Slade v. Lanibaloo Creations, LLC

Plaintiff: Linda Slade
Defendant: Lanibaloo Creations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01221
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for April 23, 2019 is adjourned to May 2, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The joint letter and Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order described in the Court's February 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 5, are due no later than April 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/8/2019) (anc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Initial Pretrial Conference to be set May 2, 2019 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jared Gordon and Dan Shaked dated April 5, 2019. Document filed by Lanibaloo Creations, LLC.(Duong, Huonganh)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. For the reasons discussed during the telephone conference held on April 3, 2019, the Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss: Defendant's motion to dismiss is due no later than April 9, 2019; Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than three weeks following the service of Defendant's motion; Plaintiff's reply is due no later than one week following the service of Defendant's opposition. The parties are directed to confer and to submit a joint letter no later than April 9, 2019 informing the Court of the parties' availability for the initial pre-trial conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on April 4, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2019. (Court Reporter Raquel Robles) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Dan Shaked dated March 29, 2019 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jared Gordon and H.Annie Duong dated March 26, 2019. . Document filed by Linda Slade. (Shaked, Dan)
March 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Daniels, Anthony)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendants request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss on April 3, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Huonganh Annie Duong to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jared Valek Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jared Gordon and H.Annie Duong dated March 26, 2019. Document filed by Lanibaloo Creations, LLC. Return Date set for 3/29/2019 at 11:00 AM.(Duong, Huonganh)
March 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Huonganh Annie Duong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16530159. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Huonganh Annie Duong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16530159. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lanibaloo Creations, LLC.(Duong, Huonganh)
March 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Jared Valek Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16530057. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Jared Valek Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16530057. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lanibaloo Creations, LLC.(Gordon, Jared)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/13/2019) (anc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lanibaloo Creations, LLC. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lanibaloo Creations, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Linda Slade. (Shaked, Dan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shaked, Dan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lanibaloo Creations, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16316151)Document filed by Linda Slade.(Shaked, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slade v. Lanibaloo Creations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanibaloo Creations, LLC
Represented By: Huonganh Annie Duong
Represented By: Jared Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Slade
Represented By: Dan Shaked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?