Yu v. GreenSky, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Yu
Defendant: Fifth Third Securities, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, JPMorgan Securities LLC, Joel Babbit, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., John Flynn, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., GreenSky, Inc., Gerald Benjamin, Robert Partlow, David Zalik, Gregg Freishtat, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Robert Sheft, Nigel Morris, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc. and SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Petitioner: Luciano Felice and The Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00100
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING THE PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND HARD-COPY DOCUMENTS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Lead Plaintiffs Northeast Carpenters Annuity Fund ("Northeast Carpenters"), El Paso Firemen & Policemen's Pension Fund ("El Paso"), and the Employees' Retirement System of the City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge ("CPERS") (collectively, "Lead Plaintiffs"), and Defendants GreenSky, Inc., David Zalik, Robert Partlow, Joel Babbit, Gerald Benjamin, John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, Nigel Morris and Robert Sheft (the "GreenSky Defendants"), as well as Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sandler O'Neill& Partners, L.P., Fifth Third Securities, Inc., and Guggenheim Securities, LLC (the "Underwriter Defendants"), each of whom individually is referred to herein as a "Party," and collectively, the "Parties," that this protocol (the "Protocol") governs the search, processing and production of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") and Hard-Copy Documents during the pendency of this litigation. This Order shall govern the search for, processing of, and production of ESI and of Hard- Copy Documents after the execution of this ESI Protocol. The Parties agree to meet and confer regarding the applicability of this ESI Protocol to productions made prior to its execution. To the extent this ESI Protocol shall apply to productions made prior to its execution, the Parties agree that sections 6.2 and 6.8 herein shall not apply to such productions and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/3/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-11071-AKH, 1:19-cv-00100-AKH (yv)
January 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of Joel Babbit, John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, Nigel Morris, Robert Sheft. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-11071-AKH, 1:19-cv-00100-AKH(Rabin, Shawn)
January 22, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of Joel Babbit, John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, Nigel Morris, Robert Sheft. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-11071-AKH, 1:19-cv-00100-AKH(Rabin, Shawn)
November 1, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #51 ENDORSED LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rro)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION & ORDER re: (29 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE, 29 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE, 29 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 filed by Luciano Felice, (46 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Appoint San Antonio Fire & Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by San Antonio Fire & Police Pension Fund, (30 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 30 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 30 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Mitchell DeVivo to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00100 filed by Mitchell DeVivo, (36 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Counsel filed by Jason Han, (33 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 33 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 33 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 filed by Luciano Felice, (32 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE, 32 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE, 32 in 1:19-cv-00100-PAE) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071 . MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis, (43 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 43 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 43 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071; 1:19-cv-0100 . MOTION to Appoint Leslie W. Winegarden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Leslie W. Winegarden, (40 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) FIRST MOTION to Appoint The Fund Group (Northeast Carpenters, El Paso, and CPERS) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate cases, and appoint lead counsel. filed by The Fund Group, (48 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 48 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 48 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-00100 . MOTION to Appoint David Passerallo to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel filed by David Passerallo, (47 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 47 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 47 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-00100 . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis, (56 in 1:18-cv-11071-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Consolidation and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. To summarize, these two cases (18 Civ. 11071 and 19 Civ. 100) are now consolidated for all purposes, and shall proceed under the name, In re GreenSky Securities Litigation, and under the case number 18 Civ. 11071. The Fund Group's motion seeking appointment as lead plaintiff is granted. The Court appoints Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP as co-lead counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at 18 Civ. 11071, docket entries 30, 33, 36, 40, 43, 46, 47, 48, and 56; and at 19 Civ. 100, docket entries 29 and 32. In light of the consolidation, the Clerk of Court is also directed to close the Yu case, 19 Civ. 100. The Court directs the parties to meet and confer and, by April 15, 2019, to submit a joint letter to the Court with an efficient proposed schedule for next steps in this case, including proposed dates for the filing of (1) a consolidated amended complaint and (2) defendants' response. If defendants anticipate that their response will take the form of a motion to dismiss, the parties shall include proposed dates for the opposition and reply briefs as well. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-11071-PAE, 1:19-cv-00100-PAE(anc) Modified on 4/2/2019 (anc).
March 29, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:18-cv-11071-PAE. (anc)
March 12, 2019 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc.; Corporate Parent Guggenheim Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Sammons Enterprises Inc. for Guggenheim Securities, LLC; Corporate Parent J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Fifth Third Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bank, Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price for Fifth Third Securities, Inc.; Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sandler O'Neill & Partners Corp., Corporate Parent SOP Holdings, LLC for Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P.; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Fifth Third Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc..(Cosenza, Todd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Bower on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Fifth Third Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (Bower, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd G. Cosenza on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Fifth Third Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (Cosenza, Todd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions filed in Related Case No. 1:18-cv-11071 re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 .. Document filed by Luciano Felice. (Press, Ira)
February 8, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071 . MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Twersky, Mitchell)
February 1, 2019 Filing 44 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Joel Babbit, Gerald Benjamin, John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, GreenSky, Inc., Nigel Morris, Robert Partlow, Robert Sheft, David Zalik. (DeMasi, Karin)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nigel Morris waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Zalik waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gerald Benjamin waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Sheft waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gregg Freishtat waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joel Babbit waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John Flynn waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Partlow waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. GreenSky, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 29, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 29, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-11071-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Mitchell M.Z. Twersky in Support re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071 . MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Twersky, Mitchell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071 . MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Twersky, Mitchell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071 ., MOTION to Appoint The Police Retirement System of St. Louis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Twersky, Mitchell)
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Ira M. Press in Support re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 .. Document filed by Luciano Felice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Press, Ira)
January 28, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 . . Document filed by Luciano Felice. (Press, Ira)
January 28, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Luciano Felice to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-11071, 1:19-cv-00100 . Document filed by Luciano Felice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Press, Ira)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fifth Third Securities, Inc.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guggenheim Securities, LLC. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Securities LLC. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joel Babbit, Gerald Benjamin, John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, GreenSky, Inc., Nigel Morris, Robert Partlow, Robert Sheft, David Zalik. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (pc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Bradley Yu. (Hood, Joseph)
January 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 18cv11071. (pc)
January 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bradley Yu. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fifth Third Securities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guggenheim Securities, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond James & Associates, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GREENSKY, INC., DAVID ZALIK, ROBERT PARTLOW, JOEL BABBIT, GERALD BENJAMIN, JOHN FLYNN, GREGG FREISHTAT, NIGEL MORRIS, and ROBERT SHEFT, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley Yu. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-11071. Document filed by Bradley Yu.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joel Babbit, Gerald Benjamin, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Fifth Third Securities, Inc., John Flynn, Gregg Freishtat, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, GreenSky, Inc., Guggenheim Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nigel Morris, Robert Partlow, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., Robert Sheft, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., David Zalik. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16140052)Document filed by Bradley Yu.(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. GreenSky, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guggenheim Securities, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Babbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenSky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Freishtat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sheft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigel Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Yu
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luciano Felice
Represented By: Ira M. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Represented By: Mitchell M.Z. Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?