McCoy-Feliu v. Salega

Plaintiff: Robin L. McCoy-Feliu
Defendant: Jorge Salega
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. this case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Deposition due by 5/22/2019. Expert Discovery due by 8/5/2019. The Final Pretrial Order date is thirty (30) days following the close of fact and expert discovery (whichever is later). By the Final Pretrial Order date, the parties shall submit a Joint Pretrial Order prepared in accordance with the undersigned 's Individual Rules and Practices and Fed. R. Civ. P. (26)(a)(3). Any motions in limine shall be filed after the close of discovery on or before the Final Pretrial Order date. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/22/2019) (anc) Modified on 2/25/2019 (anc).
February 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2019. Princess Tate-Buriss present for Plaintiff. David Glazer present for Defendant. (ajs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Nicole Snyder dated February 13, 2019 re: Joint discovery plan. Document filed by Jorge Salega. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Plan)(Snyder, Nicole)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Nicole Snyder dated January 28, 2019 re: Jurisdiction. Document filed by Jorge Salega.(Snyder, Nicole)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Nicole Snyder dated January 16, 2019 re: Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Jorge Salega.(Glazer, David)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jorge Salega.(Glazer, David)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/8/2019) (ne)
January 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
January 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jorge Salega.(Glazer, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glazer, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33771/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16142236).Document filed by Jorge Salega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Glazer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy-Feliu v. Salega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L. McCoy-Feliu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Salega
Represented By: David A Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?