Whitter v. Waizenegger

Plaintiff: Patrick Whitter
Defendant: Mark Edward Waizenegger and M. Falanga Trucking LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00283
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446mv
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Patrick Whitter. Return Date set for 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Summons and complaint in State Court Action, #3 Memorandum of Law)(Firestein, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. By March 1, 2019, Plaintiff shall file his motion to remand; 2. By March 15, 2019, Defendants shall file their opposition; and 3. By March 22, 2019, Plaintiff shall file his reply, if any. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 3/1/2019., Responses due by 3/15/2019, Replies due by 3/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/25/2019) (cf)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Stuart Firestein on behalf of Patrick Whitter. (Firestein, Jason)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Plousadis, James)
January 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Plousadis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Plousadis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M. Falanga Trucking, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney James Plousadis. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 32553-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16170857).Document filed by Mark Edward Waizenegger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Plousadis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitter v. Waizenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Whitter
Represented By: Jason Stuart Firestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Edward Waizenegger
Represented By: James Plousadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Falanga Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?