Hirsch v. New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Defendant: New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01500
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by New Tang Dynasty Television Inc..(Waxman, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Universal Communications Network, Inc. for New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.. Document filed by New Tang Dynasty Television Inc..(Waxman, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. New Tang Dynasty Television Inc. answer due 4/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/12/2019) (ama)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint / Request For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brooke J. Cook dated March 11, 2019. Document filed by New Tang Dynasty Television Inc..(Cook, Brooke)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New Tang Dynasty Television Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. Document filed by Steven Hirsch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Tang Dynasty Television Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Hirsch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16363620)Document filed by Steven Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch v. New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Tang Dynasty Television Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Philip Waxman
Represented By: Brooke June Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?