Murray v. Bouck et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Murray, Jr.
Defendant: P.O. E. Guerrero, S.P.O. M. Randolph, P.O. Bouck and P.O. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Robert Lee Murray, Jr. NYSID: 06093686K B&C No: 8951900001 George R. Vierno Center 09-09 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370; The Superintedent George R. Vierno Center 09-09 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (vba)
February 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter) re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Lee Murray, Jr. New Address: B/C#895-19-00001, 09-09 Hazen Street, E. Elmhurst, New York, 11370. (sc)
February 14, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Robert Lee Murray, Jr. NYSID: 06093686K B&C No: 8951900001 George R. Vierno Center 09-09 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370 on 2/14/2019. (nb)
February 14, 2019 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #5 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Robert Lee Murray, Jr. received on 2/14/19. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Robert L. Murray,Jr. re: Plaintiff requests that the Court inform him as to whether it has filed his 42:1983 case submitted on or about 1/4/19. Document filed by Robert Lee Murray, Jr.(sc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/6/2019) (sc).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 (Letter) PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 1/13/2019 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Lee Murray, Jr. New Address: Robert Lee Murray, Jr.,NYSID: 06093686K, B&C No: 8951900001, George R. Vierno Center, 09-09 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (vn)
January 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert Lee Murray, Jr.(sac)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bouck, E. Guerrero, Johnson, M. Randolph. Document filed by Robert Lee Murray, Jr. (sac)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Lee Murray, Jr.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Bouck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. E. Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.P.O. M. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Bouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Murray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?