Kayo v. Mertz et al
Plaintiff: Hugo Kayo
Defendant: Dennis Palazzola, Charles Luce, Thomas Zapata, Kendra Corbin, Peter Mertz and Sergeant Dennis Palazzola
Case Number: 1:2019cv00365
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331fa
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 5/21/19, 2 PM at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator.(mf)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(mf)
February 25, 2019 LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Rule and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within ten (10) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 6/5/2019. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/7/2019.(mf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Kendra Corbin, Charles Luce, Peter Mertz, Dennis Palazzola, Thomas Zapata.(Brown, Norman)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Thomas Zapata served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by SGT. BLAPSER. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Peter Mertz served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by SGT. BLAPSER. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kendra Corbin served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by SGT. BLAPSER. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Dennis Palazzola served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by SGT. BLAPSER. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Charles Luce served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by SGT. BLAPSER. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/15/2019) (ks)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/15/2019) (jca)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dennis Palazzola. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kendra Corbin. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Luce. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Mertz. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Zapata. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stuart E. Jacobs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $200,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $200,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stuart E. Jacobs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kendra Corbin, Charles Luce, Peter Mertz, Dennis Palazzola, Thomas Zapata. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dennis Palazzola, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles Luce, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Zapata, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kendra Corbin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter Mertz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hugo Kayo. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacobs, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kendra Corbin, Charles Luce, Peter Mertz, Dennis Palazzola, Thomas Zapata. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16186144)Document filed by Hugo Kayo.(Jacobs, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayo v. Mertz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Palazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Luce
Represented By: Norman Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Zapata
Represented By: Norman Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Corbin
Represented By: Norman Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Mertz
Represented By: Norman Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dennis Palazzola
Represented By: Norman Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Kayo
Represented By: Stuart E. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?