Perez-Victorio et al v. City Of New York, et al
Plaintiff: Elvia Perez-Victorio and Angel Perez-Rios
Defendant: The City Of New York,, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Jane/John Does 1-10 and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv00421
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2019) (cf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (dnh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio, Elvia Perez-Victorio. (Lanoix, Lesley)
January 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lesley J. Lanoix to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons not linked properly to the corresponding pleading; Summonses may only be linked to one pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint, #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio, Elvia Perez-Victorio. (Lanoix, Lesley) Modified on 1/30/2019 (dnh).
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lesley J. Lanoix to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint, #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio, Elvia Perez-Victorio. (Lanoix, Lesley) Modified on 1/25/2019 (dnh).
January 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lesley J. Lanoix to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank 'As to' Error; the wrong 'As to' party was selected in the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley J. Lanoix. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elvia Perez-Victorio, and as the proposed Administratrix of the Estate of her father, Angel Perez-Rios ; Jane/John Does 1-10, in their individual capacities. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elvia Perez-Victorio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio, Elvia Perez-Victorio, and as the proposed Administratrix of the Estate of her father, Angel Perez-Rios. (Lanoix, Lesley) Modified on 1/23/2019 (dnh).
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Elvia Perez-Victorio, and as the proposed Administratrix of the Estate of her father, Angel Perez-Rios, Jane/John Does 1-10, in their individual capacities. Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio.(Lanoix, Lesley)
January 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lesley J. Lanoix to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each party's name that is written on the summons must be listed on the docket entry for the summons. Not the plaintiff's name;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lesley J. Lanoix. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lesley J. Lanoix to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Elvia Perez-Victorio to CM ECF with the party text "as the proposed Administratrix of the Estate of her father, Angel Perez-Rios" and add Jane/John Does 1-10 with the party text "in their individual capacities". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Lesley J. Lanoix. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Angel Perez-Rios, JOHN DOE. The parties were added to the case in error. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley J. Lanoix. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JANE DOE, Elvia Perez-Victorio. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elvia Perez-Victorio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Angel Perez-Rios, Elvia Perez-Victorio. (Lanoix, Lesley) Modified on 1/16/2019 (pc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lanoix, Lesley)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16194569)Document filed by Elvia Perez-Victorio, Angel Perez-Rios.(Lanoix, Lesley) Modified on 1/16/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Victorio et al v. City Of New York, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Perez-Victorio
Represented By: Lesley J. Lanoix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Perez-Rios
Represented By: Lesley J. Lanoix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?