Garay v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Joana M. Garay and Joanna M. Garay
Defendant: United States of America Health & Human Services and United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00561
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/4/2019) (cf)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joanna M. Garay. (Giampa, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Giampa, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard L. Giampa to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name on the summons does not match what is listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard L. Giampa. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard L. Giampa to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if US Government Defendant Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. (pc)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard L. Giampa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joana M. Garay, United States of America Health & Human Services. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America Health & Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joana M. Garay. (Giampa, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 (pc).
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Giampa, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 (pc).
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Health & Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16215362)Document filed by Joana M. Garay.(Giampa, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garay v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joana M. Garay
Represented By: Richard L. Giampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna M. Garay
Represented By: Richard L. Giampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?