Ciprian v. Dental Oral Surgery et al
Plaintiff: Ivelisse Ciprian
Defendant: Morris Heights Health Center, Dental Oral Surgery, The Institute for Family Health, Bradley Hirsch, Yakdiel Jimenez, Nuryberth Martinez, Walton Dental, PLLC, Manhattan Oral Facial Surgery, LLC, Dr. Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS, Morris Heights Health Center, Inc. and Bradley Hirsch, DMD
Case Number: 1:2019cv01164
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/26/2019) (rro)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth John Burford on behalf of Bradley Hirsch, DMD, Nuryberth Martinez. (Burford, Kenneth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth John Burford on behalf of Manhattan Oral Facial Surgery, LLC. (Burford, Kenneth)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Manhattan Oral Facial Surgery, LLC; Bradley Hirsch, DMD; and Nuryberth Martinez on February 19, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS, Morris Heights Health Center, Inc., The Institute for Family Health, Walton Dental, PLLC. (Cowart, Brandon)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Ivelisse Ciprian on February 19, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS, Morris Heights Health Center, Inc., The Institute for Family Health, Walton Dental, PLLC. (Cowart, Brandon)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24986/2018E..Document filed by The Institute for Family Health, Walton Dental, PLLC, Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS, Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Employment Certification)(Cowart, Brandon)
February 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code Bronx; Fee Status code pd (paid);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bradley Hirsch, DMD; Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.; Dr. Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jgo).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24986-2018E..Document filed by The Institute for Family Health, Walton Dental, PLLC, Yakdiel Jimenez, Morris Heights Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Employment Certification)(Cowart, Brandon) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciprian v. Dental Oral Surgery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Heights Health Center
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Oral Surgery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Institute for Family Health
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakdiel Jimenez
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuryberth Martinez
Represented By: Kenneth John Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Dental, PLLC
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Oral Facial Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth John Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yakdiel Jimenez, DDS
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Heights Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Hirsch, DMD
Represented By: Kenneth John Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivelisse Ciprian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?