Simon v. GTR Source, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Basil T. Simon and Basil Simon
Defendant: GTR Source, LLC and Stephen W. Biegel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01471
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Shane R. Heskin, Esq. dated April 12, 2019 re: response to pre-motion letters. Document filed by Basil Simon.(Heskin, Shane)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED that the time for Defendant, GTR Source, LLC, to appear. answer to otherwise plead in the above entitled action is hereby extended up to and including April 8. 2019. This stipulation may be signed by COUNTERPARTS and by facsimile signature, which will be considered as originals. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/5/2019) (js)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER terminating #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. A conference is already scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. The Clerk is directed to close document 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/8/2019) (kv)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James C. Thoman dated 04/08/2019. Document filed by GTR Source, LLC. Return Date set for 4/18/2019 at 04:30 PM.(Thoman, James)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED that the time for Defendant, GTR Source, LLC, to appear, answer or otherwise plead in the above entitled action is hereby extended up to and including April 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. (GTR Source, LLC answer due 4/8/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/5/19) (yv)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GTR Source, LLC. (Thoman, James)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Conference. A conference is scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2019, at 4:30pm. The Clerk is directed to close Document 15. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/4/19) (yv)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Troy Lipp, Esq. dated 04/04/2019. Document filed by Stephen W. Biegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bam Bam Entertainment LLC v. Pagnotta)(Lipp, Troy)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED that the time for Defendant, GTR Source, LLC, to appear, answer or otherwise plead in the above entitled action is hereby extended up to and including April 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. (GTR Source, LLC answer due 4/5/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/1/19) (yv)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GTR Source, LLC. (Thoman, James)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Carlton Thoman on behalf of GTR Source, LLC. (Thoman, James)
March 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Stephen W. Biegel answer due 4/11/2019. (yv)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the undersigned that the time for Defendant NEW YORK CITY MARSHAL STEPHEN W. BIEGEL ("Defendant") to appear, answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is hereby extended to April 11,2019. So Ordered. Motions terminated: #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Troy Lipp, Esq. dated 3/15/2019. filed by Stephen W. Biegel. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/19/19) (yv)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Troy Lipp, Esq. dated 3/15/2019. Document filed by Stephen W. Biegel.(Lipp, Troy)
March 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Troy David Lipp on behalf of Stephen W. Biegel. (Lipp, Troy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. GTR Source, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by NY Sec. of State. Document filed by Basil Simon. (Heskin, Shane)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Stephen W. Biegel served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was accepted by Bernice Doe. Document filed by Basil Simon. (Heskin, Shane)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GTR Source, LLC. (pc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen W. Biegel. (pc)
February 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
February 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shane R. Heskin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1367; Dollar Demand $127,182,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $127,000;. (pc)
February 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shane R. Heskin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Basil T. Simon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STEPHEN W. BIEGEL, IN HIS CAPACITY AS NEW YORK CITY MARSHAL, BADGE No. 27, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basil T. Simon. (Heskin, Shane)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GTR SOURCE, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basil T. Simon. (Heskin, Shane)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heskin, Shane)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen W. Biegel, GTR Source, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16360305)Document filed by Basil T. Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Restraining Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail dated February 22, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - E-mail dated February 22, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice to Garnishee, #5 Exhibit 5 - Second Levy and Demand, #6 Exhibit 6 - Receivership Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order authorizing the Receiver to retain White and Williams LLP, #8 Exhibit 8 - E-mail dated March 22, 2018)(Heskin, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. GTR Source, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basil T. Simon
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basil Simon
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTR Source, LLC
Represented By: James Carlton Thoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Biegel
Represented By: Troy David Lipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?