Cabrera Garcia v. Osmola et al
Plaintiff: Binael Cabrera Garcia
Defendant: Nissan Infiniti LT and Nikola Osmola
Case Number: 1:2019cv01851
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT NISSAN-INFINITI LT:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for the parties to the above-entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Nissan-Infiniti LT, only, without cost to any party as against any other. The action as against defendant Nikola Osmola shall continue. The parties have filed a stipulation of dismissal of this action as to Defendant Nissan Infiniti-LT pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Defendant from the caption of this case. SO ORDERED., Nissan Infiniti LT terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/23/2019) (rj)
April 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #10 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (ad)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Nissan Infiniti LT and without costs. Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Aaron, Clifford)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT with proposed Civil Case Managment Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT.(Aaron, Clifford)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Binael Cabrera Garcia. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Binael Cabrera Garcia and Nikola Osmola on 2/28/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT. (Aaron, Clifford)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Clifford B. Aaron dated 3/1/2019 re: Service of Notice of Initial Conference and Order. Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT.(Aaron, Clifford)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed within the time frame set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 38(b). Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant Nissan Infiniti LT is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff and all other Defendants, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2019) (anc)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2019) (anc)
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Clifford B. Aaron. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $1,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
February 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16413553, paid on 2/27/2019. (pne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan Infiniti LT. Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT.(Aaron, Clifford)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Aaron, Clifford)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 20706/2019E..Document filed by Nissan Infiniti LT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer by Nissan-Infiniti LT, #3 Exhibit Answer by Nikola Osmola, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's demand for damages, #5 Exhibit Police Accident Report, #6 Exhibit Consent by Nikola Osmola for removal)(Aaron, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera Garcia v. Osmola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Binael Cabrera Garcia
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Infiniti LT
Represented By: Clifford B. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikola Osmola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?