Sardarov et al v. Faiman
Plaintiff: Rashid Sardarov and Black Ocean S.A.
Defendant: Jonathan Moss Faiman and Jonathan Faiman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Rashid Sardarov. Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Benaur, George)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Faiman. (dnh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Faiman, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov. (Benaur, George)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney George Benaur to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Benaur, George)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Faiman. Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C 1, #4 Exhibit C 2, #5 Exhibit C 3, #6 Exhibit C 4, #7 Exhibit D)(Benaur, George)
January 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney George Benaur. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $3100000000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3100000;. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney George Benaur to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Plaintiff code - multiple selections; Office code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney George Benaur to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George Benaur. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rashid Sardarov; Black Ocean S.A.; Jonathan Faiman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Faiman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov. (Benaur, George) Modified on 1/16/2019 (jgo).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov.(Benaur, George)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Benaur, George) Modified on 1/16/2019 (jgo).
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Jonathan Moss Faiman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-16191126)Document filed by Black Ocean S.A., Rashid Sardarov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C 1, #4 Exhibit C 2, #5 Exhibit C 3, #6 Exhibit C 4, #7 Exhibit D)(Benaur, George) Modified on 1/16/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardarov et al v. Faiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Moss Faiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Faiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashid Sardarov
Represented By: George Benaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Ocean S.A.
Represented By: George Benaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?