Vargas De Gonzalez v. Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez
Defendant: Jerry Vallejo and Jem Leasing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01729
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332au
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/17/2019. (ml)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On consent of the parties, this action is discontinued and dismissed as against defendant Jem Leasing LLC. So ordered. (Jem Leasing LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/17/2019) (rro)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for the parties do not anticipate the need to depose anyone other than the Parties to the action. Depositions of both sides are scheduled for June 27, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve expert reports on or before August 1, 2019. Defendant shall serve expert reports on or before October 4, 2019. Fact discovery shall be completed by August 15, 2019. The parties shall submit their proposed Joint Pre-Trial Order and supporting materials as required by the Court by January 24, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Louis L. Stanton. The parties anticipate the jury trial will require five (5) days. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 6/27/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/17/2019) (rro)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jerry Vallejo served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Josie "Doe". Document filed by Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez. (Cheriff, Bruce)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jem Leasing LLC served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Josie "Doe". Document filed by Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez. (Cheriff, Bruce)
March 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 is adjourned to 4/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Landers, Rigoberto)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b): Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/15/2019) (rro)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jem Leasing LLC, Jerry Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Bornes, Marjorie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jem Leasing LLC, Jerry Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Bornes, Marjorie)
March 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so redesignated. (wb)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jem Leasing LLC, Jerry Vallejo. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jerry Vallejo and Jem Leasing LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez. (Cheriff, Bruce)
February 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bruce Jared Cheriff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1000000000; County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cheriff, Bruce)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jem Leasing LLC, Jerry Vallejo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16398925)Document filed by Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez.(Cheriff, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas De Gonzalez v. Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Vallejo
Represented By: Marjorie E Bornes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jem Leasing LLC
Represented By: Marjorie E Bornes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keire R. Vargas De Gonzalez
Represented By: Bruce Jared Cheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?