler, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Johnny Lee, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Joanne Licciardi, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Ralph Rocco Licciardi, Charles V. Margiotta, Norma Jean Margiotta, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Lori T. Marshall, Camille Nicole Martin, Stephen J. Masi, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Elza Marie McGowan, Jeanene McGregor, Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Carmen C. Mejia, Barbara Merdinger, Margaret Quinn Metz, Wilmer Mijia, Donna Molinaro, Michael Mozzillo, Christine M. Munson, Linda Murphy, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Sean P. OBrien, Patricia Olson, Marion Susan Otten, Patricia N. Papa, Elizabeth Parks, Karen Parro, Personal Representative of the Estate of Aseneth Bunin, Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen E. Rowland, Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen Bunin, Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan M. Pollio, Margaret Poulos, Anthony G. Preziose, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Jake D. Preziose, Lori A. Preziose, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually). (Haefele, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Thomas V. Arias, Thomas S. Arias, Edwin Asitimbay, Ricardo Asitimbay, Wilson Asitimbay, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Ina Barnes(Individually), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Maureen F. Bosco, Matthew Bowden, Julio Caceres, Robert E. Carlo, Denise Reid Chapa, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Nigel Durnstan Cox, Christine Curatolo, Helen Katrina Dawson, Bibiano Dechavaz, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Doe 136, Mary Dwyer, Samantha Fishman, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Joseph W. Gardener, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Jacqueline Genovese, Theresa Giammona, Susan Giberson, Sandra Gidman, Marie Scotto Giordano, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Colin Glick, Courtney Glick, Naoemi P. Gullickson, Rita Hopper, John David Ketler, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Johnny Lee, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Joanne Licciardi, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Ralph Rocco Licciardi, Charles V. Margiotta, Norma Jean Margiotta, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Lori T. Marshall, Camille Nicole Martin, Stephen J. Masi, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Elza Marie McGowan, Jeanene McGregor, Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Carmen C. Mejia, Barbara Merdinger, Margaret Quinn Metz, Wilmer Mijia, Donna Molinaro, Michael Mozzillo, Christine M. Munson, Linda Murphy, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Sean P. OBrien, Patricia Olson, Marion Susan Otten, Patricia N. Papa, Elizabeth Parks, Karen Parro, Personal Representative of the Estate of Aseneth Bunin, Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen E. Rowland, Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen Bunin, Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan M. Pollio, Margaret Poulos, Anthony G. Preziose, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Jake D. Preziose, Lori A. Preziose, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually).(Haefele, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haefele, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Joseph W. Gardener, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Anthony G. Preziose, Norma Jean Margiotta, Christine Curatolo, Jeanene McGregor, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Linda Murphy, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Denise Reid Chapa, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Patricia Olson, Barbara Merdinger, Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen E. Rowland, Joanne Licciardi, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Nigel Durnstan Cox, Jake D. Preziose, Margaret Poulos, Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Doe 136, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Michael Mozzillo, Rita Hopper, Elizabeth Parks, Lori A. Preziose, Donna Molinaro, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Mary Dwyer, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Theresa Giammona, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually), Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan M. Pollio, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Sandra Gidman, Maureen F. Bosco, Robert E. Carlo, Sean P. OBrien, Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Charles V. Margiotta, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Carmen C. Mejia, Lori T. Marshall, Colin Glick, Patricia N. Papa, Wilmer Mijia, Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Johnny Lee, Camille Nicole Martin, Elza Marie McGowan, Stephen J. Masi, Thomas V. Arias, John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Thomas S. Arias, Karen Parro, Samantha Fishman, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Margaret Quinn Metz, Susan Giberson, Julio Caceres, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Ralph Rocco Licciardi, John David Ketler, Bibiano Dechavaz, Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Christine M. Munson, Helen Katrina Dawson, Marie Scotto Giordano, Courtney Glick, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Matthew Bowden, Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen Bunin, Ina Barnes(Individually), Marion Susan Otten, Edwin Asitimbay, Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Personal Representative of the Estate of Aseneth Bunin, Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Naoemi P. Gullickson, Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Jacqueline Genovese, Ricardo Asitimbay, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Wilson Asitimbay.(Haefele, Robert)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons due to party modification to correspond with pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement due to party modification. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located athttp://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading due to party modification. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
January 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
January 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1605; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1605A; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Personal Representative of the Estate of Aseneth Bunin; Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen E. Rowland; Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen Bunin; Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan M. Pollio; Doe 136; Doe 136; Doe 136. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered incorrectly. (sj)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas V. Arias, Thomas S. Arias, Edwin Asitimbay, Ricardo Asitimbay, Wilson Asitimbay, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Ina Barnes(Individually), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Maureen F. Bosco, Matthew Bowden, Aseneth Bunin, Stephen Bunin, Julio Caceres, Robert E. Carlo, Denise Reid Chapa, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Nigel Durnstan Cox, Christine Curatolo, DOE 136, DOE 136A, DOE 136B, DOE 136C, Helen Katrina Dawson, Bibiano Dechavaz, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Mary Dwyer, Samantha Fishman, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Joseph W. Gardener, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Jacqueline Genovese, Theresa Giammona, Susan Giberson, Sandra Gidman, Marie Scotto Giordano, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Colin Glick, Courtney Glick, Naoemi P. Gullickson, Rita Hopper, John David Ketler, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Johnny Lee, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Joanne Licciardi, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Ralph Rocco Licciardi, Charles V. Margiotta, Norma Jean Margiotta, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Lori T. Marshall, Camille Nicole Martin, Stephen J. Masi, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Elza Marie McGowan, Jeanene McGregor, Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Carmen C. Mejia, Barbara Merdinger, Margaret Quinn Metz, Wilmer Mijia, Donna Molinaro, Michael Mozzillo, Christine M. Munson, Linda Murphy, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Sean P. OBrien, Patricia Olson, Marion Susan Otten, Patricia N. Papa, Elizabeth Parks, Karen Parro, Susan M. Pollio, Margaret Poulos, Anthony G. Preziose, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Jake D. Preziose, Lori A. Preziose, Doreen E. Rowland, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually). (Haefele, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2019 (sj).
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Thomas V. Arias, Thomas S. Arias, Edwin Asitimbay, Ricardo Asitimbay, Wilson Asitimbay, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Ina Barnes(Individually), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Maureen F. Bosco, Matthew Bowden, Aseneth Bunin, Stephen Bunin, Julio Caceres, Robert E. Carlo, Denise Reid Chapa, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Nigel Durnstan Cox, Christine Curatolo, DOE 136, DOE 136A, DOE 136B, DOE 136C, Helen Katrina Dawson, Bibiano Dechavaz, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Mary Dwyer, Samantha Fishman, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Joseph W. Gardener, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Jacqueline Genovese, Theresa Giammona, Susan Giberson, Sandra Gidman, Marie Scotto Giordano, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Colin Glick, Courtney Glick, Naoemi P. Gullickson, Rita Hopper, John David Ketler, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Johnny Lee, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Joanne Licciardi, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Ralph Rocco Licciardi, Charles V. Margiotta, Norma Jean Margiotta, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Lori T. Marshall, Camille Nicole Martin, Stephen J. Masi, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Elza Marie McGowan, Jeanene McGregor, Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Carmen C. Mejia, Barbara Merdinger, Margaret Quinn Metz, Wilmer Mijia, Donna Molinaro, Michael Mozzillo, Christine M. Munson, Linda Murphy, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Sean P. OBrien, Patricia Olson, Marion Susan Otten, Patricia N. Papa, Elizabeth Parks, Karen Parro, Susan M. Pollio, Margaret Poulos, Anthony G. Preziose, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Jake D. Preziose, Lori A. Preziose, Doreen E. Rowland, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually).(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2019 (sj).
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haefele, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2019 (sj).
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16130557)Document filed by Joseph W. Gardener, Marcus W. Flagg(as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson F. Flagg, Deceased), Anthony G. Preziose, Norma Jean Margiotta, Christine Curatolo, Jeanene McGregor, Ina Barnes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Roy J. Barnes), Linda Murphy, DOE 136B, John Patrick Conlon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Clancy Conlon), Bernadette McHugh-Torres, Denise Reid Chapa, Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Angrisani), Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(Individually), Patricia Olson, Barbara Merdinger, DOE 136C, Doreen E. Rowland, Joanne Licciardi, Norma I. Margiotta(Individually), Nigel Durnstan Cox, Jake D. Preziose, Margaret Poulos, Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen F. Masi), Marcus W. Flagg(Individually), Corey G. Gaudioso(Individually), Shawn Bittner, Gabrielle M. Preziose, Michael Mozzillo, Rita Hopper, Elizabeth Parks, Lori A. Preziose, Donna Molinaro, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Thomas Vigiano, II, Deceased), Mary Dwyer, Richard K. Ketler(Individually), Theresa Giammona, Maria Vigiano-Trapp(Individually), Susan M. Pollio, Michael Sebastian Licciardi, Sandra Gidman, Maureen F. Bosco, Robert E. Carlo, Sean P. OBrien, Barbara A. Laurencin(Individually), Charles V. Margiotta, Jennifer Dawn Licciardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ralph Michael Licciardi), Carmen C. Mejia, Lori T. Marshall, Colin Glick, Patricia N. Papa, Wilmer Mijia, Kimberly Patrice Conlon, Norma I. Margiotta(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Joseph Margiotta), Johnny Lee, Camille Nicole Martin, Elza Marie McGowan, Stephen J. Masi, Thomas V. Arias, John Patrick Conlon(Individually), Thomas S. Arias, Karen Parro, Samantha Fishman, Karen Lisa O'Keefe, DOE 136A, DOE 136, Virginia M. O'Keefe, Margaret Quinn Metz, Susan Giberson, Julio Caceres, Rufus J. McDay, Jr., Ralph Rocco Licciardi, John David Ketler, Bibiano Dechavaz, Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Christine M. Munson, Helen Katrina Dawson, Marie Scotto Giordano, Courtney Glick, Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez, Matthew Bowden, Stephen Bunin, Ina Barnes(Individually), Marion Susan Otten, Edwin Asitimbay, Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Candace Lee Williams), Aseneth Bunin, Theresa Bevilacqua(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Masi), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Naoemi P. Gullickson, Theresa Bevilacqua(Individually), Jacqueline Genovese, Ricardo Asitimbay, Joseph W. Gardner, Corey G. Gaudioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sherri A. Williams), Gina Laura Giovanniello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Doreen J. Angrisani), Wilson Asitimbay.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 1/3/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Parro
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette McHugh-Torres
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Asitimbay
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Molinaro
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Nicole Martin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sebastian Licciardi
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas V. Arias
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus W. Flagg
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey G. Gaudioso
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen F. Bosco
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Quinn Metz
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dwyer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle M. Preziose
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Parks
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Preziose
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Asitimbay
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Mijia
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dawn Licciardi
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Margiotta
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Glick
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Scotto Giordano
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Barnes
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naoemi P. Gullickson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Laura Giovanniello
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Arias
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOE 136
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean P. OBrien
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asuncion Malabuyoc Dechavez
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Giammona
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Susan Otten
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Asitimbay
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Carlo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Gardener
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Hopper
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake D. Preziose
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Glick
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Curatolo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOE 136A
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Pollio
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanene McGregor
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen C. Mejia
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Patrice Conlon
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Olson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Ketler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vigiano-Trapp
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mozzillo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOE 136B
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M. Munson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Genovese
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Katrina Dawson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma I. Margiotta
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Poulos
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles V. Margiotta
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia N. Papa
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Fishman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Masi
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aseneth Bunin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOE 136C
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Lee
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Ketler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Murphy
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori T. Marshall
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrick Conlon
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Laurencin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bowden
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bibiano Dechavaz
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus J. McDay, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Caceres
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Giberson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Reid Chapa
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Bevilacqua
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Rocco Licciardi
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Licciardi
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lisa O'Keefe
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen E. Rowland
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bunin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Preziose
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Bittner
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia M. O'Keefe
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel Durnstan Cox
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Merdinger
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gidman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elza Marie McGowan
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?