Williams v. New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Williams
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"), Paul Rotondo and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv01353
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 sh
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Paul Rotondo(Individually) served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Rotondo. Document filed by Patricia Williams. (Barbieri, Laura)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Shawna C. MacLeod dated March 25, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department of Education. OK. New York City Department of Education answer due 4/15/2019; Paul Rotondo (in his official capacity as Superintendent of Transfer Schools for the New York City Department of Education) answer due 4/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/27/2019) (rjm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Shawna C. MacLeod dated March 25, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department of Education.(MacLeod, Shawna)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case IS to be tried to a jury. Discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be exchanged by 4/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2019. Deposition due by 6/28/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2019. The parties may at any time consent to have this case tried before the assigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/25/2019) (mml)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by New York City Department of Education. (MacLeod, Shawna)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. New York City Department of Education answer due 4/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/5/2019) (mml)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, on Consent, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Shawna C. MacLeod dated March 5, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department of Education.(MacLeod, Shawna)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawna Currie MacLeod on behalf of New York City Department of Education. (MacLeod, Shawna)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/21/2019) (cf)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, Paul Rotondo(in his official capacity as Superintendent of Transfer Schools for the New York City Department of Education), Paul Rotondo(Individually). Document filed by Patricia Williams.(Barbieri, Laura)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Rotondo. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Barbieri, Laura)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of service Affidavit)(Barbieri, Laura)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Rotondo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Williams. (Barbieri, Laura)
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Laura Dawn Barbieri. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laura Dawn Barbieri to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Paul Rotondo with party text in his official capacity as Superintendent of Transfer Schools for the New York City Department of Education. the All Defendant radio button was selected; individually select all parties by holding down the 'CTRL' button. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Laura Dawn Barbieri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") ; Paul Rotondo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents New York City Department of Education, Paul Rotondo, Paul Rotondo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Patricia Williams, Paul Rotondo. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Barbieri, Laura)
February 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laura Dawn Barbieri. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
February 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16338321)Document filed by Patricia Williams.(Barbieri, Laura) Modified on 2/13/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rotondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Shawna Currie MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Williams
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?