Stachon v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Zach Stachon, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Zach Stachon
Defendant: Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Bhardeep Singh Heer, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., UBS AG, BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Shailen Pau, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Services Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., J.P. Morgan Clearing, BNP Paribas S.A., Amandeep Singh Manku, RBC Europe Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Nomura International PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N. A., Gary McDonald, UBS Securities LLC, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse AG, CitiGroup Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Merrill Lynch International, HSBC Bank PLC, Citibank NA, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, TD Securities Limited, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Hiren Gudka, Citigroup Global Markets Limited and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01205
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John)
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Stock, Eric)
March 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Eric Jonathan Stock to RE-FILE Document #19 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to approval of the Court, that: 1. The undersigned counsel accept service of the Complaint on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party is properly named as a Defendant, without waiver of any defenses, including but not limited to those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to service of process. 2. Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby suspended until the later of (i) ninety (90) days from the date on which this Stipulation and Proposed Order is endorsed by the Court, or (ii) sixty (60) days after Judge Ramos issues a decision on the Pending Motion in the Direct Purchaser action. 3. If Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs deadline to file any opposition to Defendants' motion(s) shall be no later than sixty (60) days after Defendants file their motion(s) to dismiss. 4. Defendants' deadline to file any reply briefs shall be no later than forty-five (45) days after Plaintiff files his opposition. 5. Discovery shall be stayed during the pendency of any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants. 6. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that otherwise might exist absent this agreement. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 03/28/2019) (ras)
March 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16574072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam James Hunt on behalf of Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
March 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16574072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley S. Lui in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice)(Lui, Bradley)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Stock, Eric) Modified on 3/29/2019 (ldi).
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Stock, Eric)
March 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16571028. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16571028. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adrienne V. Baxley in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 MD Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxley, Adrienne)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harrison McGill on behalf of Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, CitiGroup Inc., Citibank NA, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Hiren Gudka, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc, Bhardeep Singh Heer, Amandeep Singh Manku, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Nomura International PLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Shailen Pau, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Willscher, Alexander)
March 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16559240. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Terzaken, John)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Myers on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Myers, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram Jeremy Ellis on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Ellis, Abram)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16559240. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John) Modified on 3/26/2019 (wb).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., AND J.P. MORGAN CLEARING CORP. ONLY: Plaintiff Zach Stachon, through his undersigned attorneys, hereby voluntarily dismisses this action without prejudice against Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., and J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp. (collectively, "JPMorgan") in accordance with Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) is proper because JPMorgan has not served an answer or a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. (J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and J.P. Morgan Clearing terminated.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/2019) (anc)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Garrett W. Wotkyns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/2019) (ama)
March 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Laura Taylor Swain for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Zach Stachon. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Wotkyns, Garrett)
March 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Garrett W. Wotkyns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16489487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Garrett W. Wotkyns to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16489487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zach Stachon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wotkyns, Garrett)
March 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
March 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
March 8, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 16cv3711 and declined by Judge Edgardo Ramos and returned to wheel for assignment. (ma)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, CitiGroup Inc., Citibank NA, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Hiren Gudka, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc, Bhardeep Singh Heer, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Amandeep Singh Manku, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Nomura International PLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Shailen Pau, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC. (sj)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, N.A.; Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited; Merrill Lynch International; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.; Barclays Bank PLC; Barclays Capital Inc.; Barclays Services Limited; Barclays Capital Securities Limited; BNP Paribas S.A.; BNP Paribas Securities Corp.; Citigroup, Inc.; Citibank N.A.; Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Citigroup Global Markets Limited; Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank; Credit Suisse AG; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) LTD.; Credit Suisse International; Deutsche Bank AF; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; HSBC Bank PLC; J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.; JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.; J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.; J.P. Morgan clearing; Nomura Securities International, Inc.; Nomura International PLC; Royal Bank of Canada; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; RBC Europe Limited; The Toronto-Dominion Bank; TD Securities Limited; TD Securities (USA) LLC; UBS AG; UBS Securities LLC; Hiren Gudka; Bhardeep Sinch Heer; Amandeep Singh Manku; Gary McDonald; Shailen Pau., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Zach Stachon. (Attachments: #1 Rider to Summons)(Nestico, John)
February 8, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 1:16cv3711. (sj)
February 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Joseph Nestico. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Joseph Nestico. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zach Stachon; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly. (sj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-03711 (ER). Document filed by Zach Stachon, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated.(Nestico, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Nestico, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, CitiGroup Inc., Citibank NA, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Hiren Gudka, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc, Bhardeep Singh Heer, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N. A., Amandeep Singh Manku, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc., Nomura International PLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Shailen Pau, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16314546)Document filed by Zach Stachon, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Related Case Statement)(Nestico, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stachon v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhardeep Singh Heer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shailen Pau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toronto-Dominion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Clearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amandeep Singh Manku
Represented By: David Harrison McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Europe Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McDonald
Represented By: Adam James Hunt
Represented By: Bradley S. Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiren Gudka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Stachon, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: John Joseph Nestico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Stachon
Represented By: John Joseph Nestico
Represented By: Garrett W. Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?