Reynoso v. Levine et al

Plaintiff: Elba Reynoso
Defendant: Barry Levine and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00151
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Winograd on behalf of Elba Reynoso. (Winograd, Richard)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after 7/1/19 and Amended pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until 7/1/19. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 7/1/2019. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 7/1/19. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 8/16/2019. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. On 9/3/2019 at 10:30 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2019. Deposition due by 7/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/22/2019) (cf)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the February 26, 2019, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant(s) seek to file a motion to dismiss, they shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, if and when the parties are ready to proceed with a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge or mediation in the Court's mediation program, they shall file a joint letter on ECF requesting a referral. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/22/2019) (ks)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Both Parties' Counsel dated February 15, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation, Barry Levine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Huang, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2019) (ks)
January 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony William Eckert, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1364; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441nr; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony William Eckert, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elba Reynoso. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Express for Federal Express Corporation. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Eckert, Anthony)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony William Eckert to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): The Corporate Parent was Entered Incorrectly. (lb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NAME ENTERED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Express Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Eckert, Anthony) Modified on 1/7/2019 (lb).
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eckert, Anthony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 25762/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16149819).Document filed by Federal Express Corporation, Barry Levine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Demand for Damages, #4 Exhibit Response to Demand for Damages)(Eckert, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynoso v. Levine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Reynoso
Represented By: Richard M. Winograd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Levine
Represented By: Anthony William Eckert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Anthony William Eckert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?