Vega v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Orlando Vega
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration (SSA) and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01118
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Nancy A Berryhill, Orlando Vega. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/20/2019) (rj)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of Nancy A Berryhill. (Pantoja, Joseph)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nancy A Berryhill served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Orlando Vega. (Insler, Lewis)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on April 20, 2016) (sj)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A Berryhill. (sj)
February 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lewis Bart Insler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nancy A. Berryhill. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Insler, Lewis)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Orlando Vega. (Insler, Lewis)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16299675)Document filed by Orlando Vega.(Insler, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration (SSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Vega
Represented By: Lewis Bart Insler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?