Gravier Productions, Inc. et al v. Amazon Content Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Woody Allen and Gravier Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC and Amazon Content Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01169
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 27 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc..(Beskin, Julia)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: On April 3, 2019, defendants filed a motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P. Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P., a plaintiff has 21 days after the service of a motion under Rule 12(b) to amend the complaint once as a matter of course. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by April 26, 2019. It is unlikely that plaintiffs will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by April 26, 2019. Defendants reply, if any, shall be filed by May 10, 2019...... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/4/2019) (gr)
April 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC.(Klieger, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Robert N. Klieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
March 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Robert N. Klieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16516817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klieger, Robert)
March 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Robert N. Klieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16516817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Michael Hayes Todisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
March 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Michael Hayes Todisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Michael Hayes Todisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Hayes Todisco, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Todisco, Michael)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Michael Hayes Todisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16477729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael Hayes Todisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16477729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Hayes Todisco, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Todisco, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2019 (wb).
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference (ECF No. 17) and the Court's Individual Practices served on Amazon Content Services, LLC and Amazon Studios, LLC on February 20, 2019. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Reinhard, Donald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Moez M. Kaba on behalf of Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC. (Kaba, Moez)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) (gr)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by 4/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) (gr) Modified on 2/19/2019 (gr).
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John B. Quinn on behalf of Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Quinn, John)
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer due 4/3/2019. (gr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Studios, LLC. Document filed by Amazon Studios, LLC.(Kaba, Moez)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Content Services, LLC. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC.(Kaba, Moez)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Moez M. Kaba dated 2/15/19. Document filed by Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC.(Kaba, Moez)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16351625. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gary E. Gans in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission)(Gans, Gary)
February 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16351625. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald J Reinhard on behalf of Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Reinhard, Donald)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Marie Beskin on behalf of Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Beskin, Julia)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon Studios, LLC. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon Content Services, LLC. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Julia Marie Beskin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon Studios, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Beskin, Julia)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon Content Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc.. (Beskin, Julia)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Woody Allen, Gravier Productions, Inc..(Beskin, Julia)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Beskin, Julia)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Content Services, LLC, Amazon Studios, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16309360)Document filed by Gravier Productions, Inc., Woody Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Multipicture Acquisition Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Email dated June 19, 2018, #3 Exhibit C - Email dated June 25, 2018, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated July 11, 2018, #5 Exhibit E - Letter dated July 20, 2018)(Beskin, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gravier Productions, Inc. et al v. Amazon Content Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woody Allen
Represented By: Julia Marie Beskin
Represented By: John B. Quinn
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Gary Edward Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gravier Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Marie Beskin
Represented By: John B. Quinn
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Gary Edward Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC
Represented By: Michael Todisco
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Robert N. Klieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Content Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Todisco
Represented By: Moez M. Kaba
Represented By: Robert N. Klieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?