Cordero v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Christian Cordero
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01320
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Cordero. (Grichanik, Igor)
March 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Igor Grichanik to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before any second party names. The Summons Request docket entry must only reflect the party as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States District Attorney, Federal Bureau of Investigation and United States Attorney General, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Cordero. (Grichanik, Igor) Modified on 3/25/2019 (dnh).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for Friday, July 19, 2019 at 3 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Friday, July 26, 2019 at 3 p.m. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/11/2019) (rjm)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, July 19, 2019 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/5/2019) (kv)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grichanik, Igor)
February 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
February 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (gp)
February 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Igor Grichanik to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (gp)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Igot Grichanik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,750,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9999. (gp)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Igor Grichanik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Document filed by Christian Cordero.(Grichanik, Igor)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grichanik, Igor) Modified on 2/20/2019 (gp).
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Igor Grichanik. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Igor Grichanik to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 2/19/2019. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordero v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Cordero
Represented By: Igor Grichanik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?