McLane Company, Inc. v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. filed a complaint for damages and permanent injunctive relief against Defendant Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. for violations of the Sherman and Clayton Act. Plaintiff alleged that Defendant abused and continues to abuse its market and monopoly power to prevent, delay, exclude, restrain, and/or suppress competition in the United States in the Single-Serve Brewer Market and Compatible Cup Market to impose supra-competitive prices in the Compatible Cup Market.

Plaintiff: McLane Company, Inc.
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00325
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), except in accordance with Your Honor's Order of Reference dated February 21, 2018. (ECF No. 419). This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Depositions of merits witnesses shall be completed no later than the close of fact discovery. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. The length of any trial is yet to be determined. For the sake of efficiency, the parties shall file all documents in this matter on the MDL docket at 1:14-md-02542. The parties need not make duplicate filings at 1:19-CV-0325. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(rro)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Carl Lawrence Malm dated March 6, 2019 re: Approval of Proposed Preliminary Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order for the McLane Action. Document filed by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Malm, Carl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc..(Brannon, Leah)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for February 28, 2019 shall be adjourned until April 5, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/26/2019) (rro)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (522) Motion for James C. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP; granting (10) Motion for James C. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00325-VSB. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB (ne)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (523) Motion for Brian Parker Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP; granting (11) Motion for Brian Parker Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00325-VSB. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB (ne)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (524) Motion for Alexander G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP; granting (12) Motion for Alexander G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00325-VSB. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB (ne)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (525) Motion for Valarie Cecile Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP; granting (13) Motion for Valarie Cecile Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00325-VSB. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB (ne)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is adjourned sine die. The parties shall appear for a status conference on February 28, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss their respective positions concerning how this case should be coordinated/consolidated with In re: Keurig Green Mountain Single-Serve Coffee Antitrust Litigation, 14-md-2542, and any issues coordination/consolidation may present in light of the timing of this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/7/2019) (rro)
February 7, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(rro)
February 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (12 in 1:19-cv-00325-VSB, 524 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP) MOTION for Alexander G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16305886. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (525 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 13 in 1:19-cv-00325-VSB) MOTION for Valarie Cecile Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16306054. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(wb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Valarie Cecile Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16306054. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declarationof Valarie Cecile Williams, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(Williams, Valarie)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Alexander G. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16305886. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander G. Brown, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(Brown, Alex)
February 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (11 in 1:19-cv-00325-VSB, 523 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP) MOTION for Brian Parker Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16305757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(jc)
February 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (10 in 1:19-cv-00325-VSB, 522 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP) MOTION for James C. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16305611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(jc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Brian Parker Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16305757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Parker Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(Miller, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for James C. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16305611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Grant, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP, 1:19-cv-00325-VSB(Grant, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to McLane Complaint (with attached Stipulation and Proposed Order) addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Carl Lawrence Malm dated February 5, 2019. Document filed by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order)(Malm, Carl)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Senior Intake Specialist. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Penaro, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Lawrence Malm on behalf of Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Malm, Carl)
January 23, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP. (sjo)
January 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 23, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02542-VSB-HBP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-md-02542. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc..(Penaro, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (pc)
January 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 14md2542. (pc)
January 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Steven Lawrence Penaro, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for McLane Company, Inc.. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc..(Penaro, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Penaro, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keuring Green Mountain, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by McLane Company, Inc.. (Penaro, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16179839)Document filed by McLane Company, Inc..(Penaro, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16179839)Document filed by McLane Company, Inc..(Penaro, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLane Company, Inc. v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Malm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McLane Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Represented By: James C. Grant
Represented By: Alex Brown
Represented By: Brian Parker Miller
Represented By: Valarie C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?