Robinson et al v. New York City Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Robinson and David Evans
Defendant: Andy Byford, New York City Transit Authority and Fernando Ferrer
Case Number: 1:2019cv01404
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Cohan on behalf of Nathaniel Robinson. (Cohan, Marc)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joinder and Amendment. Plaintiffs may amend their complaint no later than May 13, 2019. Thereafter, the parties shall not amend their pleadings, or join additional parties, absent leave of the Court. By April 19, 2019, the parties shall either stipulate to withdrawal of plaintiffs' class certification motion (without prejudice to refiling near or after the close of fact discovery), or file a joint letter explaining why they have not been able to agree to do so. Written Discovery. The parties shall serve their initial requests for production of documents and any initial interrogatories (in compliance with Local Rule 33.3(a)) no later than May 28, 2019. Depositions and Additional Fact Discovery. All remaining fact discovery, including depositions, shall be completed no later than February 10, 2020. Close of Discovery. All discovery must be completed no later than May 1, 2010. Status Conference. Judge Moses will conduct a status conference on September 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Trial. The parties have stated that the anticipated length of trial is 5 days. Plaintiffs have requested a jury trial, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2019. Deposition due by 5/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 2/10/2020. Expert Discovery due by 3/11/2020. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/11/2019) (jca) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jca).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Case Management Conference held on 4/11/2019. (Snell, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson.(Pierce, Clay)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira Jonathan Lipton on behalf of Andy Byford, Fernando Ferrer, New York City Transit Authority. (Lipton, Ira)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #2 Complaint. Document filed by Andy Byford, Fernando Ferrer, New York City Transit Authority.(Hechtkopf, Helene)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: In light of the Honorable Barbara C. Moses's order scheduling an initial pretrial conference, ECF No. 32, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 18, 2019 before this Court is ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/21/2019) (cf)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/21/2019) (cf)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Andy Byford answer due 4/2/2019; Fernando Ferrer answer due 4/2/2019; New York City Transit Authority answer due 4/2/2019. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/19/2019) (mro)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Helene Hechtkopf dated March 18, 2019. Document filed by Andy Byford, Fernando Ferrer, New York City Transit Authority.(Hechtkopf, Helene)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helene Rachel Hechtkopf on behalf of Andy Byford, Fernando Ferrer, New York City Transit Authority. (Hechtkopf, Helene)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, and for report and recommendation on dispositive motions (particular motion at Dkt. No. 19), pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery, must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Moses; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/26/2019) (mro)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation, Particular Motion: ECF No. 19 and General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Motions referred to Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/26/2019) (ks)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service in Support re: #19 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service)(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Andy Byford served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; Fernando Ferrer served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; New York City Transit Authority served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Service was accepted by Vanessa Richardson. Document filed by Nathaniel Robinson; David Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Service)(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Nathaniel Robinson in Support re: #19 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A August 31, 2017 Status Letter, #2 Exhibit B November 6, 2017 Letter to TAB, #3 Exhibit C December 15, 2017 Status Letter, #4 Exhibit D First December 8, 2017 Letter from TAB, #5 Exhibit E Second December 8, 2017 Letter from TAB, #6 Exhibit F January 18, 2019 Status Letter)(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of David Evans in Support re: #19 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A November 17, 2016 Notices from TAB, #2 Exhibit B April 19, 2017 Status Letter, #3 Exhibit C August 17, 2017 Status Letter, #4 Exhibit D November 7, 2017 Letter to TAB, #5 Exhibit E December 15, 2017 Status Letter, #6 Exhibit F January 3, 2018 Letters from TAB, #7 Exhibit G February 21, 2018 Letters, #8 Exhibit H April 20, 2018 Status Letter, #9 Exhibit I January 18, 2019 Status Letter)(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Raul Carrillo in Support re: #19 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A August 2016 Report by New York State of the Comptroller)(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Clay J. Pierce dated February 21, 2019 re: Motion to Certify Class. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson.(Pierce, Clay)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. Responses due by 3/12/2019(Pierce, Clay)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Soojin Shin on behalf of David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Shin, Susan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Transit Authority. (sj)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fernando Ferrer. (sj)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andy Byford. (sj)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raul Armando Carrillo, III on behalf of Nathaniel Robinson. (Carrillo, Raul)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andy Byford, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Pierce, Clay)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fernando Ferrer, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Pierce, Clay)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Transit Authority, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Pierce, Clay)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pierce, Clay)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Eleaza Wilner on behalf of Nathaniel Robinson. (Wilner, Claudia)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Eleaza Wilner on behalf of David Evans. (Wilner, Claudia)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2019) (cf)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/14/2019) (cf)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katharine Deabler-Meadows on behalf of David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Deabler-Meadows, Katharine)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Clay J. Pierce to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16346453, paid on 2/13/2019. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Clay J. Pierce. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nathaniel Robinson; David Evans; New York City Transit Authority; Fernando Ferrer; Andy Byford. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Clay J. Pierce. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Clay J. Pierce to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each request must be its own separate docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Lawrence Van Houter on behalf of David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Van Houter, Andrew)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Transit Authority, Fernando Ferrer Acting Chairman of the New York City Transit Authority, Andy Byford President of the New York City Transit Authority, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Evans, Nathaniel Robinson. (Pierce, Clay) Modified on 2/14/2019 (sj).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andy Byford, Fernando Ferrer, New York City Transit Authority. Document filed by Nathaniel Robinson, David Evans.(Pierce, Clay)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pierce, Clay) Modified on 2/14/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. New York City Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Byford
Represented By: Ira Jonathan Lipton
Represented By: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Transit Authority
Represented By: Ira Jonathan Lipton
Represented By: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Ferrer
Represented By: Ira Jonathan Lipton
Represented By: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Robinson
Represented By: Clay J. Pierce
Represented By: Andrew Lawrence Van Houter
Represented By: Claudia Eleaza Wilner
Represented By: Marc Cohan
Represented By: Raul Armando Carrillo, III
Represented By: Susan Soojin Shin
Represented By: Katharine Deabler-Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Evans
Represented By: Clay J. Pierce
Represented By: Andrew Lawrence Van Houter
Represented By: Claudia Eleaza Wilner
Represented By: Susan Soojin Shin
Represented By: Katharine Deabler-Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?