Almonte v. Westphal et al
Plaintiff: Juan Almonte
Defendant: Joanne Westphal and Charles Westphal
Case Number: 1:2019cv00683
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/21/2019) (cf)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan Almonte, Charles Westphal, Joanne Westphal. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/20/2019) (cf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Okun, Oddo & Babat, P.C., New Attorney: Adam D. Polo, Esq., P.C., Address: Adam D. Polo, Esq., P.C., 8 West 38th Street, Suite 803, New York, NY, United States 10018, (212) 221-6221. Document filed by Juan Almonte. (Polo, Adam)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by April 3, 2019, bring or deliver by mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-toproceed-before-us-magistrate-judge and attached to this order, to Orders & Judgments, Room 210, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by April 3, 2019, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/19/19) (yv)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 12:00 p.m., on April 10, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/19/19) (yv)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Jury Demand served on Okun, Oddo & Babat on January 24, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Charles Westphal. (Cotignola, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Charles Westphal(Cotignola, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael N Cotignola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 3,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 3,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charles Westphal.(Cotignola, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cotignola, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 31020-18E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16232571).Document filed by Charles Westphal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Demand for Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit Letter Giving Statement of Damages)(Cotignola, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almonte v. Westphal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Westphal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Westphal
Represented By: Michael N Cotignola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?