Wexler v. CWA Local 1101

Plaintiff: David Wexler
Defendant: CWA Local 1101
Case Number: 1:2019cv01499
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calendar of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/19/2019) (js)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by David Wexler. (Liebowitz, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jonathan I. Edelstein dated March 13, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by CWA Local 1101.(Edelstein, Jonathan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Isidor Edelstein on behalf of CWA Local 1101. (Edelstein, Jonathan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/5/2019) (rro)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CWA Local 1101. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
February 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CWA Local 1101, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Wexler. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CWA Local 1101. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16363616)Document filed by David Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wexler v. CWA Local 1101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wexler
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWA Local 1101
Represented By: Jonathan Isidor Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?