Severin v. New York City Department Of Education, et al
Plaintiff: Jean Richard Severin
Defendant: Michael Prayor, Steven Dorcely, New York City Department Of Education, and Jordan Barnett
Case Number: 1:2019cv00775
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York City Department Of Education, answer due 4/5/2019. (jca)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/19/2019) (jca)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher Ferreira, Esq. dated February 15, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,.(Ferreira, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Dorcely. (pne)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,. (pne)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Dorcely, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jean Richard Severin. (Glass, Bryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jean Richard Severin. (Glass, Bryan)
January 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bryan David Glass. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glass, Bryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jordan Barnett, Steven Dorcely, New York City Department Of Education,, Michael Prayor. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16246551)Document filed by Jean Richard Severin.(Glass, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Severin v. New York City Department Of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dorcely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education,
Represented By: Christopher Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Richard Severin
Represented By: Bryan David Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?