Palma Flores et al v. M Culinary Concepts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Palma Flores
Defendant: Amichai Melamed, M Culinary Concepts, Inc., Novel Foods Inc., Ami Melamed, Samar Sajjad and A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01229
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/8/2019; M Culinary Concepts, Inc. answer due 4/8/2019; Amichai Melamed answer due 4/8/2019; Novel Foods Inc. answer due 4/8/2019 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brett Schatz dated March 18 2019. Document filed by A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc., M Culinary Concepts, Inc., Amichai Melamed, Novel Foods Inc., Samar Sajjad.(Schatz, Brett)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Hershan on behalf of Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Hershan, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sara Jacqueline Isaacson terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Amichai Melamed served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service was accepted by Samar Sajjad, Co-Worker. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually); Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Samar Sajjad served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service was accepted by Samar Sajjad, Co-Worker. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually); Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Novel Foods Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually); Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. M Culinary Concepts, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually); Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually); Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Sara Jacqueline Isaacson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Isaacson, Sara)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Isaacson, Sara)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samar Sajjad. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Novel Foods Inc.. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M Culinary Concepts, Inc.. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amichai Melamed. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc.. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samar Sajjad, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amichai Melamed (a.k.a Ami Melamed), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Novel Foods Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M Culinary Concepts, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc., M Culinary Concepts, Inc., Amichai Melamed, Novel Foods Inc., Samar Sajjad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16317508)Document filed by Luis Enrique Palma Flores(individually), Luis Enrique Palma Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palma Flores et al v. M Culinary Concepts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amichai Melamed
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Culinary Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novel Foods Inc.
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ami Melamed
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samar Sajjad
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M. Catering Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Mathew Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Palma Flores
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Paul Hershan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?