MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC v. Mylan N.V. et al
Plaintiff: MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC
Defendant: John D. Sheehan, Rajiv Malik, Paul B. Campbell, Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Kenneth S. Parks and Heather Bresch
Case Number: 1:2019cv01799
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Hampson on behalf of MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Hampson, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A Bodnar on behalf of MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Bodnar, Richard)
March 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
March 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
March 12, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:16-cv-07926-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rajiv Malik. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul B. Campbell. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mylan N.V.. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mylan Inc.. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth S. Parks. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John D. Sheehan. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heather Bresch. (pne)
February 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 16CV7926. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC.(Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John D. Sheehan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth S. Parks, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rajiv Malik, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul B. Campbell, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heather Bresch, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mylan Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mylan N.V., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-07926-JPO. Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC.(Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heather Bresch, Paul B. Campbell, Rajiv Malik, Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Kenneth S. Parks, John D. Sheehan. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16408301)Document filed by MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rolnick, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC v. Mylan N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYL Litigation Recovery I LLC
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Represented By: Richard A Bodnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul B. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Bresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?