Brand et al v. Resnick et al

Plaintiff: Genna Brand, Delva Colas and Lau MeiMei
Defendant: Jennifer Resnick and Jonathan Resnick
Case Number: 1:2019cv00848
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 23 1000 071 1 on 2/26/2019. (ama)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #8 Letter filed by Jonathan Resnick, Jennifer Resnick. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand this case to the Supreme Court, New York County, on consent, and to close this case on the record of this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/25/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Desa Calder Greene, Esq. dated 02/18/2019 re: withdraw petition to remove. Document filed by Jennifer Resnick, Jonathan Resnick.(Calder Greene, Desa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marjorie E Bornes on behalf of Delva Colas, Lau MeiMei. (Bornes, Marjorie)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: In light of the absence of any representation that Defendants Colas and Lau have consented to the removal of this action, see 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2), and because Defendants Colas and Lau are alleged to reside in New York and appear to be citizens of New York, see 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2), the Resnick Defendants are hereby ordered to show cause in writing within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this Order why these consolidated cases should not be remanded. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/08/2019) (ama)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIRMATION of MARJORIE E. BORNES, ESQ. in Opposition re: #2 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by DELVA COLAS, MEIMEI LAU. (Bornes, Marjorie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calder Greene, Desa)
February 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Genna Brand; Delva Colas; Lau MeiMei; Jonathan Resnick; Jennifer Resnick. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code no selection; Citizenship Defendant code no selection; Jury Demand code b (Both); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. The related case information must only include a Southern District of New York case number if the attorney wishes to relate this case to a SDNY pending case. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - PETITION CIVIL COVER SHEET FOR FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL..Document filed by Jonathan Resnick, Jennifer Resnick.(Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 2/1/2019 (jgo).
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 157224/2018..Document filed by Jonathan Resnick, Jennifer Resnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons & Complaint-Action 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Verified Answer-Action 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Summons & Complaint-Action 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D: Verified Answer-Action 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E: Bill of Particulars, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F: Court Order)(Calder Greene, Desa)
January 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The caption title on the initial pleading must only include the caption title for the Southern District of New York;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/4/2019. (jgo)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 157224/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16257119).Document filed by Jonathan Resnick, Jennifer Resnick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons & Complaint -Action 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Defendant`s Verified Answer-Action 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Summons & Complaint -Action 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D: Defendant`s Verified Answer-Action 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E: Plaintiff`s Bill of Particulars, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F: Supreme New York Court Order)(Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 1/30/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand et al v. Resnick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Resnick
Represented By: Desa Onika Calder Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Resnick
Represented By: Desa Onika Calder Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genna Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delva Colas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lau MeiMei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?