Solid 21, Inc. v. Richemont North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Solid 21, Inc.
Defendant: Richemont North America, Inc., Campagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A., Montblanc International GmbH, Officine Panerai-Firenze SA, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Baume & Mercier S.A. and Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01262
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 2, 2019, is adjourned to May 7, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/28/2019) (cf)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: WHEREAS, the parties failed to timely submit the joint letter or proposed case management plan; it is hereby ORDERED that if Plaintiff has been in communication with Defendants, then the parties shall file the joint status letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than March 29, 2019, at noon. If Plaintiff has not been in communication with Defendants, it shall file a status letter regarding its efforts to serve Defendants and request an adjournment of the initial conference as soon as possible and no later than March 29, 2019, at noon. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/27/2019) (cf)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/20/2019) (cf)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to IWC International Watch Co. A.G.. (dnh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IWC International Watch Co. AG dba IWC Schaffhausen, re: #17 Complaint,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Lawrence Hecht to RE-FILE Document No. #18 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons may only be linked to one pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IWC International Watch Co. AG dba IWC Schaffhausen, re: #1 Complaint,, #17 Complaint,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David) Modified on 2/12/2019 (dnh).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 COMPLAINT against Baume & Mercier S.A., Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A., IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Montblanc International GmbH, Officine Panerai-Firenze SA, Richemont North America, Inc.. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hecht, David)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richemont North America, Inc.. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Officine Panerai-Firenze SA. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montblanc International GmbH. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baume & Mercier S.A.. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Lawrence Hecht. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Campagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Lawrence Hecht to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richemont North America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Officine Panerai-Firenze SA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Montblanc International GmbH, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compagnie Financiere Richemont SA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baume & Mercier SA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 2:11-cv-00454-AHM-AGR. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc..(Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Solid 21, Inc..(Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hecht, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Baume & Mercier S.A., Campagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A., IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Montblanc International GmbH, Officine Panerai-Firenze SA, Richemont North America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16322375)Document filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Use and Incontestability, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration and Renewal Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Press Release)(Hecht, David) Modified on 2/11/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid 21, Inc. v. Richemont North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richemont North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montblanc International GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officine Panerai-Firenze SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IWC International Watch Co. A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baume & Mercier S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solid 21, Inc.
Represented By: David Lawrence Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?