Cano v. Chisolm et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hiram Cano
Defendant: New York City Department of Corrections, Correctional Officer Santiago, Captain Charles, Correctional Officer Chisolm, The City of New York, Correctional Officer Murray, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation and Captain Robinson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01640
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/16/2019) (ks)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Murray. Document filed by Murray. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinson waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Chisolm waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Charles waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Santiago waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. Document filed by Robinson; Chisolm; Charles; Santiago. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The City of New York waiver sent on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pallini, Samantha)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha J. Pallini on behalf of The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pallini, Samantha)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Christopher Hiram Cano NYSID: 13552006J B&C No: 2411605369, at Anna M. Kross Correctional Facility 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370, on 3/25/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa)
March 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Health and Hospitals. (bwa)
March 25, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/25/2019 Re: Judge Lorna G. Schofield #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)NYC Health+Hospitals. (bwa)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the New York City Department of Correction. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for NYC Health+Hospitals and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants City of New York, Chisolm, Robinson, Charles, Santiago, and Murray waive service of summons. Local Civil Rule 33.2, which requires defendants in certain types of prisoner cases to respond to specific, court-ordered discovery requests, applies to this action. Those discovery requests are available on the Court's website under "Forms" and are titled "Plaintiff's Local Civil Rule 33.2 Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents." Within 120 days of the date of this order, Defendants must serve responses to these standard discovery requests. In their responses, Defendants must quote each request verbatim. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Waiver of Service due by 4/22/2019.), New York City Department of Corrections terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/21/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 20, 2019 Case Designated Local Rule 33.2. (scn)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
March 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/2019) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 6, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Christopher Hiram Cano NYSID: 13552006J B&C No: 2411605369 Anna M. Kross Correctional Facility 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (aea)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Christopher Hiram Cano.(rdz)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Charles, Chisolm, Murray, New York City Department of Corrections, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Robinson, Santiago, The City of New York. Document filed by Christopher Hiram Cano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rdz)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Christopher Hiram Cano.(rdz)
February 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cano v. Chisolm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Chisolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Samantha J. Pallini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hiram Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?