Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative filed a complaint under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) seeking to compel Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence seeking to release records related to the killing of U.S. resident Jamal Khashoggi.

Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of State and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Central Intelligence Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Defense answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Justice answer due 3/18/2019; Department of State answer due 3/18/2019; National Security Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 3/18/2019. (anc)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (anc) Modified on 2/27/2019 (anc).
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-1329 and this action given identical FOIA requests addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, to set a uniform answer date of March 18, 2019 for all defendants addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Aronoff, Peter)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Teleanu, Natasha)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/22/2019) (js)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Department of Defense served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; National Security Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. New Address: Open Society Justice Initiative, 224 W. 57th St, New York, New York, 10019, 2125480660. (Singh, Amrit)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time tolling answer deadline until 30 days from first business day following Justice Department funding restoration addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David S. Jones dated January 18, 2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit standing order staying certain civil cases affected by lapse in appropriations)(Jones, David)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (dnh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (dnh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (dnh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (dnh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. (Singh, Amrit)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Catherine M. Amirfar to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested must be the first name that appears in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF; any name that follows the name of the party to be served must include 'c/'o', 'via', or 'attn'; party name in the 'To' field must exactly match party name as it appears on pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
January 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
January 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne).
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amirfar, Catherine)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16163411)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16163411)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Represented By: Catherine M. Amirfar
Represented By: Amrit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?