Ramirez v. Schneider National Address et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Ramirez
Defendant: James Brizinski and Schneider National Address
Case Number: 1:2019cv01280
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Nancy Ramirez. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by James Brizinski, Schneider National Address (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service of Jury Demand)(Cotignola, Felice)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/13/2019) (cf)
February 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Felice Jill Cotignola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1441; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1446; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National Address. Document filed by Schneider National Address.(Cotignola, Felice)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cotignola, Felice)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 30827/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16328099).Document filed by James Brizinski, Schneider National Address. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Demand for Damages)(Cotignola, Felice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Schneider National Address et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brizinski
Represented By: Felice Jill Cotignola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Address
Represented By: Felice Jill Cotignola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ramirez
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?